In Re: Kugel Mesh Hernia Patch Products Liability Litigation Featured Case
Plaintiff: Deborah June Bilbrey, Wendy H. Risley, Lois Askins, Joseph William Halfacre, Olivia Solis, Aubrey L. Hineman, Ramona A. Griggie, Kellie Darlene Deal, Dustin R. Wake, Joseph Daniel Harb, Andy Cordova, Dianna R. Kelley, Thomas A. Verrill, Angelita Ralston, Karl A. Younger, Linda Y. Leonard, Troy Hall, Larry Palmer, Lydia G. Cole, Marie McCaffrey, Tina Derouen, Leesa K. Bristow, Richard Hines, Danny Ray Pritchett, Deanne P. Turco, Willis C. Gabbard, Michele Marie Beck, Krisy Lee Geer, Jane R. Wilson, Audie Canida, Evelyn Byrd, Arthur L. Lewis, Harry F. Berrios, Jeff Boggs, Vernon G. Stewart, George Azar, All Plaintiffs, Susan Boegner, Evangeline H. Mercadel, Frances Markotsis, John Boney, Maria Torres, Katherine Margaret Dunn, Fay M. King, JAMES ROWLAND, Pamela Ruth Parker, Frances Oveda Carroll, Vera Clay, JEFFREY CARR, James M. Sherrill, Monty R. Wallace, James Sterling Mullen, Cindy L Rhodes, Nancy Swafford, Donna Marie Murphy, Loraine Walters Kidner, Annie M. Harris, Jessie Jones, Juan M. Ballesteros, Kori Mueller, Christopher Thorpe, Betty Camus, Stephen G. Merritt, Frances Landers, Jeffrey Clark Hatcher, Jeffrey A. Romanowski, John Walter Althoff, Brian Beal, Lori Scott, Shawn Ray Brown, Karen Sue Richardson, Carmela Cavaliere, Craig E. Feese, Tracy A. Risley, Christine Marie Mallett, Rob Spring, Mark C Sharkozy, Connie Hoernemann, Perry N. Tuell, Barbara Rogers, Barbara Durst, Carl James Johnson, Susan E. Kasem, Judith D. Collins, Rosvin Ravanales, Amelia M. Cortez, Jacqueline Hicks, Michelle Santucci, Warren Scott Hugelier, Patsy A. Shepherd, Ralph L. Parks, Winnie Maye McCartney, Michael Craig Phillips, Margaret M. Allison, Tracy McGowan, Lucille C. Smith, Howard Ray Maness, George Urban, Andrea Dianne Dawkins, Leora J. Powell, Miron D. Bristow, James Daniel Mathein, Morris R. Weibel, David Jack Baughn, Cruz Delia Hill, Stefan Kosa, Melissa Jenkins, Pamela A. Wilson, Robert W. Wamslaey, Audrey Morgan, Sharon Truen, Joseph Girton, Jr., Pauline B Murrell, Charles P. Berry, Donald A. Schwarzenbart, Laura Smith, Paula M. O'Brien, Jeanine M. Camacho, Larry Snider, Valerie Fishgold, Jim Edward Curtis, Mark A. Woods, Martin Fishgold, Kerry Swartz, William N. Klein, Joyce McConathy, Thomas A Jones, III, Jane Ellis O'Connell, Thomas Joseph Gillogly, Nancy Cotten, Loyola Rodriguez, Jon Stolzer, Leonard Clay Davis, Timothy J. Edgar, Deborah Martina Spicer-Yates, Helen Faye Wright, Virgil Johnson, Gladys Mae Fox, Jessie Ann Gifford, Betty Jo McCrorie, Yvette Espinoza, Leah Thomas, Lana K. Giallella, Kathy Thissen Scherer, Tracy S. Reitzel, Rex Lee, Scott Beal, George Andrew Luffman, Sandra L. Landry, Marie Frank, William Leonard Norris, Charles Winston McCray, II, Charlene Myers, John Howard Russell, Richard Jay Martin, Shirley Faye Chatman, Brenda Gayvont, Ricky A. Phares, Mashell Garrett, Kathlyn M. Miller, Barbara A. Dodds, James Markotsis, Roselin J. Castro, Debby Lynn Hernandez, Remigio B. Troya, Theresa Martin, Ruby M. Vines, Hazel Nevil, Debrah Hornestein, Marvin D. Holler, Carolyn M. Parker, Carla M. Albright, Terry T. Robinson, Mark Scott, Robin S. Morgan, Lori J. Johnson, Joe Lewis Brown, Patsy A Tucker, Matthew Mann, James Clinton Thomas, Angie R. Spring, Felton Estes, Ana Maria Vera, Bridget McElhatton, David C. Mittler, Tabitha L. Seaman, Frances Althea Vickery, Dan Lewis Zachariah, Byron Ralston, Roy R. Young, Mary Hunter, Ida F. Dillon, Nathan Degraffenried, Kim Catlett, Robert H. Saylor, Lois Patillo, Vivian Bruce, Deborah Ann Platten, Gertrude Gray, Jackie Sanderson, Dorothy May Wurtz-Bright, Marie Armeli, Frances L. Rita, Kathryn L. Stahler, Cody R. Klewin, Thomas Donald Walker, Marlene Enders, Bruce Everette Morrison, Trinidad Rose Trejo, Mary B. Brown, Theresa Wilson, Trevus Gail Manning, William J. Isch, Kathy B. Peterson, Randal McQuiller, Teresa L Crawford, Marie Parra, Ruth Segarra, LORETTA STARR, Janet Loose, Elaine Beeler, Levi Madison, Dorothy M. Young, Dwena Wilson, Carl E. Scott, Thomas H. Walsh, Asha Z. Bowen, J. W. Collins, Mary Martin, Jae Phoenix, Laura Lea Barnett, Charles M. Nichols, Mona B. Rose, Joy L. Payne, Melissa Smith, MD C. Dayton Kirk, Darrell J. McMellon, Danny Fritz, Kate Katherine Taylor, Donald N. Gregg, Tina Lee Ward, Mike Rood, Beverly Ruth Learn, Jenine Von Essen, Lillian Hernandez, Kathy A. Patterson, Gordon Appleton, Carol Lee Moreau, Lynne Huerta, Beverly Davis, Karen L. Gates, Aisha Williams Prewitt, Anita L. Gaudet, Andra Ruff, Rose Marie Johnson, Christina McClusky, Virta, Estate of Bennette, Angela F. Campbell, William K. Denning, Theresa Smith, Kelli M. Cecil, Romualdo Vences Gama, Amado Alejos, Cathy Brezeale, Alicia L. Morales, Clinton E. Piper, Charles A. Rees, Stephanie Theoret, Lisa Dawn Forsee, Thomas Cole, Steven Torres, Lilyan Kathleen Hall, James Anthony Gardner, CHARLOTTE ROBINSON, Nancy Grabowski, Eldon Lee Wood, Donald Pfirman, Kevin W. Vecchio, Tamala Christine Wilson, Hernando Rubio, Cheryl Hagerstrad, Cody Harmon, Kelly M. Follin, Randee P. Van Ness, Angela Casanave, Charoletta C. Blackmon, Keemam Bassett, Ronald Lee Crawford, Jackie L. Shirley, Roger W. Maupin, Tracy Ballinger, Michelle Miller, Debra G. Alford, Eleanor Ruth Reynolds, Leona Youmans, Michael Bolton, Bonnie Lou Farmer, Rodney Lee Hammonds, Sharon A. Shafer, Janie Marie Gaines, Mary Elizabeth Bio, Dorothy M. Davis, Darlene Dolly Percy, Thomas Leo Boone, Chester Wilson Brumley, Cosimo DeVincentis, Arthur J. Stuart, Roland Smith, Lawrence Paul Horne, Earlene Allen, Karen Hall, Robert Hooks, Terri Ann Bruce, Diana M. Burton, Dorothy Kerns Blair, Everett Stafford, Brianna M. West, Rebecca C. Willis, Paul F. Nystrom, Susan Jane Strehlo, Paul Altine, Angel A. Seal, Sonia Montiel, Willie Marvin Lord, Harold W. Ritchie, Sr., Sarah L. Whitmore, Charles Robert Anderson, Wayne Worman, Susan Theresa Roberts, Mary H. Brown, Patricia Melom, Mary Jane Bohm, Marian M. Koryciak, Joyce Ann Johnson, Deborah Lynn Romero, Carmela Donofrio, Tina Richman, Valorie Dean Kelly, Brenda Glenn, Christopher A. Hargis, Thomas B. Miller, Margurite L. Adams, Virginia L. Olsen, Michele L. Farmer, Scott David Montague, Chris Bennett, Rodney Wingler, Donna W. Alvarez, Brenda E. Vogan, Rebecca Joanne McCormick, Barbara A. Cornell, Charles Gaddy, Jr., Hali Anne Joiner, Barbara Merrill, Richard Lee Wahl, Patty Lou Scott, Richard J McIntosh, II, Geralyn L. Hurt, Wavie Cannon, Jr., LaGreer Brown, Georgiana K. Donohoo, Claude Honeycutt, Tracy Doyle, Michael William Rea, DIANA DUHART, Christopher Batiste, Barbara A. Dockery, Mischelle Andres, Billy Richard Davidson, Rhonda Beaver, Kate-Lynne Ruth Crawford, Bonnie Louise Adkins, Eldon L. Higgins, William John Bodnar, Mauro L. Cossentino, Stacy L. J. Price, Saul Vanderwoude, Lewis W. Harris, PAMALA ANN DARSOW, DORLA ROWLAND, Tammy Jensen, Melody A. Brown, Gerardo Castaneda-Rivera, W.L. Akins, John M. Morgan, Roseann Eldred, Ruth Slatky, Mary Polacek, Michael Ruggles, Anthony J. Zuccarello, Peggy O'Neill Little, Kenneth Humphrey, Edward Navis, Marvin E. Parker, Madeline Stevenson, Karmen Milligan, Christopher B. Brown, Rickie Patton, Alan George Moses, Kenneth M. Garofono, Joseph Morabito, Eleanor Henry, Lucinda J. Saylor, Amy Leanne Barlow, Richard L Sanders, Lecey Heckenlively, Pascal A. Giallella, Robert Bell, Paul David Bourbon, James E. McCormick, Maggie A. Capers, Gairee A. Trigg, Sr., Harold Flatt, Teresa Jacques, Eloisa Riojas, Pamela Sepeda, Stanley Ray Slone, DAWN M. JAYJOHN, Sonya Mitchell, Reda M. Dailey, Charles S. Nay, Regina Ann Banks, Gwen A. Coney, Norman Thomas Cartright, Maurice Patrick Hintz, David R. Nicolas, Ruby N. Parks, Deborah Santee, James Roger Banks, John E. Walters, Kathryn D. Bailey, Nick D Myers, Davida Gavin, Luis Aquilar-Rodriguez, Anthony Novak, Judith Ann Rouiller, James B. Samuel, Harlan Brent Hickman, Deborah M. Price, Barbara Adams, Sondra Lee Ditty, Keanna Frasier, Christina Reed, Wayne Allen Rourke, Guadalupe V. Gonzalez, Kyle E. Ferdig, Dorothy Burt, Richard T. Gillespie, Allen D. Townsend, Tony C. Tambrello, Joshua Keinath, Wallis Kane, CINDY RUST, Arnold Horowitz, Helen Richardson, Sharron L. Dattilo, Sonia Calderon, Tammie D. Healey, Ralph Chandos, William Caldwell, Joseph M. May, Cathleen Marquardt, Dorothy Terry, David L. Boykin, Hadley Scott Smith, Randall Logan Wilson, Barbara Jean Petry, Mary Jane Maciel, Greg Kuhnle, Timothy Clyde Heuett, Linda M. Aquista, Melissia Jenkins, Suzanne Benjamin, Alice Marie Barnes, Melinda S. Votion, Barbara S. Kendall, Joseph G. Cattell, Rita Reed, Angelo Cavaliere, Inta Meya, Walter Ritchie Grove, Jonathan Jackson, Lawrence Bradley, John E. Palmer, Margo Lynn Hilton, Anton Bokemper, Camille Nicole Thompson, Robert D. Hicks, Sharon K Teel, Brent S. Rice, Robert Higgins, Robert A. Albright, Harold Gomez, Steven E. Honyotski, David L. Arnold, Rita D. Chandler, John R. Presho, Neva Leann Shortnacy-Jackson, Gladys Morrison, Marisol Soto, Michael J. Brennan, Daniel E. Velasco, Jocelyn P. Riebe, Kelley Keinath, Ellie Mae Kendrick, Steven Bost, Rachel Ramos, Patric S. Buchanan, Keith E. Peterson, Dan Ellis, John A. Von Essen, Noe C. Juarez, Jeffrey M. Knisbacher, Daniel F Barker, Clifford L. Sanford, Jeri Burger, Steven L. Lawson, Lisa Green, Misty Stanfield, Steve H. McClanahan, Ivy J. Collins, III, Elaine Dorothy Madira, Tommy Keith Johnson, Lorna Katoa, Barry M. Smith, Susan E Viars, Terry Flatt, Katrina Ann Howland, Leonard Ralston, Collins Long, Rita Wiese, Joseph Rohm, Connie Mae Painter, Kimberlee H. Dean, Thomas D. Hyland, Frank Getcy, Jr, Ronald Michael Rosa, Janice J. Sloan, Linda Martin, Kenneth D. Landers, Theresa Garza, Jesse A. Moore, Thomas Roberts, Helen D. Delaine, Richard Shelton, Mary Altine, Claudette Dashawn Brown, Bradley A. Taylor, Linda Sue Nichols, Florence Horowitz, LUISA HOCEVAR, James E. Smiley, Gary G. Garcia, Barbara A. Johnson, Rodney D. Anglin, Marjorie Miller, Jason M. Cohn, Buford H. Adkins, Kenneth D. Andrews, Carol A. Bishop, Patricia Beekes, Cheryl Light, Gregory Lewis, David Dean Lay, Rosemary S. Roberts, DONNA MARIE DAVIS, Lloyd Raymond Neal, Ella Mae Christensen, Luigi A. Rago, Kathy M. Brewer, Ellen Green Sussman, Juan Ramos, Donna M. LaFave, Alice Marie Bustamante, Patricia Peters, William N. DeBoard, Bruce Wayne McQuay, Eileen B. Matonak, Patricia W. Byrd, Robert Lyn Kearney, Douglas A. Salomon, Cora L. Metcalf, Alexander Rodriguez, SANDRA GAIL WILLIAMS, William S. Rogers III, Donald G. Johnson, Tracy L. Gibson, Alonzo Hall, Kevin Eisenschenk, Quinn Caldwell, Annette Purcell, Maxette Ratliff, Eugene Reeder, William Doug Devine, Donald Ray Horton, Debra Reedy, Shirley L. Wright, Kristen Greenfield, Patrick Percy, Mabel Y Taylor, Sharon Carrie Conaway, Anthony J. Dabo, Jr., Brenda J Barrett, Debbra Lee Williams, Malinda King, Alicia Daniel, Maikel A. Sanchez, Jodi Schaller, Joe Larry Hunter, CINDY L. RHOADES, Betsy L. Bynum, David N. Camarote, Eva Marilyn Goggans and Nelson Olmo
Defendant: Davol, Inc, WCO Medical Products Corporation, Baolien Nguyen Tu, Covidien, LP, United Memorial Medical Center, University Of Illinois Medical Center, Surgical Sense, Inc, Herbert J. Thomas Memorial Hospital Association, Antonio Sepeda, Boulder City Hospital, Inc, Tenet Health System, DI, Inc, Morehouse Parish Hospital District No. 1, Covidian, LP, Integris Southwest Medical Center, Inc and Delara A. Miller
Interested Party: Ernest Cory
Case Number: 1:2007md01842
Filed: June 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5344 ORDER granting #5343 Joint Motion for Common Benefit Adjustment. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/26/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 22, 2017 Filing 5343 Joint MOTION Common Benefit Adjustment JOINT MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 10/6/2017. (Migliori, Donald)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5342 ORDER RECOMMENDING TERMINATION OF MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/8/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5341 ORDER denying #5340 Motion to Intervene filed by Antonio Sepeda. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/30/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 10, 2017 Filing 5340 MOTION to Intervene filed by Antonio Sepeda. Responses due by 8/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(Barletta, Barbara)
June 29, 2017 Case reassigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith. Judge Mary M. Lisi no longer assigned to the case. (Barletta, Barbara)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: This case is transferred to the calendar of Chief Judge William E. Smith - So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/29/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5337 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Patricia Farmer (CA 11-3652ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/28/2017. (Feeley, Susan) (Feeley, Susan).
