Baker v. Safety Source Northeast et al
Plaintiff: Heidi M. Baker
Defendant: St. Paul Travelers Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2007cv00314
Filed: August 17, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Mary M Lisi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: GRANTING Defendant's 45 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING Plaintiff's 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/2/2011. (Duhamel, John)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 28 Report and Recommendations GRANTING 14 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by St. Paul Travelers Insurance Company and DENYING 12 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Heidi M. Baker - So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 1/28/09. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment be granted and that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be denied 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by St. Paul Travelers Insurance Company, 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Heidi M. Baker Objections to R&R due by 1/14/2009. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 12/30/08. (Noel, Jeannine)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Safety Source Northeast et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi M. Baker
Represented By: Anthony J. Gianfrancesco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Travelers Insurance Company
Represented By: John P. Graceffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?