February 27, 2017 Filing 5337 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF PATRICIA FARMER (1:11-cv-03652-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #5331 Stipulation. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 1/6/2017. (Feeley, Susan)
January 6, 2017 Filing 5332 STIPULATION re #5328 Order, Stipulation for Designation of Contents of the Record for Remand (as it relates to Norma Olmo (13-cv-03820-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Designation of the Contents of the Record to be Remanded)(Brown, Michael)
January 5, 2017 Filing 5331 STIPULATION AS TO PATHOLOGY PROTOCOL as it relates to Harrington (08-0448) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #5330 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as it relates to Plaintiffs Brenda Glenn, individually and as administrator of the estate of Alisa Lay, and on behalf of the wrongful death beneficiaries of Alisa Lay (12-3769 ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/29/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
December 21, 2016 Filing 5330 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS BRENDA GLENN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF ALISA LAY, AND ON BEHALF OF THE WRONGFUL DEATH BENEFICIARIES OF ALISA LAY (1:13-CV-03769-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
December 15, 2016 Remark re case 08-2635ML Bowersock v. Davol, Inc., et al.: Case extracted and transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. (Feeley, Susan)
December 14, 2016 Filing 5329 STIPULATION re #5328 Order, Stipulation for Designation of Contents of the Record for Remand (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Designation of the Contents of the Record to be Remanded)(Brown, Michael)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5328 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER as it relates to Norma Olmo (CA 13-3820ML); Bobby Don Bowersock, et al. (CA 08-2635ML); Cory Hanks (CA 10-3048ML); Amy Pointdexter (CA 09-2756ML); Lora Wiechering, et al. (CA 07-1943ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/29/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
November 14, 2016 Filing 5327 SUGGESTION OF REMAND as it relates to: Bobby Don Bowersock, et al. (CA 08-2635ML); Norma Olmo, et al. (CA 13-3820ML); Cory Hanks (CA 10-3048ML); Amy Pointdexter (CA 09-2756ML); Lora Wiechering, et al. (CA 07-1943ML). (Feeley, Susan)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5326 ORDER Awarding Attorneys' Fees from the Common Benefit Fund. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/7/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5325 REVISED PRETRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER as it relates to Angela F. Campbell (CA09-627 ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/4/2016. (Feeley, Susan) A copy of the attached Order was forwarded to Plaintiff via first-class mail.
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5324 ORDER Refunding the Balance of the Common Benefit Expense Fund. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/4/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5323 ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice as it relates to Plaintiff JENIFER PONT (CA 08-203ML) for failure to comply with this Court's #5312 Order dated 9/19/2016 directing Plaintiff to enter the case pro se or engage successor counsel on or before 10/20/2016. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/3/2016. A copy of the attached Order was forwarded to Plaintiff's last known address via first-class mail.(Feeley, Susan)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5322 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as it relates to Ursula Fuller (CA 09-0129ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/1/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
October 31, 2016 Filing 5322 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF URSULA FULLER (1:09-cv-00129-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5321 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Tara A. Phillips (CA 09-487ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/28/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
October 27, 2016 Filing 5321 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF TARA A. PHILLIPS (1:09-cv-00487-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5320 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER of Dismissal for failure to comply with this Court's #5302 Order dated 8/29/2016 as it relates to Patricia Beekes (CA 12-472ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/25/2016. (A copy of this Order was forwarded to Plaintiff and Nancy Boynton via first-class mail.)(Feeley, Susan)
October 21, 2016 Filing 5319 PROPOSED Pretrial Case Management Order (as it relates to Daniel Harrington, CA 08-00448ML) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5318 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as it relates to Barry Shapiro and Marilyn Shapiro (CA 09-3024ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/11/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5317 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as it relates to James A. Knight (CA 07-471ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/11/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5316 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as it relates to Mary B. Bond (CA 10-340ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/11/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
October 10, 2016 Filing 5318 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS BARRY SHAPIRO AND MARILYN SHAPIRO (1:09-cv-03024-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 10, 2016 Filing 5317 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF JAMES A. KNIGHT (1:07-cv-00471-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 10, 2016 Filing 5316 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF MARY B. BOND (1:10-cv-00340-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 6, 2016 Filing 5315 RULE 16 STATEMENT - PROPOSED Pretrial Case Management Order (as it relates to Angela F. Campbell, CA 09-627ML) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5314 ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice as it relates to Gladys Morrison (CA 10-3130ML)for failure to comply with this court's #5184 Order dated 5/16/2016. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/3/2016. (A copy of this Order was forwarded via first-class mail to Plaintiff's last known address.)(Feeley, Susan)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5313 ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice as it relates to Vera Clay (CA 08-2302ML) for failure to comply with this court's #5192 Order dated 5/19/2016.. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/3/2016. (A copy of this Order was forwarded via first-class mail to Plaintiff's last known address.)(Feeley, Susan)
October 3, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi: Telephonic In Chambers Conference with liaison counsel held on 10/3/2016. Counsel participating: D. Migliori; J. Hooper; E. Gladbach. (Feeley, Susan)
September 28, 2016 Remark: The Order #5312 which was mailed to Plaintiff Jenifer Pont (CA 08-203) on 9/19/2016 was returned to the court by the U.S. Postal Service as "not deliverable unable to forward" on 9/26/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
September 20, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic In Chambers Conference with liaison counsel set for 10/3/2016 at 12:00 PM before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi. Liaison counsel will be provided with call-in instructions.(Feeley, Susan)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5312 ORDER granting #5296 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (as it relates to Jenifer Pont CA 08-203ML). Plaintiff shall have successor counsel enter an appearance or enter an appearance pro se on or before 10/20/2016. Failure to do so by 10/20/2016 will result in the matter being dismissed without further notice. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 9/19/2016. (A copy of this Order was forwarded to Plaintiff via first-class mail.) (Feeley, Susan) Modified on 11/2/2016 to reflect that the Order sent to Plaintiff on 9/19/2016 was returned on 9/26/2016 as "not deliverable unable to forward". (Feeley, Susan).
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5311 ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice as it relates to William Denning (CA 09-630ML) for failure to comply with this Court's #5293 Order dated 8/5/2016. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 9/19/2016. (A copy of this Order was forwarded via first-class mail to Plaintiff's last known address.)(Feeley, Susan)
September 15, 2016 Filing 5310 NOTICE by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #5306 Proposed Voir Dire : Defendants Objections to Plaintiffs Proposed Voir Dire Questions (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) (Brown, Michael)
September 15, 2016 Filing 5309 NOTICE by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #5305 Proposed Jury Instructions : Defendants Objections to Plaintiffs Proposed Jury Instructions (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) (Brown, Michael)
September 6, 2016 Filing 5308 NOTICE by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo re #5307 Notice (Other) Joint Trial Exhibit List (Migliori, Donald)
September 2, 2016 Filing 5307 NOTICE by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc JOINT TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST (as it relates to Olmo, et al., Case No. 13-03820-ML) (Brown, Michael)
September 2, 2016 Filing 5306 Proposed Voir Dire by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo.(Migliori, Donald)
September 2, 2016 Filing 5305 Proposed Jury Instructions by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo.(Migliori, Donald)
September 2, 2016 Filing 5304 Proposed Voir Dire (as it relates to Olmo, et al., Case No. 13-03820-ML) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc.(Brown, Michael)
September 2, 2016 Filing 5303 Proposed Jury Instructions (as it relates to Olmo, et al., Case No. 13-03820-ML) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc.(Brown, Michael)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5302 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5301 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's request for extension of time regarding outstanding discovery obligations and authorizations is GRANTED and this information is due by 10/12/2016. The request for Plaintiff to be represented by her daughter Nancy Boynton is DENIED. Plaintiff shall have successor counsel enter an appearance or she shall enter her appearance pro se on or before 9/30/2016. Failure to comply with this ORDER will result in dismissal without further notice. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/29/2016. A copy of this order was forwarded to the Plaintiff and to Nancy Boynton via first-class mail.. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/29/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
August 23, 2016 Filing 5301 MOTION for an Extension of Time, (as it relates to CA12-472), filed by Patricia Beekes. Responses due by 9/9/2016 (Jackson, Kerrie)
August 19, 2016 Filing 5300 NOTICE by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #5299 Response in Opposition, Notice of Filing Defendants Objections and Reply-Counter Designations to Plaintiffs Counter-Designations of Deposition Testimony (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) (Brown, Michael)
August 12, 2016 Filing 5299 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Norma Olmo re #5287 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS AND COUNTER-DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION TESTIMONY TO BE OFFERED AS EVIDENCE AT TRIAL. Replies due by 8/19/2016. (Migliori, Donald)
August 12, 2016 Filing 5298 NOTICE by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #5286 Notice (Other) Defendants Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs Designation of Deposition Testimony to be Offered as Evidence at Trial (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) (Brown, Michael)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5297 Notice of Withdrawal of #5206 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Barbara A. Dodds. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/11/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
August 10, 2016 Filing 5297 NOTICE by Barbara A. Dodds re #5292 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, of Withdrawal of Motion to Withdraw as Attorney #5206 (Migliori, Donald)
August 10, 2016 Filing 5296 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to 08-cv-203-ML filed by Jenifer Pont. Responses due by 8/29/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5295 ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice as it relates to Keanna Frasier (CA 10-3079ML) for failure to comply with this Court's #5217 Order dated 6/17/2016. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/5/2016. (A copy of this Order was forwarded via first-class mail to Plaintiff's last known address.)(Feeley, Susan)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5294 ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice as it relates to Thomas Cole and Lois Cole (CA 10-3544ML) for failure to comply with this Court's #5216 Order dated 6/16/2016. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/5/2016. (A copy of this Order was forwarded via first-class mail to Plaintiffs' last known address.)(Feeley, Susan)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5293 ORDER granting #5205 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (as it relates to William Denning, CA 09-630 ML). Plaintiff shall have successor counsel enter an appearance or enter an appearance pro se on or before 9/6/2016. Failure to do so by 9/6/2016 will result in the matter being dismissed without further notice. A copy of this Order was forwarded to Plaintiff via first-class mail. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/5/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5292 ORDER granting #5206 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (as it relates to Barbara Dodds, CA 08-523ML). Plaintiff shall have successor counsel enter an appearance or enter an appearance pro se on or before 9/6/2016. Failure to do so by 9/6/2016 will result in the matter being dismissed without further notice. A copy of this Order was forwarded to Plaintiff via first-class mail. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/5/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5291 ORDER granting #5199 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (as it relates to Angela Campbell, CA 09-672ML. Plaintiff shall have successor counsel enter an appearance or enter an appearance pro se on or before 9/6/2016. Failure to do so by 9/6/2016 will result in the matter being dismissed without further notice. A copy of this Order was forwarded to Plaintiff via first-class mail. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/5/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5290 ORDER granting #5289 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher M. Bijesse terminated as it relates to:Patricia A. Beekes v. Davol, Inc., et al., C.A. No. 12-472ML. The Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall either have successor counsel enter an appearance or enter an appearance pro se on or before September 6, 2016; and, If Plaintiff fails to have successor counsel enter an appearance or she fails to enter an appearance pro se by September 6, 2016, this matter will be DISMISSED without any further notice. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/4/2016. (Noel, Jeannine)
August 3, 2016 Filing 5289 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Patricia Beekes. Responses due by 8/22/2016 (Bijesse, Christopher)
July 29, 2016 Filing 5287 NOTICE by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc of Defendants' Designations of Deposition Testimony (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al. (13-03820-ML)) (Brown, Michael)
July 29, 2016 Filing 5286 NOTICE by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo of Plaintiff's Designation of Deposition Testimony (Migliori, Donald)
July 25, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: Settlement Conference held on 7/25/2016 (as it relates to Patricia Beekes v. Davol, Inc. CA12-472ML). (Noel, Jeannine)
July 22, 2016 Filing 5285 RESPONSE in Support re #5236 MOTION in Limine No. 10 To Exclude Certain Testimony (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
July 22, 2016 Filing 5284 RESPONSE in Support re #5235 MOTION in Limine No. 9 To Exclude Certain Damages Claims (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
July 22, 2016 Filing 5283 RESPONSE in Support re #5234 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Exclude Evidence And Argument That The Composix Kugel Caused Certain Unsupported Injuries To Norma Olmo (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
July 22, 2016 Filing 5282 RESPONSE in Support re #5233 MOTION in Limine No. 7 To Adopt Certain Pretrial Rulings Previously Entered In Whitfield And Thorpe (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
July 22, 2016 Filing 5281 RESPONSE in Support re #5232 MOTION in Limine No. 6 To Exclude Evidence And Argument Related To Defendants Marketing And Lord Of The Rings (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
July 22, 2016 Filing 5280 RESPONSE in Support re #5231 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Exclude Evidence Of The Da Vinci And Other Animal Studies (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Brown, Michael)
July 22, 2016 Filing 5279 RESPONSE in Support re #5230 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER LAWSUITS, INCIDENTS, COMPLAINTS AND MDRS (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
July 22, 2016 Filing 5278 RESPONSE in Support re #5229 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Reference To Other Bard Products (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
July 22, 2016 Filing 5277 RESPONSE in Support re #5228 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Non-Cognizable Warnings Claims (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) REPLY in Support re #5228 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Non-Cognizable Warnings Claims (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
July 22, 2016 Filing 5276 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5272 Response in Opposition to Motion,, Motion in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence And Argument Of Ring Break, Recall, FDA And Internal Inspections, And Subsequent Remedial Measures (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5275 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5231 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Exclude Evidence Of The Da Vinci And Other Animal Studies (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Migliori, Donald)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5274 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5230 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Evidence Of Other Lawsuits, Incidents, Complaints And MDRS (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Migliori, Donald)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5273 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5229 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Reference To Other Bard Products (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Migliori, Donald)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5272 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5227 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence And Argument Of Ring Break, Recall, FDA And Internal Inspections, And Subsequent Remedial Measures (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Migliori, Donald)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5271 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5250 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 14 TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES FROM THE COURTROOM (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5270 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5249 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 13 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY FROM ANY WITNESS OR FROM DEFENDANTS ATTORNEYS ABOUT THEIR OR THEIR FAMILY MEMBERS EXPERIENCES WITH ANY HERNIA PRODUCTS (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5269 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5248 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 12 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY ABOUT HOW PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS WERE RETAINED OR ANY MENTION OF ATTORNEY ADVERTISING (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5268 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5247 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 11 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO A NOVEL ATTRIBUTED TO DR. SUZANNE PARISIAN (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5267 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5246 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 10 TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE, ARGUMENT AND/OR REFERENCE TO COLLATERAL SOURCES AND INSURANCE (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5266 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5245 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 9 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY, ARGUMENT OR SUGGESTION THAT: (1) DEFENDANTS ARE NOT LIABLE BASED ON FDA CLEARANCE OF DEFENDANTS 510(K) APPLICATION FOR THE COMPOSIX KUGEL PATCH; (2) FDA CLEARANCE OF DEFEND (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5265 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5244 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #8: TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO A CALCULATION OF DEFENDANTS FAILURE RATE, ANY MENTION OF FAILURE PERCENTAGES OR ANY REFERENCE TO TOTAL NUMBER OF FAILURES (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5264 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5243 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #7: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY FROM ANY WITNESS OR DEFENDANTS ATTORNEYS ABOUT FDA WARNING LETTERS TO OTHER COMPANIES ABOUT OTHER PRODUCTS (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5263 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5242 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 6 TO EXCLUDE PRIOR LITIGATION HISTORY (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5262 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5241 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFF, NORMA OLMOS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #5: TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS FROM COMMENTING ON PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS PRECLUSION AS AN EXPERT WITNESS IN OTHER CASES (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5261 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5240 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 4TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OR ARGUMENT REGARDING INTERVENING OR SUPERSEDING CAUSES OR ANY ADVERSE INFERENCE FOR NOT SUING ALL POTENTIAL PARTIES OR ANY ARGUMENT THAT MS. OLMOS TREATING PHYSICIANS WERE (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5260 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5239 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #3: TO ADMIT SUMMARY EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS EASYTRACK AND TRACKWISE DATABASES (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5259 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5238 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFF NORMA OLMOS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO ALLOW EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS ANALYSES OF THE CK PATCH (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael)
July 15, 2016 Filing 5258 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5237 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #1: TO ALLOW THE INTRODUCTION OF THE FDA FORM 483 OBSERVATIONS, EIR, AND WARNING LETTERS filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael)
July 14, 2016 Filing 5257 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5236 MOTION in Limine No. 10 To Exclude Certain Testimony (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald)
July 14, 2016 Filing 5256 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5235 MOTION in Limine No. 9 To Exclude Certain Damages Claims (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Migliori, Donald)
July 14, 2016 Filing 5255 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5234 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Exclude Evidence And Argument That The Composix Kugel Caused Certain Unsupported Injuries To Norma Olmo (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Migliori, Donald)
July 14, 2016 Filing 5254 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5233 MOTION in Limine No. 7 To Adopt Certain Pretrial Rulings Previously Entered In Whitfield And Thorpe (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Migliori, Donald)
July 14, 2016 Filing 5253 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5232 MOTION in Limine No. 6 To Exclude Evidence And Argument Related To Defendants Marketing And Lord Of The Rings (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Migliori, Donald)
July 14, 2016 Filing 5252 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5228 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Non-Cognizable Warnings Claims (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 7/25/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Migliori, Donald)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5251 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND NOTICE OF Settlement Conference set for 7/25/2016 at 02:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Almond Chambers - Room P-208 before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (as it relates to Patricia Beekes v. Davol, Inc. CA12-472ML). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 7/11/2016. (Noel, Jeannine)
July 6, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: Telephone Conference with Attorneys C. Bijesse and J. Seidel held on 7/6/2016. (as it relates to CA12-472ML Patricia Beekes v. Davol, Inc.) (Noel, Jeannine)
July 1, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to discuss scheduling a settlement conference set for 7/6/2016 04:00 PM (EST) before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond (as it relates to CA12-472ML Patricia Beekes v. Davol, Inc.) (Noel, Jeannine) Modified on 7/1/2016 (Noel, Jeannine). THE COURT WILL INITIATE THE CALL.
July 1, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: Telephone Conference with Attorney Seidel held on 7/1/2016. (Noel, Jeannine)
July 1, 2016 Filing 5250 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 14 TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES FROM THE COURTROOM filed by Norma Olmo. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5249 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 13 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY FROM ANY WITNESS OR FROM DEFENDANTS ATTORNEYS ABOUT THEIR OR THEIR FAMILY MEMBERS EXPERIENCES WITH ANY HERNIA PRODUCTS filed by Norma Olmo. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5248 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 12 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY ABOUT HOW PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS WERE RETAINED OR ANY MENTION OF ATTORNEY ADVERTISING filed by Norma Olmo. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5247 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 11 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO A NOVEL ATTRIBUTED TO DR. SUZANNE PARISIAN filed by Norma Olmo. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5246 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 10 TO EXCLUDE ANY EVIDENCE, ARGUMENT AND/OR REFERENCE TO COLLATERAL SOURCES AND INSURANCE filed by Norma Olmo. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5245 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 9 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY, ARGUMENT OR SUGGESTION THAT: (1) DEFENDANTS ARE NOT LIABLE BASED ON FDA CLEARANCE OF DEFENDANTS 510(K) APPLICATION FOR THE COMPOSIX KUGEL PATCH; (2) FDA CLEARANCE OF DEFENDANTS 510(K) APPLICATION FOR THE COMPOSIX KUGEL PATCH MEANS THE DEVICE IS SAFE AND EFFECTIVE; AND (3) FDA CLEARANCE OF THE COMPOSIX KUGEL PATCHS LABEL MEANS THAT THE LABEL WAS ADEQUATE filed by Norma Olmo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5244 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE #8: TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO A CALCULATION OF DEFENDANTS FAILURE RATE, ANY MENTION OF FAILURE PERCENTAGES OR ANY REFERENCE TO TOTAL NUMBER OF FAILURES filed by Norma Olmo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5243 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #7: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR TESTIMONY FROM ANY WITNESS OR DEFENDANTS ATTORNEYS ABOUT FDA WARNING LETTERS TO OTHER COMPANIES ABOUT OTHER PRODUCTS filed by Norma Olmo. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5242 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 6 TO EXCLUDE PRIOR LITIGATION HISTORY filed by Norma Olmo. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5241 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFF, NORMA OLMOS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #5: TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS FROM COMMENTING ON PLAINTIFFS EXPERTS PRECLUSION AS AN EXPERT WITNESS IN OTHER CASES filed by Norma Olmo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5240 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE # 4TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OR ARGUMENT REGARDING INTERVENING OR SUPERSEDING CAUSES OR ANY ADVERSE INFERENCE FOR NOT SUING ALL POTENTIAL PARTIES OR ANY ARGUMENT THAT MS. OLMOS TREATING PHYSICIANS WERE NEGLIGENT filed by Norma Olmo. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5239 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #3: TO ADMIT SUMMARY EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS EASYTRACK AND TRACKWISE DATABASES filed by Norma Olmo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5238 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFF NORMA OLMOS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #2 TO ALLOW EVIDENCE OF DEFENDANTS ANALYSES OF THE CK PATCH filed by Norma Olmo. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5237 MOTION in Limine PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION IN LIMINE #1: TO ALLOW THE INTRODUCTION OF THE FDA FORM 483 OBSERVATIONS, EIR, AND WARNING LETTERS filed by Norma Olmo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5236 MOTION in Limine No. 10 To Exclude Certain Testimony (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5235 MOTION in Limine No. 9 To Exclude Certain Damages Claims (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5234 MOTION in Limine No. 8 To Exclude Evidence And Argument That The Composix Kugel Caused Certain Unsupported Injuries To Norma Olmo (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5233 MOTION in Limine No. 7 To Adopt Certain Pretrial Rulings Previously Entered In Whitfield And Thorpe (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5232 MOTION in Limine No. 6 To Exclude Evidence And Argument Related To Defendants Marketing And Lord Of The Rings (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5231 MOTION in Limine No. 5 To Exclude Evidence Of The Da Vinci And Other Animal Studies (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5230 MOTION in Limine No. 4 To Exclude Evidence Of Other Lawsuits, Incidents, Complaints And MDRS (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5229 MOTION in Limine No. 3 To Exclude Reference To Other Bard Products (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5228 MOTION in Limine No. 2 To Exclude Non-Cognizable Warnings Claims (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
July 1, 2016 Filing 5227 MOTION in Limine No. 1 To Exclude Evidence And Argument Of Ring Break, Recall, FDA And Internal Inspections, And Subsequent Remedial Measures (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5221 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to JOHN FENDLEY AND SYLVIA FENDLEY (CA 08-2633ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/29/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5220 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to LISA EFAU AND LARRY EFAU (CA 09-2917ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/29/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
June 28, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference to discuss scheduling a settlement conference set for 7/1/2016 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond (as it relates to CA12-472ML Patricia Beekes v. Davol, Inc.) The court will initiate the call. (Noel, Jeannine)
June 27, 2016 Filing 5226 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5212 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Limit the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Suzanne Parisian (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
June 27, 2016 Filing 5225 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5211 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Paul Ducheyne (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Brown, Michael)
June 27, 2016 Filing 5224 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5208 Response in Opposition to Motion,, to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Stephen Ferzoco (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Brown, Michael)
June 27, 2016 Filing 5223 STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS in Response to Plaintiffs' Additional Statement of Undisputed Facts (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #5213 Statement of Disputed Facts,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19, #2 Exhibit 20, #3 Exhibit 21, #4 Exhibit 22)(Brown, Michael)
June 27, 2016 Filing 5222 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5209 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, for Summary Judgment (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
June 27, 2016 Filing 5221 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS JOHN FENDLEY AND SYLVIA FENDLEY (1:08-CV-02633-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 27, 2016 Filing 5220 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISA EFAU AND LARRY EFAU (1:09-CV-02917-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #5219 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Dwena Jo Wilson, Audie Canida, Elizabeth Galloway and the Estate of Virta Bennett (CA 09-3028ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/23/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
June 22, 2016 Filing 5219 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS DWENA JO WILSON, AUDIE CANIDA, ELIZABETH GALLOWAY, AND THE ESTATE OF VIRTA BENNETT (1:09-CV-03028-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5218 ORDER DISMISSING case as it relates to ELSIE M. NIEVES, CA 09-2825 ML. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/20/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5217 ORDER granting #5195 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (as it relates to Keanna Frasier, CA 10-3079ML). Plaintiff shall have successor counsel enter an appearance or enter an appearance pro se on or before 7/18/2016. Failure to do so by 7/18/2016 will result in the matter being dismissed without further notice. A copy of this Order was forwarded to Plaintiff via first-class mail. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/17/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5216 ORDER granting #5191 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (as it relates to Thomas Cole and Lois Cole, CA 10-3544ML. Plaintiff shall have successor counsel enter an appearance or enter an appearance pro se on or before 7/18/2016. Failure to do so by 7/18/2016 will result in the matter being dismissed without further notice. A copy of this Order was forwarded to Plaintiff via first-class mail. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/17/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5215 FOURTH AMENDED PRETRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER as it relates to NORMA OLMO (CA 13-3820ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/17/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5214 Motion to Extend (as it relates to Olmo CA13-3820ML). Defendant Bard's replies are due by 6/27/2016. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/17/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
June 16, 2016 Filing 5214 MOTION to Extend Case Management Order (as it relates to Olmo, et al (1:13-cv-03820-ML-LDA)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 7/5/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Fourth Amended Case Management Order)(Brown, Michael)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5207 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to PATTY BELL MULLINAX and RICHARD EARL MULLINAX (CA 13-3814ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/15/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
June 13, 2016 Filing 5213 STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS SUPPORTING THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT_ by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo re #5186 Statement of Undisputed Facts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43)(Migliori, Donald)
June 13, 2016 Filing 5212 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5189 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Suzanne Parisian (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 6/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald)
June 13, 2016 Filing 5211 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5188 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Paul Ducheyne (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 6/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Migliori, Donald)
June 13, 2016 Filing 5210 NOTICE by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo re #5186 Statement of Undisputed Facts of Filing in Support of Plaintiff's STatement of Disputed Material Facts In Opposition to Defendant's Statement of Undisputed Facts (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Migliori, Donald)
June 13, 2016 Filing 5209 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5185 MOTION for Summary Judgment (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) (as it relates to Norma Olmo-13-3820) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 6/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 25, #25 Exhibit 26, #26 Exhibit 27, #27 Exhibit 28, #28 Exhibit 29, #29 Exhibit 30, #30 Exhibit 31, #31 Exhibit 32, #32 Exhibit 33, #33 Exhibit 34, #34 Exhibit 35, #35 Exhibit 36, #36 Exhibit 37, #37 Exhibit 38, #38 Exhibit 39, #39 Exhibit 40, #40 Exhibit 41)(Migliori, Donald)
June 13, 2016 Filing 5208 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5187 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Stephen Ferzoco (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) (as it relates to Norma Olmo-13-3820) filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Replies due by 6/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 9-1, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 10-1, #13 Exhibit 11)(Migliori, Donald)
June 8, 2016 Filing 5207 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS PATTY BELL MULLINAX AND RICHARD EARL MULLINAX (1:13-CV-03814-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5203 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to ANNETTE RENTERIA and JUAN RENTERIA (13-0519ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/6/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
June 3, 2016 Filing 5206 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to 08-cv-523 filed by Barbara A. Dodds. Responses due by 6/20/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald)
June 3, 2016 Filing 5205 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to 09-cv-630 ML filed by William K. Denning. Responses due by 6/20/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5204 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery due by 9/1/2016. Expert Discovery due by 12/15/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 12/29/2016. Pretrial Memoranda due by 1/12/2017.Expert disclosures: Plaintiff's due by 10/3/2016; Defendants' due by 11/3/2016. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/3/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
June 3, 2016 Filing 5203 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS ANNETTE RENTERIA & JUAN RENTERIA (1:13-CV-00519-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 3, 2016 Filing 5202 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to 08-cv-203-ML filed by Jenifer Pont. Responses due by 6/20/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5201 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to SHIRLEY COLLINS (CA 08-2599ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/2/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER GRANTING #5200 MOTION to Continue filed by Angela F. Campbell. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/1/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
June 1, 2016 Filing 5201 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF SHIRLEY COLLINS (1:08-CV-02599-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 31, 2016 Filing 5200 Joint Motion to Continue the Scheduling Conference (Bedford, Neville) Modified on 6/1/2016 (Feeley, Susan).
May 31, 2016 Filing 5199 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to 09-672 filed by Angela F. Campbell. Responses due by 6/17/2016 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Military Affidavit)(Migliori, Donald)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5198 THIRD AMENDED PRETRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER as it relates to NORMA OLMO (CA13-3820ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/26/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5197 Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/26/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5196 Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice as to DIANE C. ANDREWS (CA 08-0010). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/26/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
May 25, 2016 Filing 5197 MOTION for an Extension of Time Extend Case Management Order as it relates to 1:13-cv-03820-ML-LDA filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Responses due by 6/13/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Migliori, Donald)
May 25, 2016 Filing 5196 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF DIANE C. ANDREWS (1:08-CV-00010-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 23, 2016 Filing 5195 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to 10-03079 filed by Keanna Frasier. Responses due by 6/9/2016 (Migliori, Donald)
May 23, 2016 Filing 5194 TRANSCRIPT of held on 5/17/16 before Judge Almond. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joseph A. Fontes, Telephone number 5614527507. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 6/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2016. (Fontes, Joseph)
May 20, 2016 Remark - #5193 Transcript Order forwarded to Joseph Fontes, Court Reporter, via email. (Noel, Jeannine)
May 19, 2016 Filing 5193 TRANSCRIPT ORDER (related to Olmo, et al. 13-cv-03820-ML) for proceedings held on 5/17/2016 before Judge Lincoln D. Almond.. (Alexander, Eric)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5192 ORDER granting #5179 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (as it relates to Vera Clay 08-2302ML). Plaintiff shall have successor counsel enter an appearance or enter an appearance pro se on or before 6/20/2016. Failure to do so by 6/20/2016 will result in the matter being dismissed without further notice. A copy of this Order was forwarded to Plaintiff via first-class mail. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/19/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5190 Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice as to JAMES A. CHRISTECK AND FRANCES L. CHRISTECK (CA 08-24420ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/18/2016. (Feeley, Susan) Modified on 5/18/2016 (Feeley, Susan).
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5173 First MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT INTERROGATORIES as it relates to 13-cv-03820-ML-LDA filed by Norma Olmo. Applying the relevancy parameters and the proportionality considerations of Rule 26, Fed. R. Civ. Pro., Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as to her so-called "Boecher" interrogatories is DENIED as to numbers 1-5 and 7, and GRANTED in part as to number 6. Defendants shall, within 30 days, answer number 6 limited to the last three years and to the total compensation paid for serving as a testifying expert in this and other cases against Defendants. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 5/17/2016. (Noel, Jeannine)
May 17, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing held on 5/17/2016 re #5173 First MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS EXPERT INTERROGATORIES as it relates to 13-cv-03820-ML-LDA filed by Norma Olmo. (Parafinczuk, Alexander) Argument; Court takes matter under advisement; Order to follow (Court Reporter FTR in Courtroom A at 3:04 PM.) (Noel, Jeannine)
May 17, 2016 Filing 5191 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to 1:10-cv-03544-ML-LDA filed by Thomas Cole. Responses due by 6/3/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald)
May 16, 2016 Filing 5190 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS JAMES A. CHRISTECK AND FRANCES L. CHRISTECK (1:08-CV-02442-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 16, 2016 Filing 5189 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Suzanne Parisian (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 6/2/2016 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
May 16, 2016 Filing 5188 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Paul Ducheyne (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 6/2/2016 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
May 16, 2016 Filing 5187 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Stephen Ferzoco (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 6/2/2016 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
May 16, 2016 Filing 5186 STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #5185 MOTION for Summary Judgment (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA). (Brown, Michael)
May 16, 2016 Filing 5185 MOTION for Summary Judgment (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., 13-03820-ML-LDA) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 6/2/2016 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5184 ORDER granting #5176 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (as it relates to Gladys Morrison CA 10-3130). Plaintiff shall have successor counsel enter an appearance or enter an appearance pro se on or before 6/17/2016. Failure to do so by 6/17/2016 will result in the matter being dismissed without further notice. A copy of this Order was forwarded to Plaintiff via first-class mail.. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/16/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #5175 Motion to Remand to State Court: No objection has been filed, therefore, Motion to Remand is GRANTED. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/16/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5183 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Nathan DeGraffenried (CA 12-3740ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/16/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
May 12, 2016 Filing 5183 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF NATHAN DEGRAFFENRIED (1:12-cv-03740-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 11, 2016 Filing 5182 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5181 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Answers to Plaintiff's Expert Interrogatories as it relates to 13-cv-03820-ML-LDA filed by Norma Olmo. Replies due by 5/23/2016. (Migliori, Donald)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5181 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Answers to Plaintiff's Expert Interrogatories. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 5/10/2016. (Leyva, Lucia)
May 9, 2016 Filing 5181 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Answers to Plaintiff's Expert Interrogatories filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. Responses due by 5/26/2016 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliori, Donald)
May 5, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi. Telephonic In Chambers Conference held on 5/5/2016. Counsel present: D. Migliori, J. Hooper. (Feeley, Susan)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5180 ORDER granting #5167 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (as it relates to Elsie M. Nieves, CA 09-2825 ML). Plaintiff shall have successor counsel enter an appearance or enter an appearance pro se on or before 5/31/2016. Failure to do so by 5/31/2016 will result in the matter being dismissed without further notice. A copy of this Order was forwarded to Plaintiff via first-class mail. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/2/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
April 29, 2016 Filing 5179 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to 1:08-cv-02302 filed by Vera Clay. Responses due by 5/16/2016 (Migliori, Donald)
April 29, 2016 Filing 5178 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to 1:08-cv-02302 filed by Vera Clay. Responses due by 5/16/2016 (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
April 29, 2016 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC Hearing on Motion #5173 First MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS EXPERT INTERROGATORIES as it relates to Norma Olmo - 1:13-cv-03820-ML-LDA : TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2016 at 03:00 PM (EST) before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Counsel will receive call in instructions via email. (Noel, Jeannine)
April 28, 2016 Filing 5177 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5173 First MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS EXPERT INTERROGATORIES as it relates to 13-cv-03820-ML-LDA (Norma Olmo, et al) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 5/9/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Brown, Michael)
April 21, 2016 Filing 5176 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to 1:10-CV-03130-ML-LDA filed by Gladys Morrison. Responses due by 5/9/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald)
April 20, 2016 Filing 5175 First MOTION to Remand to State Court as it relates to I:12-cv-03710-MDL-LA filed by Quinn Caldwell, William Caldwell. Responses due by 5/9/2016 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Declaration)(Migliori, Donald)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5174 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as it relates to: JOHN BONEY CA 08-2465ML; ROBERT BOSTWICK CA 08-2466ML; REBECCA CHACON CA 08-2469ML; LESLIE DARR CA 08-2467ML; ROSANN ELDRED CA 08-2305ML; LORA JOHNSON CA 08-2472ML; HAZEL LANE CA 08-2471ML; REX LEE CA 08-2311ML; JOYCE MCCONATHY CA 08-2351; RANDAL MCQUILLER CA 08-2314ML; HAZEL NEVIL CA 08-2153; RITA REED CA 08-2352ML; MICHAEL ROOD CA 08-2321ML; CHARLOTTE WRAY CA 08-2475ML; DOROTHY YOUNG CA 08-2326ML. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/15/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
April 11, 2016 Filing 5174 STIPULATION of Dismissal as it relates to several plaintiffs by John Boney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-List of Cases)(Migliori, Donald)
April 11, 2016 Filing 5173 First MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS EXPERT INTERROGATORIES as it relates to 13-cv-03820-ML-LDA filed by Norma Olmo. Responses due by 4/28/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5172 ORDER: re #5171 as to Plaintiff Lorna Katoa (deceased) (CA 10-3075ML). The matter is dismissed with prejudice. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/6/2016. (A copy of the attached Order was forwarded via first-class mail to Plaintiff's representative.)(Feeley, Susan)
April 5, 2016 Filing 5171 RESPONSE to Motion re #4986 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4964 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, filed by Lorna Katoa. Replies due by 4/15/2016. (Migliori, Donald)
April 4, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference with liaison counsel only set for 5/5/2016 at 1:00 PM before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi in Judge Lisi's Chambers - Room 310. (Feeley, Susan)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5170 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to GARY PARSONS (CA 13-3755ML) and ROBIN ROWRAY (CA 11-3606ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/1/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
March 31, 2016 Filing 5170 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5169 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to PHYLLIS A. ANDERSON (CA 10-3504ML) and DONNA KLOSKY (08-2643ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/31/2016. (Feeley, Susan) Modified on 3/31/2016 (Feeley, Susan).
March 30, 2016 Filing 5169 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
March 25, 2016 Filing 5168 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK re #5139 Proposed Voir Dire PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED VOIRE DIRE QUESTIONS. Replies due by 4/1/2016. (Migliori, Donald)
March 22, 2016 Filing 5167 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Elsie M. Nieves. Responses due by 4/8/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5166 Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery (as it relates to Olmo, et al. (CA 13-3820ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/18/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
March 17, 2016 Filing 5166 STIPULATION Regarding Expert Discovery (as it relates to Olmo, et al. (13-03820-ML)) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
March 17, 2016 Filing 5165 NOTICE by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #5144 Proposed Voir Dire Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Voir Dire Questions (as it relates to Bowersock, et al (08-02635)) (Brown, Michael)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5164 NOTICE by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #5145 Response in Opposition Defendants' Objections and Reply Counter-Designations to Plaintiffs Counter-Designation of Deposition Testimony (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) (Brown, Michael)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5163 RESPONSE in Support re #5067 MOTION in Limine NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OR ARGUMENT THAT DEFENDANTS CAUSED OR REQUIRED GEORGIA BOWERSOCKS BODY TO BE EXHUMED (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5162 RESPONSE in Support re #5066 MOTION in Limine NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT RELATED TO "LORD OF THE RINGS" (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5161 RESPONSE in Support re #5065 MOTION in Limine NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF THE DA VINCI AND OTHER ANIMAL STUDIES (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brown, Michael)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5160 RESPONSE in Support re #5064 MOTION in Limine NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER LAWSUITS, INCIDENTS, COMPLAINTS AND MDRS (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5159 RESPONSE in Support re #5063 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO OTHER BARD PRODUCTS (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5158 RESPONSE in Support re #5062 MOTION in Limine NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE LACK OF PERSONAL KNOWLEDGE AND HEARSAY TESTIMONY (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5157 RESPONSE in Support re #5061 MOTION in Limine NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE NON-COGNIZABLE WARNINGS CLAIMS (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5156 RESPONSE in Support re #5060 MOTION in Limine NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF RING BREAK, RECALL, FDA AND INTERNAL INSPECTIONS, AND SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5155 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK re #5125 Notice (Other) to Defendant's Counter-Designation of Deposition Testimony to be used at Trial. Replies due by 3/21/2016. (Migliori, Donald)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5154 RESPONSE in Support re #5079 MOTION in Limine #13 as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5153 RESPONSE in Support re #5077 MOTION in Limine #11 as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5152 RESPONSE in Support re #5076 MOTION in Limine #10 as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Migliori, Donald)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5151 RESPONSE in Support re #5074 MOTION in Limine #8 as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5150 RESPONSE in Support re #5073 MOTION in Limine #7 as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5149 RESPONSE in Support re #5070 MOTION in Limine #4 as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5148 RESPONSE in Support re #5081 MOTION in Limine #3 as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5147 RESPONSE in Support re #5059 Second MOTION in Limine as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald)
March 14, 2016 Filing 5146 RESPONSE in Support re #5057 First MOTION in Limine as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald)
March 8, 2016 Filing 5145 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK re #5069 Notice (Other) Revised-as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635. Replies due by 3/15/2016. (Migliori, Donald)
March 7, 2016 Filing 5144 Proposed Voir Dire by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK.(Migliori, Donald)
March 7, 2016 Filing 5143 NOTICE by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc Joint Trial Exhibit List (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. 08-02635) (Brown, Michael)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5142 SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER as it relates to NORMA OLMO (CA 13-3820ML). Dispositive motions to be filed by 5/16/2016. (Final Pretrial Conference & Jury Empanelment dates to be determined. See Section F, Page 3 of the attached Order. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/7/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
March 7, 2016 TELEPHONIC IN CHAMBERS CONFERENCE CANCELLED. In chambers conference set for 3/7/2017 is cancelled. (Feeley, Susan)
March 3, 2016 Filing 5141 Proposed Jury Instructions by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK.(Migliori, Donald)
March 3, 2016 Filing 5140 Proposed Jury Instructions by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK.(Migliori, Donald)
March 3, 2016 Filing 5139 Proposed Voir Dire by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc.(Brown, Michael)
March 3, 2016 Filing 5138 Proposed Jury Instructions by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc.(Brown, Michael)
March 3, 2016 Filing 5137 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK in support of #5039 Response in Opposition to Motion, as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4)(Migliori, Donald)
March 3, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic In Chambers Conference set for 3/7/2016 10:30 AM before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi. This conference pertains only to Plaintiff NORMA OLMO (CA 13-3820). Counsel will be provided with call-in instructions.(Feeley, Susan)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5136 TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5134 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Plaintiffs HELEN JOAN WORLEY and HORACE L. WORLEY (CA 10-3065ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/3/2016. (Feeley, Susan) Modified on 3/3/2016 to note that there is no document attached -- document #5136 is listed in error. (Feeley, Susan).
March 2, 2016 Filing 5135 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5100 MOTION for Leave to File Document PLAINTIFFS OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AND SERVE EXPERT REPORTS (as it relates to Norma Olmo 13-03820-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Brown, Michael)
March 2, 2016 Filing 5134 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS HELEN JOAN WORLEY AND HORACE L. WORLEY (1:10-CV-03065-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5133 ORDER as it relates to Lorna Katoa (CA 10-3075ML). The Court grants a final extension until and including 4/2/2016 to have successor counsel enter an appearance. Unless successor counsel enters an appearance on or before 4/2/2016, the case will be dismissed with prejudice. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/2/2016. A copy of this Order forwarded to Louisa Katoa via first-class mail. (Feeley, Susan)
March 1, 2016 Filing 5132 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Lorna Katoa. (Migliori, Donald)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5102 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to ELDON LEE WOOD (CA 13-3828ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/1/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5101 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to MAGDL MAHFOUZ (CA 08-2446ML); CLARISSA MAHR (CA 07-1933ML); JOHN PUNTURO (CA 10-3046ML); AMY SUMMERS (CA 09-3000ML); JACQUELINE WESSLER (CA 08-2447ML); WAYNE WORMAN (CA 10-3094ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/1/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5130 MOTION to Seal Document . (Jackson, Kerrie) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 29, 2016 Filing 5128 MOTION to Seal Document . (Jackson, Kerrie) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 29, 2016 Filing 5126 MOTION to Seal Document . (Jackson, Kerrie) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 29, 2016 Filing 5125 NOTICE by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #5096 NOTICE by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK of Plaintiffs Second Amended Designation of Deposition Testimony to be Offered as Evidence at Trial. (Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5124 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK re #5069 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Deposition Designations and Counter-Designation of Deposition Testimony to be Offered at Trial. Replies due by 3/7/2016. (Migliori, Donald)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5123 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK in opposition to #5065 MOTION in Limine NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF THE DA VINCI AND OTHER ANIMAL STUDIES (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 11, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Exhibit 17, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliori, Donald)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5122 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK in opposition to #5064 MOTION in Limine NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER LAWSUITS, INCIDENTS, COMPLAINTS AND MDRS (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliori, Donald)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5121 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK in opposition to #5060 MOTION in Limine NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF RING BREAK, RECALL, FDA AND INTERNAL INSPECTIONS, AND SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliori, Donald)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5120 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK in opposition to #5067 MOTION in Limine NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OR ARGUMENT THAT DEFENDANTS CAUSED OR REQUIRED GEORGIA BOWERSOCKS BODY TO BE EXHUMED (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliori, Donald)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5119 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK in opposition to #5066 MOTION in Limine NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT RELATED TO "LORD OF THE RINGS" (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliori, Donald)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5118 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK in opposition to #5063 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO OTHER BARD PRODUCTS (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliori, Donald)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5117 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK in opposition to #5062 MOTION in Limine NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE LACK OF PERSONAL KNOWLEDGE AND HEARSAY TESTIMONY (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliori, Donald)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5116 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK in opposition to #5061 MOTION in Limine NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE NON-COGNIZABLE WARNINGS CLAIMS (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliori, Donald)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5115 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5079 MOTION in Limine #13 (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5114 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5078 MOTION in Limine #12 (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5113 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5077 MOTION in Limine #11 (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5076 MOTION in Limine #10 (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5111 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5075 MOTION in Limine #9 (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5110 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5074 MOTION in Limine #8 (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5109 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5073 MOTION in Limine #7 (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5108 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5072 MOTION in Limine #6 (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5107 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5071 MOTION in Limine #5 (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5106 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5081 MOTION in Limine #3 (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5105 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5070 MOTION in Limine #4 (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5104 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5059 Second MOTION in Limine as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 Bowersock, et al. filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5103 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5057 First MOTION in Limine as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 Bowersock, et al. filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 3/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5102 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ELDON LEE WOOD (1:13-CV-03828-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 29, 2016 Filing 5101 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
February 26, 2016 Filing 5100 MOTION for Leave to File Document PLAINTIFFS OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AND SERVE EXPERT REPORTS filed by Norma Olmo. Responses due by 3/14/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 25, 2016 Filing 5099 Proposed MOTION for Disclosure Plaintiffs' Pre-Trial Exhibit Disclosure filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. Responses due by 3/14/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Migliori, Donald)
February 25, 2016 Filing 5098 Proposed MOTION for Disclosure Plaintiffs' Pre-Trial Witness Disclosure filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. Responses due by 3/14/2016 (Migliori, Donald)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5097 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Plaintiff LAURA JONES, CA12-3728ML. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/25/2016. (Feeley, Susan) Modified on 2/25/2016 (Feeley, Susan).
February 24, 2016 Filing 5097 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF LAURA JONES (1:12-CV-03728-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 22, 2016 Filing 5096 NOTICE by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK of Plaintiffs Second Amended Designation of Deposition Testimony to be Offered as Evidence at Trial (Attachments: #1 Supplement Amended Deposition Designations part 2)(Migliori, Donald)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5093 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to JAMES S. DUGGINS (CA10-3539ML) and KATHY D. WATSON (CA10-3318ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/22/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
February 19, 2016 Filing 5095 RESPONSE in Support re #5025 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants' Expert Opinions and Testimony, filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK, MARK BOWERSOCK, CHARLOTTE ROBINSON as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald)
February 19, 2016 Filing 5094 RESPONSE in Support re #5024 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert William Hyman, Sc.D. (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8)(Brown, Michael)
February 19, 2016 Filing 5093 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
February 19, 2016 Filing 5092 RESPONSE IS SUPPORT re #5021 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Stephen Ferzoco (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (CA 08-02635) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10)(Brown, Michael) Modified document description on 2/19/2016 (Jackson, Kerrie).
February 19, 2016 Filing 5091 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT re #5023 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Plainitiffs' Expert Dr. Roland Kohr (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (CA 08-02635) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol Inc.. (Brown, Michael) Modified document description on 2/19/2016 (Jackson, Kerrie).
February 19, 2016 Filing 5090 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT re #5022 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Suzanne Parisian, M.D. (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (CA 08-02635) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol Inc.. (Brown, Michael) Modified document description on 2/19/2016 (Jackson, Kerrie).
February 18, 2016 Filing 5089 RESPONSE (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #5046 Statement of Disputed Facts. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 33, #2 Exhibit 34)(Brown, Michael) Modified document description on 2/19/2016 (Jackson, Kerrie).
February 18, 2016 Filing 5088 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT re #5019 MOTION for Summary Judgment (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32)(Brown, Michael) Modified document description on 2/19/2016 (Jackson, Kerrie).
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5087 Stipulation of dismissal with prejudice as to REBECCA DEAN (CA 09-3034ML), CODY BILL HARMON (CA 10-3280ML), CYNTHIA KOSKELA (CA 09-2921ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/18/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
February 17, 2016 Filing 5087 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
February 16, 2016 Filing 5086 NOTICE by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK Plaintiffs' Amended Designation of Deposition Testimony to be Offered as Evidence at Trial (Migliori, Donald)
February 16, 2016 Filing 5084 MOTION to Seal Document , by Plaintiffs'. (Jackson, Kerrie) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 16, 2016 Filing 5082 MOTION to Seal Document , by Plaintiffs'. (Jackson, Kerrie) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 16, 2016 Filing 5081 MOTION in Limine #3 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5080 NOTICE by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK Plaintiffs' Designation of Deposition Testimony to be Offered as Evidence at Trial (Migliori, Donald)
February 15, 2016 Filing 5079 MOTION in Limine #13 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5078 MOTION in Limine #12 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5077 MOTION in Limine #11 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5076 MOTION in Limine #10 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5075 MOTION in Limine #9 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5074 MOTION in Limine #8 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5073 MOTION in Limine #7 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5072 MOTION in Limine #6 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5071 MOTION in Limine #5 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5070 MOTION in Limine #4 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5069 NOTICE by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc of Designations of Deposition Testimony to be Offered as Evidence at Trial (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) (Brown, Michael)
February 15, 2016 Filing 5068 MOTION in Limine NO. 9 TO ADOPT CERTAIN PRETRIAL RULINGS PREVIOUSLY ENTERED IN WHITFIELD AND THORPE (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5067 MOTION in Limine NO. 8 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OR ARGUMENT THAT DEFENDANTS CAUSED OR REQUIRED GEORGIA BOWERSOCKS BODY TO BE EXHUMED (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5066 MOTION in Limine NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT RELATED TO "LORD OF THE RINGS" (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5065 MOTION in Limine NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF THE DA VINCI AND OTHER ANIMAL STUDIES (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5064 MOTION in Limine NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF OTHER LAWSUITS, INCIDENTS, COMPLAINTS AND MDRS (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5063 MOTION in Limine NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCE TO OTHER BARD PRODUCTS (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5062 MOTION in Limine NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE LACK OF PERSONAL KNOWLEDGE AND HEARSAY TESTIMONY (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5061 MOTION in Limine NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE NON-COGNIZABLE WARNINGS CLAIMS (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5060 MOTION in Limine NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE AND ARGUMENT OF RING BREAK, RECALL, FDA AND INTERNAL INSPECTIONS, AND SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 15, 2016 Filing 5059 Second MOTION in Limine as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 12, 2016 Filing 5057 First MOTION in Limine as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 12, 2016 Filing 5056 MOTION to Seal Document , by Plaintiffs'. (Jackson, Kerrie) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 12, 2016 Filing 5053 NOTICE by Cathleen Marquardt, Rickie Patton of Withdrawal of Counsel (Migliori, Donald)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #5040 Motion to Seal Document. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/12/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5048 Stipulation filed of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Plaintiff Charmaine Strom CA 08-0537. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/12/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
February 11, 2016 Filing 5054 MOTION to Seal Document , by Plaintiffs'. (Jackson, Kerrie) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 11, 2016 Filing 5051 MOTION to Seal Document , by Plaintiffs'. (Jackson, Kerrie) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 11, 2016 Filing 5049 MOTION to Seal Document . (Jackson, Kerrie) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
February 11, 2016 Filing 5048 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF CHARMAINE STROM (1:08-CV-00537-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 11, 2016 Filing 5047 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK in opposition to #5023 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Plainitiffs' Expert Dr. Roland Kohr (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (CA 08-02635) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Migliori, Donald)
February 11, 2016 Filing 5046 STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635 by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK re #5020 Statement of Undisputed Facts. (Migliori, Donald)
February 11, 2016 Filing 5045 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5025 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants' Expert Opinions and Testimony, filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK, MARK BOWERSOCK, CHARLOTTE ROBINSON (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-2635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 2/22/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Brown, Michael)
February 11, 2016 Filing 5044 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK in opposition to #5019 MOTION for Summary Judgment as it relates to 1:08-cv-2635. (Migliori, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2016: #1 Exhbit 2, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 71 (Part 1), #4 Part 2, #5 Part 3, #6 Part 4, #7 Part 5) (Jackson, Kerrie).
February 11, 2016 Filing 5043 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK in opposition to #5021 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Stephen Ferzoco (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (CA 08-02635) . (Migliori, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2016: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 8) (Jackson, Kerrie).
February 11, 2016 Filing 5042 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK in opposition to #5024 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert William Hyman, Sc.D. (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635) . (Migliori, Donald) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2016: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit 11) (Jackson, Kerrie).
February 10, 2016 Filing 5040 MOTION to Seal Document , by Donald A. Migliori. (Jackson, Kerrie)
February 10, 2016 Filing 5039 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5022 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Suzanne Parisian, M.D. (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (CA 08-02635) filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. Replies due by 2/22/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3)(Migliori, Donald)
February 5, 2016 Filing 5038 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5027 First MOTION to Stay Pending Renewed Motion for Remand (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 2/16/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5037 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Plaintiff GAYLE H. LEE (CA 14-3864ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/4/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5036 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the following Plaintiffs in CA 13-3826ML: SANDRA CORLESS, REBECCA CORNWELL, LOYOLA RODRIGUEZ, MISTY STANFIELD. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/4/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5035 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to BARBARA BEVERLY (CA 11-3615ML), DAVID FISHER (CA 13-3753ML), RAYMOND GEESTON (CA 09-2991ML), HAROLD HAGIN (CA 10-3159ML), GEORGIA MERRILL-RIVAS (CA 11-3659ML), SHERYLE ROUSE (CA 13-3745ML), KELLEY RUIZ (CA 13-3783ML), DARLA RUSSELL (CA 11-3658ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/4/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
February 3, 2016 Filing 5037 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF GAYLE H. LEE (1:14-CV-03864-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 3, 2016 Filing 5036 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
February 3, 2016 Filing 5035 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/3/2016) (Feeley, Susan).
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5034 ORDER as it relates to Lorna Katoa (CA 10-3075ML). Plaintiff shall, on or before 3/2/2016, file a stipulation of dismissal with the Court signed by both parties, or have successor counsel enter an appearance. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice. A copy of this Order forwarded to Louise Katoa via first-class mail. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/1/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5033 ORDER granting #5031 Motion to Amend/Correct. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/1/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5030 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Plaintiff Robert F. Davis CA 11-3662ML. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/1/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5029 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Alan D. Gusan CA10-3435ML and Richard Hines CA13-3810ML. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/1/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
February 1, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi: In Chambers Conference held on 2/1/2016 relating to Lorna Katoa (CA 10-3075ML). (Feeley, Susan) Modified on 2/1/2016 (Feeley, Susan).
February 1, 2016 Filing 5032 RESPONSE to Motion re #5031 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct CMO Deadlines (as it relates to Bowersock, et al (CA 08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 2/11/2016. (Brown, Michael)
February 1, 2016 Filing 5031 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct CMO Deadlines filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. Responses due by 2/18/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald)
January 29, 2016 Filing 5030 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ROBERT F. DAVIS (1:11-CV-03662-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
January 29, 2016 Filing 5029 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
January 28, 2016 Filing 5028 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5026 Response in Opposition to Motion, for Remand filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald)
January 21, 2016 Filing 5027 First MOTION to Stay Pending Renewed Motion for Remand filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK. Responses due by 2/8/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
January 21, 2016 Filing 5026 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5018 MOTION to Remand to United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana-Indianapolis Division (as it relates to Bowersock, et al (CA 08-02635-ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 2/1/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
January 18, 2016 Filing 5025 First MOTION in Limine to Exclude Defendants' Expert Opinions and Testimony, filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK, MARK BOWERSOCK, CHARLOTTE ROBINSON WITH SUPPORTING MEMO. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhbit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D (part 1), #6 Exhibit D (part 2), #7 Exhibit D (part 3), #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P)(Jackson, Kerrie) Modified on 1/21/2016 Responses due: 2/3/2016. (Feeley, Susan). Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
January 18, 2016 Filing 5024 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert William Hyman, Sc.D. (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (08-02635) WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 2/4/2016 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
January 18, 2016 Filing 5023 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Plainitiffs' Expert Dr. Roland Kohr (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (CA 08-02635) WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 2/4/2016 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
January 18, 2016 Filing 5022 MOTION to Limit the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Suzanne Parisian, M.D. (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (CA 08-02635) WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 2/4/2016 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
January 18, 2016 Filing 5021 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Dr. Stephen Ferzoco (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (CA 08-02635) WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 2/4/2016 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
January 18, 2016 Filing 5020 STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS (as it relates to Bowersock, et al. (CA 08-02635) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #5019 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Brown, Michael)
January 18, 2016 Filing 5019 MOTION for Summary Judgment WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 2/4/2016 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30)(Brown, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
January 11, 2016 Filing 5018 RENEWED MOTION to Remand to United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana-Indianapolis Division. Responses due by 1/28/2016 (Attachments: #1 Order)(Jackson, Kerrie) Modified on 3/22/2017 (Smith, Rana).
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5007 MOTION to Strike #4996 Reply to Response to Motion, (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al. (CA 08-2635ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Plaintiffs' Reply Brief (Document No. 4996) is stricken for violating Local Rule CV 7(b)(2). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/7/2016. (Noel, Jeannine)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #4995 MOTION to Compel Redacted Patient Records from Plaintiffs' Expert Stephen Ferzoco, M.D. (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al. (CA 08-2635ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2)(B), Fed. R. Civ. P., Dr. Ferzoco's expert report must contain a "complete statement of all opinions [he] will express and the basis and reasons for them" and "the facts or data considered by the witness in forming them." Thus, any opinions expressed by Dr. Ferzoco in his deposition that were not disclosed in his report are subject to exclusion at trial. Further, Plaintiffs have not sought leave to amend Dr. Ferzoco's report and thus they are limited to the opinions expressed therein. Since Defendants are seeking discovery in support of an undisclosed and excludable opinion, their Motion is unnecessary. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/7/2016. (Noel, Jeannine)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #4971 MOTION to Determine the Sufficiency of Responses to Request for Admissions and Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Associated Interrogatories (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al., CA 08-2635ML) WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK, CHARLOTTE ROBINSON. Plaintiffs' Motion is not in the form required by Local Rule CV 37(a) and does not substantively address each of the responses claimed to be deficient. Thus, it is unsupported and does not convince the Court that Defendants have failed to meet their discovery obligations under Rule 36(a), Fed. R. Civ. P. Finally, the majority of the requests are not directed at case-specific discovery and, in any event, Defendants fairly responded to the substance of Plaintiffs' requests as worded. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/7/2016. (Noel, Jeannine)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #4970 MOTION to Compel Discovery Regarding Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al., CA 08-2635ML) filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK et al. Plaintiffs' Motion is not directed at case-specific discovery. The Iannitti Study has previously been the subject of extensive common discovery during this MDL proceeding and litigation during both the Whitfield and Thorpe bellwether trials. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/7/2016. (Noel, Jeannine)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4919 MOTION to Compel Discovery Related to Georgia Bowersock (CA 08-2635ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. GRANTED as to Interrogatories 6 and 14-20, and otherwise DENIED. Plaintiffs shall fully and more specifically respond to these Interrogatories by January 29, 2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/7/2016. (Noel, Jeannine)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #4916 MOTION to Compel Discovery (as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock, CA 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. DENIED based on Plaintiffs' counsels representation that the damages documents sought by Defendants "have either already been produced, been requested by Plaintiffs, or simply do not exist." (Document No. 4949 at p. 9). However, absent good cause shown, Plaintiffs are precluded from introducing any documents at trial that are not produced to Defendant by January 29, 2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/7/2016. (Noel, Jeannine)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #4989 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Sales Representative and Corporate Representative with Most Knowledge Regarding the Current Financial Worth of Defendants (as it relates to NORMA OLMO, et al., CA 08-2635ML). First, pursuant to this Court's May 7, 2014 Order in the Cotten case (Document No. 4559) and the unequivocal testimony of Dr. Comperatore that "whatever [he] heard from the Davol rep doesn't mean a thing to [him] because [he] wouldn't use it as a scientific fact to treat [his] patients," Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition of Defendants' Sales Representative is DENIED. Second, the issue of financial worth is not case-specific discovery and has been the subject of common discovery which has concluded. Plaintiff has not acknowledged her access to this common discovery or shown that such information would not be sufficient to support her punitive damages argument. Finally, it should be noted that there was not sufficient evidence presented at either the Whitfield or Thorpe bellwether trials to support a punitive damages claim based on the evidence of corporate conduct gathered during common discovery. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/7/2016. (Noel, Jeannine)
January 6, 2016 Filing 5017 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5014 Response in Opposition to Motion (as it relates to Bowersock, et al.(CA 08-02635)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
January 5, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 2/1/2016 12:00 Noon (Eastern Standard Time) (relating to Lorna Katoa CA10-3075.) Counsel and representatives for Plaintiff will be provided call-in instructions. Notice of hearing forwarded to representatives for Plaintiff via first-class mail.(Feeley, Susan)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5015 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Karen Sue Richardson CA 13-3780. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 1/5/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
January 4, 2016 Filing 5015 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF KAREN SUE RICHARDSON (1:13-CV-03780-ML-LDA by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
January 4, 2016 Filing 5014 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5007 MOTION to Strike #4996 Reply to Response to Motion, (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al. (CA 08-2635ML)). Replies due by 1/14/2016. (Jackson, Kerrie)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting absent opposition #4981 MOTION to Seal Document (Exhibits 4, 5, 6, 7, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14 in support of Defendants' #4979 Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' #4970 Motion to Compel Discovery; as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al; CA 08-2635ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 12/30/2015. (Noel, Jeannine)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5012 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Yvette Espinoza CA 13-3840ML and Katie Moseby CA 14-3857ML. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/29/2015. (Feeley, Susan)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5011 Stipulation Of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Ruth Segarra and Henry Segarra CA 13-3791ML. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/29/2015. (Feeley, Susan)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5010 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Jon Stolzer CA 13-3750. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/29/2015. (Feeley, Susan)
December 28, 2015 Filing 5013 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5006 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Compel Redacted Patient Records from Plaintiffs' Expert Stephen Ferzoco, M.D. filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Alexander, Eric)
December 28, 2015 Filing 5012 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
December 28, 2015 Filing 5011 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS RUTH SEGARRA AND HENRY SEGARRA (1:13-CV-03791-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
December 28, 2015 Filing 5010 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF JON STOLZER (1:13-CV-03750-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5008 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Plaintiff Brian Beal (CA 08-2370 ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/22/2015. (Feeley, Susan)
December 21, 2015 Filing 5009 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5001 Response in Opposition to Motion, (as it relates to Norma Olme, et al v. Davol and Bard CA13-3820ML). (Jackson, Kerrie)
December 21, 2015 Filing 5008 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF BRIAN BEAL (1:08-CV-02370-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
December 18, 2015 Filing 5007 MOTION to Strike #4996 Reply to Response to Motion, (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al. (CA 08-2635ML)) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 1/4/2016 (Brown, Michael)
December 17, 2015 Filing 5006 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4995 MOTION to Compel Redacted Patient Records from Plaintiffs' Expert Stephen Ferzoco, M.D. (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al. (CA 08-2635ML). Replies due by 12/28/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Jackson, Kerrie)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5004 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Delores Elam CA 09-2716ML. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/17/2015. (Feeley, Susan)
December 16, 2015 Filing 5005 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #4998 Response to Order to Show Cause as it relates to Plaintiff Lorna Katoa (1:10-CV-3075-ML-LDA). (Hooper, John)
December 16, 2015 Filing 5004 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF DELORES ELAM (1:09-CV-02716-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - DENIED without prejudice to Defendants filing a motion to strike Plaintiffs' reply as noncompliant with Local Rule CV 7(b)(2) #5003 MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-Reply (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al., CA 08-2635ML). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 12/15/2015. (Noel, Jeannine)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #5002 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the Plaintiffs LAWRENCE AND PRICILLA MONTOYA (09-02712 ML) and MARY AND MARCELO VEGA (09-02688 ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/15/2015. (Feeley, Susan)
December 14, 2015 Filing 5003 MOTION for Leave to File Document Sur-Reply (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al., CA 08-2635ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 12/31/2015 (Brown, Michael)
December 14, 2015 Filing 5002 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
December 10, 2015 Filing 5001 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4989 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Sales Representative and Corporate Representative with Most Knowledge Regarding the Current Financial Worth of Defendants , (as it relates to Norma Olmo, et al., CA 13-03820ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 12/21/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Brown, Michael)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5000 ORDER granting #4980 Motion for Second Payment of Common Benefit Attorneys' Fees. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/8/2015. (Duhamel, John)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4999 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/8/2015. (Feeley, Susan)
December 7, 2015 Filing 4999 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF REBECCA MAY (1:12-CV-03698-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
December 7, 2015 Filing 4998 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Lorna Katoa (as it relates to CA 10-3075ML). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Duhamel, John)
December 7, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi: Telephone Conference with liaison counsel held on 12/7/2015. Counsel participating: D. Migliori; E. Gladbach. (Feeley, Susan)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER ENTERING #4997 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Andy Valence CA 08-2498 ML. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/4/2015. (Feeley, Susan)
December 3, 2015 Filing 4997 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ANDY VALENCE (1:08-CV-02498-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
December 3, 2015 Filing 4996 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4987 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4971 MOTION to Determine the Sufficiency of Responses to Request for Admissions and Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Associated Interrogatories (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al., CA 08-2635ML) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duhamel, John)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4994 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to LYNNE KAVOURGIAS (CA 08-2071-ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/1/2015. (Duhamel, John)
November 30, 2015 Filing 4995 MOTION to Compel Redacted Patient Records from Plaintiffs' Expert Stephen Ferzoco, M.D. (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al. (CA 08-2635ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 12/17/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Brown, Michael)
November 30, 2015 Filing 4994 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF LYNNE KAVOURGIAS (1:08-CV-02071-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4993 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to STEPHAN KOSA (CA 13-3836ML), BRENT S. RICE (CA 08-2231ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/30/2015. (Duhamel, John)
November 25, 2015 Filing 4993 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice re: #4992 Stipulation of Dismissal as to DEBRA REEDY (CA 09-2881ML), #4991 Stipulation of Dismissal as to WILLIAM and QUINN CALDWELL (CA 12-3710ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/25/2015. (Duhamel, John)
November 24, 2015 Filing 4992 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS WILLIAM CALDWELL AND QUINN CALDWELL (1:12-CV-03710-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
November 24, 2015 Filing 4991 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF DEBRA REEDY (1:09-CV-02881-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4990 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #4967 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Ms. Vasilchek's Custodial File. (RELATES TO Bowersock v. Davol, Inc., CA No. 08-2635ML) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/24/2015. (Noel, Jeannine) Modified on 11/24/2015 (Noel, Jeannine).
November 23, 2015 Filing 4989 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Sales Representative and Corporate Representative with Most Knowledge Regarding the Current Financial Worth of Defendants (as it relates to NORMA OLMO, et al., CA 08-2635ML) , filed by Norma Olmo. Responses due by 12/10/2015 (Jackson, Kerrie)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4988 ORDER granting #4986 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response as to #4964 Order granting Motion for Order to Show Cause (as it relates to Katoa, CA 10-3075ML). Plaintiff's response is due 12/7/2015. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/23/2015. (Jackson, Kerrie) Modified on 11/25/2015 to add ruling to docket text. (Duhamel, John).
November 23, 2015 Filing 4987 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4971 MOTION to Determine the Sufficiency of Responses to Request for Admissions and Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Associated Interrogatories (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al., CA 08-2635ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 12/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brown, Michael)
November 20, 2015 Filing 4986 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4964 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause(as it relates to KATOA, et al. CA 10-375) . Responses due by 12/7/2015 (Jackson, Kerrie)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4985 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Anthony Novak, Kathleen Smith Novak (as it relates to NOVAK, CA 14-3868ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/20/2015. (Duhamel, John)
November 19, 2015 Filing 4985 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Anthony Novak, Kathleen Smith Novak (as it relates to NOVAK, CA 14-3868ML) (Duhamel, John)
November 19, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference with liaison counsel set for Monday, 12/7/2015 at 01:00 PM (EST) before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi. Liaison counsel have been provided with call-in instructions.(Feeley, Susan)
November 18, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing held on 11/18/2015 re #4916 MOTION to Compel Discovery (as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock, CA 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc, #4970 MOTION to Compel Discovery Regarding Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production (as it relates to BOWERSOCK, CA 08-2635ML) filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK, #4919 MOTION to Compel Discovery Related to Georgia Bowersock (CA 08-2635ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc, #4967 MOTION to Compel Custodial File of Jennifer Vasilchek (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al. (CA 08-2635ML) filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK (Dassow, Alexander) Argument; Court takes matter under advisement; Orders to follow (Courtroom A at 3:02 pm.) (Noel, Jeannine)
November 18, 2015 Filing 4984 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4979 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4970 MOTION to Compel Discovery Regarding Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production (as it relates to BOWERSOCK, CA 08-2635ML), filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duhamel, John)
November 17, 2015 Filing 4983 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4978 Response in Opposition to #4967 MOTION to Compel Custodial File of Jennifer Vasilchek (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al.; CA 08-2635ML), filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Duhamel, John)
November 17, 2015 Filing 4981 MOTION to Seal Document (Exhibits 4, 5, 6, 7, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14 in support of Defendants' #4979 Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs #4970 Motion to Compel Discovery; as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al; CA 08-2635ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Duhamel, John)
November 17, 2015 Filing 4980 MOTION FOR SECOND PAYMENT OF COMMON BENEFIT ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS OF EXCESS COMMON BENEFIT EXPENSE FUNDS filed by Plaintiffs as it relates to all actions. Responses due by 12/4/2015 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Duhamel, John)
November 16, 2015 Filing 4979 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4970 MOTION to Compel Discovery Regarding Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production (as it relates to BOWERSOCK, CA 08-2635ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 11/27/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10 (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit 11 (Filed Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 12 (Filed Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 13 (Filed Under Seal), #14 Exhibit 14 (Filed Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 15)(Brown, Michael)
November 16, 2015 Filing 4978 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4967 MOTION to Compel Custodial File of Jennifer Vasilchek (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al. (CA 08-2635ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 11/27/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brown, Michael)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4977 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to GARDNER D. JAYJOHN & DAWN M. JAYJOHN (CA 11-3575-ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/13/2015. (Duhamel, John)
November 12, 2015 Filing 4977 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS GARDNER D. JAYJOHN AND DAWN M. JAYJOHN (1:11-CV-03575-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4976 ORDER (by Stipulation) Lifting Stay for Limited Purpose of Deposing Decedent's Explanting Physician, Dr. John Langell (as it relates to Plaintiffs Estate of Virta Bennett, Dwena Jo Wilson, Audie Canida and Elizabeth Galloway; CA 09-3028ML); and, WITHDRAWING #4924 Motion for Order to Show Cause (as it relates to Plaintiffs Estate of Virta Bennett, Dwena Jo Wilson, Audie Canida and Elizabeth Galloway; CA 09-3028ML). -- Mediation in this matter shall be scheduled no later than May 1, 2016. -- So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/10/2015. (Duhamel, John)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4974 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to HELEN D. DELAINE (CA 09-2998ML), HENRY/PEGGY PAUROWSKI (CA 12-3682ML); entering #4975 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to BRENDA DANNS (CA 08-2494ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/9/2015. (Duhamel, John)
November 9, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi: Telephonic Hearing held on 11/9/2015 re #4924 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as it relates to Plaintiffs Estate of Virta Bennett, Dwena Jo Wilson, Audie Canida and Elizabeth Galloway (CA 09-3028ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. -- Counsel particpating: Adam Ford, John Hooper -- The Amended Stipulation and Proposed Order filed at #4973 is WITHDRAWN. A new Stipulation is to be submitted by counsel, with a notice of withdrawal of the #4924 Motion for Order to Show Cause. (Court Reporter Denise Veitch.) (Duhamel, John)
November 6, 2015 Filing 4975 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF BRENDA DANNS (1:08-CV-02494-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
November 6, 2015 Filing 4974 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
November 6, 2015 SECOND ADDITIONAL NOTICE of TELEPHONIC Hearing on Motion #4970 MOTION to Compel Discovery Regarding Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production (as it relates to BOWERSOCK, CA 08-2635ML) : TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2015 03:00 PM (EST) before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. This motion is added to the hearing previously scheduled. Same call in instructions apply. (Noel, Jeannine)
November 6, 2015 Filing 4973 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO TELEPHONIC HEARING HELD BEFORE SENIOR JUDGE LISI ON 11/9/2015 ----AMENDED STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Lift Stay for Limited Purpose of Deposing Decedent's Explanting Physician Dr. John Langell (as it relates to Plaintiffs Estate of Virta Bennett, Dwena Jo Wilson, Audie Canida and Elizabeth Galloway (CA 09-3028ML), by Estate of Virta Bennett, Dwena Jo Wilson, Audie Canida and Elizabeth Galloway. (amending Stipulation previously attached to Dkt. No. #4956 )(Duhamel, John)
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4972 AMENDED PRETRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (granting #4969 Joint MOTION to Amend #4852 Case Management Order entered on 7/22/2015 (as it relates to NORMA OLMO et al. -- CA 13-3820ML). Dispositive motions to be filed by 3/8/2016. (Final Pretrial Conference & Jury Empanelment dates to be determined. See Section F, Page 3 of the attached order.) -- So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/6/2015. (Duhamel, John)
November 5, 2015 Filing 4971 MOTION to Determine the Sufficiency of Responses to Request for Admissions and Compel Responses to Plaintiff's Associated Interrogatories (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al., CA 08-2635ML) WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK, CHARLOTTE ROBINSON. Responses due by 11/23/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Smith, Rana)
November 4, 2015 Filing 4970 MOTION to Compel Discovery Regarding Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al., CA 08-2635ML) filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK et al. Responses due by 11/23/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Duhamel, John)
November 4, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi: Settlement Conference re Plaintiffs RUTH/HENRY SEGARRA (CA 13-3791ML) held on 11/4/2015. (Duhamel, John)
November 4, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi: Settlement Conference re Plaintiff PATRICIA BEEKES (CA 12-472ML) held on 11/4/2015. (Duhamel, John)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4968 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacqueline K. Seidel. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/4/2015. (Duhamel, John)
November 4, 2015 Filing 4969 Joint MOTION to Amend #4852 Case Management Order entered on 7/22/2015 (as it relates to NORMA OLMO et al. -- CA 13-3820ML), filed by C.R. Bard, Inc; Davol, Inc; Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended CMO)(Duhamel, John)
November 4, 2015 ADDITIONAL NOTICE of TELEPHONIC Hearing on Motion #4967 MOTION to Compel Custodial File of Jennifer Vasilchek (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al. (CA 08-2635ML) : TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2015 03:00 PM (EST) before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. This motion is added to the hearing previously scheduled. Same call in instructions apply. (Noel, Jeannine)
November 4, 2015 Filing 4968 MOTION for Jacqueline K. Seidel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-909086 ) filed by Davol, Inc. (Robinson, Thomas)
November 3, 2015 Filing 4967 MOTION to Compel Custodial File of Jennifer Vasilchek (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al. (CA 08-2635ML) filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK et al. Responses due by 11/20/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Duhamel, John)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4966 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Karen Marigny (CA12-3700ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/2/2016. (Feeley, Susan)
November 3, 2015 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion re #4924 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as it relates to Plaintiffs Estate of Virta Bennett, Dwena Jo Wilson, Audie Canida and Elizabeth Galloway (CA 09-3028ML): Telephonic Motion Hearing set for MONDAY, 11/9/2015 at 11:00 AM (EST) before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi. (Participating counsel have been provided with call-in instructions).(Duhamel, John)
November 3, 2015 PLEASE NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY: REVISED NOTICE re Settlement Conference as to RUTH & HENRY SEGARRA (CA 13-3791ML) previously set for 11/4/2015 at 2:00 p.m. -- Settlement Conference has been reset for 1:00 p.m. that same day, pending the arrival of Plaintiffs in Providence. (Duhamel, John)
November 3, 2015 NOTICE of CANCELLATION of 11/4/2015 Settlement Conference as to KAREN MARIGNY (CA 12-3700ml) previously set for 12:00 NOON. Case has been settled. See Dkt. No. #4966 .(Duhamel, John)
November 2, 2015 Filing 4966 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF KAREN MARIGNY (1:12-CV-03700-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
November 2, 2015 Filing 4965 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4956 Response in Opposition to #4924 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as it relates to Plaintiffs Estate of Virta Bennett, Dwena Jo Wilson, Audie Canida and Elizabeth Galloway (CA 09-3028ML), filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Duhamel, John)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4961 Motion to Continue Mandatory Mediation Deadline through December 1, 2015 as to Plaintiff Jon Stolzer (CA13-3750ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/2/2015. (Feeley, Susan)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4964 ORDER granting #4926 Motion for Order to Show Cause as it relates to Plaintiff Lorna Katoa (deceased)(CA 10-3075). Plaintiff's representative Lisa K. Fapula must respond to this Order on or before 11/23/15 or Plaintiff's case will be dismissed without prejudice. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/2/2015. (A copy of the attached Order was forwarded via first-class mail to Plaintiff's representative Lisa K. Fapula of Bountiful, Utah on 11/2/15.) (Feeley, Susan)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4963 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (without prejudice) as it relates to Plaintiff Audrey Morgan (CA12-3704ML) for failure to comply with Magistrate Judge Almond's #4920 Order directing said Plaintiff to enter the case pro se or engage successor counsel within 30 days of the date of that Order granting counsel's #4869 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/2/2015. (A copy of the attached Order was forwarded via first-class mail to Plaintiff's last known address.)(Feeley, Susan)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4962 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (without prejudice) as it relates to Plaintiff Kristen Greenfield (CA13-3826ML) for failure to comply with Magistrate Judge Almond's #4921 Order directing said Plaintiff to enter the case pro se or engage successor counsel within 30 days of the date of that Order granting counsel's #4869 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 11/2/2015. (A copy of the attached Order was forwarded via first-class mail to Plaintiff's last known address.) (Feeley, Susan)
November 2, 2015 Filing 4961 Assented MOTION to Continue Mediation Deadline through 12/1/2015 (as it relates to CA 13-3750ML) filed by Jon Stolzer. Responses due by 11/19/2015 (Duhamel, John)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4960 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to: Offie Martha Diaz (CA10-2974ML); James S. Duggins (CA10-3539ML); Vinetta W. Ford (CA10-3538ML); Jackie Madsen (CA10-3103ML); Connie J. Rhode (CA10-3183ML); Inez G. Root (CA10-3526ML); Debra J. Schroeder (CA09-2994ML); Sammy Shelton (10-3248ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/29/15. (Feeley, Susan)
October 28, 2015 Filing 4960 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
October 28, 2015 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC Hearing on Motion #4916 MOTION to Compel Discovery (as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock, CA 08-2635-ML), #4919 MOTION to Compel Discovery Related to Georgia Bowersock (CA 08-2635ML) : TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2015 03:00 PM (EST) before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. The Court will email call in instructions to the parties. (Noel, Jeannine)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4959 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to the following: Terry Cain (CA09-2734ML); Jennifer Carter-Broske (CA13-3796ML); Donald Dreager (CA12-3672ML); Cynthia Dom (CA12-3676ML); Lori Green (CA13-3751ML); Jennifer Griffithe (CA10-3113ML); Deborah Hicks (CA12-3705ML); Barbara Miller (CA10-3104ML); Joanne Reiderman (CA10-3339ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/28/2015. (Feeley, Susan)
October 27, 2015 Filing 4959 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
October 26, 2015 Filing 4958 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4949 Response in Opposition to Motion TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RELATED TO MARK BOWERSOCK WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Brown, Michael)
October 26, 2015 Filing 4957 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4950 Response in Opposition to Motion, TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RELATED TO GEORGIA BOWERSOCK WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4955 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to SHEILA A. AVIN-KING and KENNETH E. KING (CA 12-3724ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/26/2015. (Duhamel, John)
October 23, 2015 Filing 4956 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #4924 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as it relates to Plaintiffs Estate of Virta Bennett, Dwena Jo Wilson, Audie Canida and Elizabeth Galloway (CA 09-3028ML) filed by Virta, Estate of Bennette, Audie Canida, Elizabeth Galloway, Dwena Wilson. Replies due by 11/2/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jackson, Kerrie) Modified Event Code on 10/23/2015 (Jackson, Kerrie).
October 22, 2015 Filing 4955 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS SHEILA A. AVIN-KING AND KENNETH E. KING (1:12-CV-03724-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL re: #4953 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to CINDY RUST (CA 13-3844ML); #4954 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to PATRICIA MILLICAN (CA 13-3826ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/21/2015. (Duhamel, John)
October 21, 2015 NOTICE -- The Court is informed that the following cases have been resolved (dismissals pending) as to the following plaintiffs (and these cases will be closed for adminstrative purposes): LYNNE KAVOURGIAS (CA 08-2071ML); GAYLE H. LEE (CA 14-3864ML); PATTY BELL/RICHARD EARL MULLINAX (CA 13-3814ML); DEBRA REEDY (CA 09-2881ML); DAVID JACK BAUGHN (CA 08-2524ML); CHARLENE NOLEN (CA 10-3044ML); PAMELA ORR (CA 10-3335ML); TODD H./ANTOINETTE DREISBACH (CA 08-2557ML); ANTHONY/KATHLEEN SMITH NOVAK (CA 14-3868ML); CHARMAINE T. STROM (CA 08-537ML); GERARD DESTIN (CA 08-2364ML); STEFAN KOSA (CA 13-3836ML); ALAN D. GUSAN (CA 10-3435ML); RICHARD HINES (CA 13-3810ML); TRACY MITCHELL CARROLL (as Administratrix of Estate of Martha Mitchell)(CA 10-3226ML); DAVID EHLKE (CA 10-3497ML); DANNY GEUVENS (CA 13-3794ML); ANDREW J. HAUSER (CA 12-3718ML); DEBORAH LEE (CA 13-3746ML); PATRICIA MELOM (CA 09-2996ML); MARGARET WILLIAMS (CA 07-1969ML); BURR/SHARON BENJAMIN (CA 10-3177ML); MAGDL MAHFOUZ (CA 08-2446ML); CLARISSA MAHR (CA 07-1933ML); JOHN PUNTURO (CA 10-3046ML); AMY SUMMERS (CA 09-3000ML); WAYNE WORMAN (CA 10-3094ML); DIANE C. ANDREWS (CA 08-010ML); SHIRLEY COLLINS (CA 08-2599ML); LEAH THOMAS (CA 08-038ML); BRENDA GLENN (CA 13-3769ML) (Duhamel, John)
October 20, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conferences set for WEDNESDAY, 11/4/2015 from 10:30 AM to 3:30 PM in Senior Judge Lisi's Chambers (third floor) as to the following Plaintiffs: PATRICIA BEEKES (CA 12-472ML) at 10:30 a.m. to 12:00 noon; KAREN MARIGNY (CA 12-3700ML) AT 12:00 noon to 1:30 p.m.; RUTH & HENRY SEGARRA (CA 13-3791ML) AT 2:00 p.m to 3:30 p.m. -- Liasion counsel Donald Migliori or Michael Rousseau (for Plaintiffs), John Hooper (for Defendants), and Plaintiffs' counsel (Christopher Bijesse for BEEKES; C. Edward Gibson for MARIGNY; Julia Grimke Young or Robert Strick for SEGARRA) are required to appear in person. NOTE: If need be, counsel should make arrangements to be present on the following day (Thursday, 11/5/2015) as well.(Duhamel, John)
October 20, 2015 Filing 4954 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF PATRICIA MILLICAN (1:13-CV-03826-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 20, 2015 Filing 4953 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF CINDY RUST (1:13-CV-03844-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER terminating #4925 Motion for Order to Show Cause as it relates to Plaintiffs Gardner D. and Dawn M. Jayjohn (CA 11-3575ML). (Notice of Withdrawal of #4925 motion filed at #4952 on 10/20/2015.) -- So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/20/2015.(Duhamel, John)
October 20, 2015 Filing 4952 NOTICE by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION (DOCKET NO. 4925), AS IT RELATES TO PLAINTIFFS GARDNER D. JAYJOHN AND DAWN M. JAYJOHN (1:11-cv-03575-ML-LDA) (Hooper, John)
October 19, 2015 Filing 4951 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re Telephonic Motion Hearing Held in Chambers re Plaintiff Brenda Glenn's Motion for an Extension of Time to Designate Experts for proceedings held on 10/14/2015 before Judge Mary M. Lisi.. (Brown, Michael)
October 16, 2015 Filing 4950 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4919 MOTION to Compel Discovery Related to Georgia Bowersock (as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock, CA 08-2635-ML) filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK et al. Replies due by 10/26/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Duhamel, John)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #4946 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Designate Experts, filed by Brenda Glenn (CA 13-3769ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/14/2015. (Duhamel, John)
October 14, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi: Telphonic Motion Hearing held in Chambers on 10/14/2015 re #4946 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Designate Experts filed by Brenda Glenn (CA 13-3769ML). Counsel participating: C.E. Gibson, M. Brown, M. Rousseau. Motion DENIED. Text Order to issue. (Court Reporter Denise Veitch.) (Duhamel, John)
October 14, 2015 Filing 4949 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4916 MOTION to Compel Discovery Related to Mark Bowersock (as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock, CA 08-2635-ML) filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK et al. Replies due by 10/26/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Duhamel, John)
October 13, 2015 Filing 4948 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4947 Response in Opposition to #4946 Motion for an Extension of Time to Designate Experts filed by Brenda Glenn (CA 13-3769ML). (Gibson, Charles)
October 13, 2015 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion re #4946 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Designate Experts filed by Brenda Glenn (as it relates to CA 13-3769ML). Telephonic Motion Hearing set for WEDNESDAY, 10/14/2015 at 12:00 NOON (EST) in Senior Judge Lisi's Chambers. -- Participating Counsel have been provided with call-in instrucutions. (Duhamel, John)
October 12, 2015 Filing 4947 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4946 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Designate Experts filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 10/22/2015. (Hooper, John)
October 9, 2015 Filing 4946 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Designate Experts filed by Brenda Glenn. Responses due by 10/26/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gibson, Charles)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4945 ORDER re #4932 NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMAINING PLAINTIFFS (as it relates to LaGreer Brown, et al.; CA 08-155ML) DISMISSING (without prejudice) the claims of remaining plaintiffs ARETHA CUMMINGS, JOSEPH CUMMINGS, and DANIELLE MITCHELL. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/9/2015. (Duhamel, John)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice re: #4933 Stipulation as to D. HYLAND AND MARY JEAN HYLAND (CA 07-1851ML), #4934 Stipulation as to STATON AND TERRI STATON (CA 07-1855ML), #4935 Stipulation as to BARBARA BUTLER (CA 14-3860), #4936 Stipulation as to LOUANN SALVITTI (CA 10-0069ML), #4937 Stipulation as to MATTHEW MANN AND MARGARET MORRISSEY (CA 08-2436ML), #4938 Stipulation as to FLORA QUINTANA (CA 09-2841ML), #4939 Stipulation as to LINDA HANNEN (CA 11-3589ML), #4940 Stipulation as to THOMAS D. GUILD (CA 09-2916ML), #4941 Stipulation as to DAVID HASLAM (CA 08-0009ML), #4942 Stipulation as to JEFFREY L. HENNEMUTH (CA 14-3855ML), #4943 Stipulation as to CHARLES ANTHONY KENT (CA 13-3801ML), #4944 Stipulation as to WILLIAM SIGSBURY AND MADELINE SIGSBURY (CA 11-3633ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/9/2015. (Duhamel, John)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4929 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following Plaintiffs in CA 13-3826ML: Edward Arias, Marie Armeli, Sonia Calderon, Tyrone Gilbert, Kathleen Holbert, Donna Marie Murphy, Deborah Santee, Bertha A. Smith, Kerry Schwartz, Sandra Tauber, Barbara Terrell, Lisa Turley, and Gail Wilkie. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/8/2015. (Duhamel, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 4944 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS WILLIAM SIGSBURY AND MADELINE SIGSBURY (1:11-cv-03633-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 4943 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF CHARLES ANTHONY KENT (1:13-CV-03801-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 4942 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF JEFFREY L. HENNEMUTH (1:14-CV-03855-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 4941 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF DAVID HASLAM (1:08-CV-00009-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 4940 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF THOMAS D. GUILD (1:09-CV-02916-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 4939 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF LINDA HANNEN (1:11-CV-03589-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 4938 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF FLORA QUINTANA (1:09-CV-02841-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 4937 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS MATTHEW MANN AND MARGARET MORRISSEY (1:08-CV-02436-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 4936 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF LOUANN SALVITTI (1:10-CV-00069-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 4935 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF BARBARA BUTLER (1:14-CV-03860-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 4934 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS DAVID STATON AND TERRI STATON (1:07-CV-01855-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 4933 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS THOMAS D. HYLAND AND MARY JEAN HYLAND (1:07-CV-01851-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 8, 2015 Filing 4932 NOTICE by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMAINING PLAINTIFFS AS IT RELATES TO LaGreer Brown, et al. v. Davol, Inc. and C. R. Bard, Inc., 1:08-cv-00155-ML-LDA (Hooper, John)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4931 AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al. (CA 08-2635ML) re 4697 Case Management Order, BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK et al. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 10/7/2015. (Saucier, Martha)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4930 ORDER granting #4922 Motion Modify Case Management Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 10/7/2015. (Saucier, Martha)
October 7, 2015 Filing 4929 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 10/7/2015 to correct the listed individual case number) (Duhamel, John).
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice re #4927 Stipulation as to Plaintiffs RONALD LEE CRAWFORD, TERESA L. CRAWFORD and KATE-LYNNE RUTH CRAWFORD (CA 13-3782ML). So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/6/2015. (Duhamel, John)
October 6, 2015 Filing 4928 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4922 MOTION to Modify #4697 Case Management Order as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al., CA 08-2635ML re #4697 Order filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 10/16/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Brown, Michael)
October 5, 2015 Filing 4927 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS RONALD LEE CRAWFORD, TERESA L. CRAWFORD AND KATE-LYNNE RUTH CRAWFORD (1:13-CV-03782-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
October 5, 2015 Filing 4926 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as it relates to Plaintiff Lorna Katoa (CA 10-3075) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 10/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Duhamel, John)
October 5, 2015 Filing 4925 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as it relates to Plaintiffs Gardner D. and Dawn M. Jayjohn (CA 11-3575ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 10/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Duhamel, John)
October 5, 2015 Filing 4924 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as it relates to Plaintiffs Estate of Virta Bennett, Dwena Jo Wilson, Audie Canida and Elizabeth Galloway (CA 09-3028ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 10/22/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Duhamel, John)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4923 ORDER: GRANTING Joint Motion of Plaintiff WILLIAM CALDWELL and Defendants Davol, Inc./C.R. Bard for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (granting #4897 Joint Motion; as it relates to Caldwell, CA 12-3710ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 10/2/2015. (Duhamel, John)
October 1, 2015 Filing 4922 MOTION to Modify Case Management Order as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al. (CA 08-2635ML) re #4697 Case Management Order, filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK et al. Responses due by 10/19/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order)(Duhamel, John)
September 30, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary M. Lisi: Telephone Conference held on 9/30/2015 (re status of mediations). Counsel participating: John Hooper, Eric Gladbach, Michael Rousseau. (Duhamel, John)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4921 ORDER granting #4869 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to KRISTEN GREENFIELD (CA 13-3826ML) Attorneys Timmy Kent Goss, David P. Matthews and Peter de la Cerda terminated. This matter came before the Court on August 14, 2015. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Document No. 4869) is GRANTED. Plaintiff Kristen Greenfield is hereby directed to enter her appearance "pro se" or engage successor counsel within thirty days of entry of this Order. Failure to do so will result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's former counsel shall immediately forward a copy of this ORDER to Plaintiff at her last-known address. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/29/2015. (Noel, Jeannine)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4920 ORDER GRANTING re #4869 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to AUDREY MORGAN (CA 12-3704ML). This matter came before the Court on August 14, 2015. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Document No. 4869) is GRANTED. Plaintiff Audrey Morgan is hereby directed to enter her appearance "pro se" or engage successor counsel within thirty days of entry of this Order. Failure to do so will result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's former counsel shall immediately forward a copy of this ORDER to Plaintiff at her last-known address. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/29/2015. (Noel, Jeannine)
September 29, 2015 Filing 4919 MOTION to Compel Discovery Related to Georgia Bowersock (CA 08-2635ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 10/16/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brown, Michael)
September 28, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2015 re #4869 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to AUDREY MORGAN (CA 12-3704ML) and KRISTEN GREENFIELD (CA 13-3826ML) filed by Kristen Greenfield, Audrey Morgan. (de la Cerda, Alexander) Parties via telephone; Plaintiffs did not call in; Plaintiffs' counsel addresses the court; No objection filed; Deft Counsel addresses the Court; Court grants motion; Orders to follow (Noel, Jeannine)
September 28, 2015 Filing 4918 NOTICE of Serving Proposal for Settlement by Norma Olmo et al. (CA 13-3820ML) (Susen, Marcus) Modified on 9/28/2015 to note that the attached document is duplicative of the one filed at #4917 . (Duhamel, John).
September 28, 2015 Filing 4917 NOTICE of Serving Proposal for Settlement by Norma Olmo et al. (CA 13-3820ML) (Susen, Marcus) (Duhamel, John).
September 25, 2015 Filing 4916 MOTION to Compel Discovery (as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock, CA 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 10/13/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Brown, Michael)
September 24, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference with liaison attorneys Donald Migliori & John Hooper set for WEDNESDAY, 9/30/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mary M. Lisi. Counsel will be supplied with call-in instructions.(Duhamel, John)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #4853 MOTION for Protective Order as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock (CA 08-2635ML) WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. After reviewing the Court's May 7, 2014 order in the Cotten case and the parties' submissions including the relevant portions of the implanting surgeon's deposition, Defendants have not met their burden of showing good cause pursuant to Rule 26 ( c ), Fed. R. Civ. P., for the issuance of a protective order precluding Plaintiff from taking the deposition of Ms. Vasilchek. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/23/2015. (Noel, Jeannine)
September 23, 2015 Filing 4914 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Henson, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthony Novak, Kathleen Smith Novak (as it relates to NOVAK, CA 14-3868ML). (Duhamel, John)
September 22, 2015 Filing 4913 NOTICE OF LODGMENT by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK et al. in support of #4865 Response in Opposition to #4853 Motion for Protective Order (as it relates to Bowersock, CA 08-2635ML (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duhamel, John)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying #4864 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel, (August 11, 2015 Text Order Denying Bard's Motion to Compel as Moot in Bowersock, et al. Case) With Supporting Memo filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/21/2015. (Noel, Jeannine)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #4867 MOTION to Seal Document : Exhibits 1-7 in support of Plaintiffs' 4865 Response in Opposition to Defendants' 4853 Motion for Protective Order; as it relates to CA 08-2635ML filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK and CHARLOTTE ROBINSON. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/21/2015. (Noel, Jeannine)
September 21, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2015 re #4867 MOTION to Seal Document : Exhibits 1-7 in support of Plaintiffs' #4865 Response in Opposition to Defendants' #4853 Motion for Protective Order; as it relates to CA 08-2635ML filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK, #4864 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel, (August 11, 2015 Text Order Denying Bard's Motion to Compel as Moot in Bowersock, et al. Case) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc, #4853 MOTION for Protective Order as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock (CA 08-2635ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Dassow, Migliori, Brown) All parties via telephone; Court grants Motion #4867; Court denies Motion #4864; Argument on Motion #4853; Court takes matter under advisement; Order to follow (Courtroom A at 3:11 PM.) (Noel, Jeannine)
September 21, 2015 Filing 4911 NOTICE of Lodgment by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #4864 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel, (August 11, 2015 Text Order Denying Bard's Motion to Compel as Moot in Bowersock, et al.; CA 08-2635ML) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Michael)
September 18, 2015 Filing 4910 AMENDED COMPLAINT against C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc, filed by Nelson Olmo, Norma Olmo. (NOTE: The instant document was filed pursuant to Magistrate Judge Almond's 8/18/2015 Text Order granting Norma Olmo's #4856 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. The amended complaint was originally docketed as an attachment to the motion for leave to file same.)(Duhamel, John)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice re #4907 Stipulation as to CATHERINE/WILLIAM ALLEN (CA 09-2807ML), PAUL/ROSEMARY HADLEY (CA 09-3023ML), MICHALE LEE/PATRICIA MAE JENKINS (CA 08-2569ML), THOMAS/JOAN PLESSER (CA 08-2649ML), RANDY/LETHA WAYMIRE (CA 08-2529ML); re #4908 Stipulation as to MEI LING/RENEE ANDERSON (CA 13-3744ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 9/18/2015. (Duhamel, John)
September 18, 2015 Filing 4909 NOTICES of SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT to Defendants Davol, Inc. & C.R. Bard, Inc. by Nelson Olmo (as it relates to OLMO, CA 13-3820ML) (Note: Applicable to Plaintiff Nelson Olmo only, and not Plaintiff Norma Olmo.) (Duhamel, John)
September 18, 2015 Filing 4908 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS MEI LING ANDERSON AND RENEE ANDERSON (1:13-CV-03744-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
September 18, 2015 Filing 4907 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
September 17, 2015 Filing 4906 NOTICE of WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIMS as to Counts V, VI, VII, VIII, IX and X of the Complaint, by NORMA OLMO (as it relates to CA 13-3820ML) (Duhamel, John)
September 15, 2015 Filing 4905 NOTICE as to RUTH/HENRY SEGARRA as it relates to CA 13-3791ML Certificate of Mediation; case has not been settled (Duhamel, John)
September 15, 2015 Filing 4904 NOTICE as to PATRICIA BEEKES as it relates to CA 12-472ML Certificate of Mediation; case has not been settled (Zangari, Carol)
September 15, 2015 Filing 4903 NOTICE as to DEBRA REEDY as it relates to CA 09-2881ML Certificate of Mediation; case has not been settled (Zangari, Carol)
September 15, 2015 Filing 4902 NOTICE as to KAREN MARIGNY as it relates to CA 12-3700ML Certificate of Mediation; case has not been settled (Zangari, Carol)
September 15, 2015 Filing 4901 NOTICE as to BRENDA GLENN as it relates to CA 13-3769ML Certificate of Mediation; case has not been settled (Zangari, Carol)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4900 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (to October 31, 2015) from #4833 Order for Mandatory Mediation, as it relates to JON STOLZER (CA 13-3750ML) So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 9/15/2015. (Duhamel, John)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4899 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: JAMES BIALCZAK (CA 08-2584ML), MARK GREEN (CA 08-2585ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 9/15/2015. (Duhamel, John)
September 14, 2015 Filing 4900 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE from #4833 Order for Mandatory Mediation filed by Jon Stolzer (as it relates to CA 13-3750ML).(Migliori, Donald)
September 14, 2015 Filing 4899 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
September 4, 2015 Filing 4898 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4891 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Motion for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel (August 11, 2015 Text Order Denying Bard's Motion to Compel as Moot; as it relates to Bowersock, et al.; CA 08-2635ML) With Supporting Memo filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
September 4, 2015 Filing 4897 Joint MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT re #4895 Order on Motion to Seal Document, WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (as it related to WILLIAM CALDWELL, CA 12-3710ML). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2PROPOSED ORDER)(Hooper, John)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4895 ORDER SEALING CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE BETWEEN PLAINTIFF WILLIAM CALDWELL AND DEFENDANTS C. R. BARD, INC. AND DAVOL, INC.AND TO SUBJECT CO-DEFENDANTS TO PROTECTIVE ORDER (granting #4893 Motion to Seal Document; as it relates to WILLIAM CALDWELL, CA 12-3710ML) -- So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 9/4/2015. (Duhamel, John)
September 3, 2015 Filing 4893 MOTION to Seal Document filed by William Caldwell, C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc. (as it relates to WILLIAM CALDWELL, CA 12-3710ML) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duhamel, John)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #4892 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #4889 Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply (as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock 1:08-02635-ML). Defendants' Objection is overruled and their request to file a written response to Plaintiffs' unauthorized sur-reply is denied. Both sides will have a full opportunity to present their positions to the Court during the upcoming hearing. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 9/1/2015. (Noel, Jeannine)
August 31, 2015 Filing 4892 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc re #4889 Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply (as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock 1:08-02635-ML). (Alexander, Eric)
August 31, 2015 Filing 4891 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4864 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel, (August 11, 2015 Text Order Denying Bard's Motion to Compel as Moot; as it relates to Bowersock, et al.; CA 08-2635ML ) filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK et al. Replies due by 9/10/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duhamel, John)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4890 ORDER granting #4883 Motion to Continue (30-day continuance) from the Court's #4833 Order for Mandatory Mediation (as it relates to ANTHONY/KATHLEEN NOVAK, CA 14-3868ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/31/2015. (Duhamel, John)
August 28, 2015 Filing 4889 SUR-REPLY re #4885 Reply to #4865 Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' #4853 MOTION for Protective Order as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock (CA 08-2635ML), filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK and CHARLOTTE ROBINSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Duhamel, John)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: #4887 Stipulation as to KATHLEEN BOUL (CA 11-3655ML); #4888 Stipulation as to ALFRED E. KNOWLTON and JO-ANN KNOWLTON (CA 09-2790ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/28/2015. (Duhamel, John)
August 27, 2015 Filing 4888 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS ALFRED E. KNOWLTON AND JO-ANN KNOWLTON (1:09-CV-02790-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
August 27, 2015 Filing 4887 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF KATHLEEN BOUL (1:11-CV-03655-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4886 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to LORRAINE MILEWSKI (CA 14-3861ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/26/2015. (Duhamel, John)
August 25, 2015 Filing 4886 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF LORRAINE MILEWSKI (1:14-CV-03861-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
August 25, 2015 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC Hearing on Motion #4869 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to AUDREY MORGAN (CA 12-3704ML) and KRISTEN GREENFIELD (CA 13-3826ML) : TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2015 03:00 PM (EST) before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Counsel will be emailed call in instructions. Plaintiffs' Counsel is directed to notify Plaintiffs of the hearing and call in instructions. (Noel, Jeannine) Modified on 8/25/2015 (Noel, Jeannine). ADDED "TELEPHONIC"
August 24, 2015 TRANSCRIPT ORDER RESCINDED re: #4880 Transcript Order The Court Reporter certifies after sufficient effort to rectify, they are unable to fullfill the transcript order for the following reasons: Transcript order has been withdrawn by filer. (Dias, Jennifer)
August 24, 2015 Filing 4885 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4865 Response in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock (CA 08-2635-ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Alexander, Eric)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4884 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to NELLIE S. GIBSON (CA 09-3033ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/24/2015. (Duhamel, John)
August 21, 2015 Filing 4884 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF NELLIE S. GIBSON (1:09-CV-03033-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: entering #4881 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: CHARLES R. PERKEYBILE (CA 09-2680ML), RONALD E. REIJO (CA 08- 2543ML), ANNA M. ROBLES (CA 09-2973ML), GRADY ROGERS (CA 09-2923ML), WILMA J. ROGERS (CA 10-3410ML), SHARON SEALY (CA 09-2959ML), REBECCA SMITH (CA 10- 3311ML), MARIA C. SOSA (CA 10-3518ML), SHARON E. SULTZ (CA 08-2450ML), JAMES TALERICO (CA 10-3211ML), NICKIE L. TAYLOR (CA 08-2386ML), JOHN E. WALTERS (CA 08-2147ML); entering #4882 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to SUSAN/BRUCE KALTREIDER (CA 09-2769ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/20/2015. (Duhamel, John)
August 19, 2015 Filing 4883 Assented MOTION to Continue from the Court's #4833 Order for Mandatory Mediation (30-day continuance); as it relates to CA 14-3868ML filed by Anthony Novak, Kathleen Smith Novak. Responses due by 9/8/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Duhamel, John)
August 19, 2015 Filing 4882 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS SUSAN KALTREIDER AND BRUCE KALTREIDER (1:09-CV-02769-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
August 19, 2015 Filing 4881 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
August 18, 2015 Filing 4880 TRANSCRIPT ORDER (re Doc No 4879 of Plaintiff Hyland's Motion to Remand- as it relates to Hyland, CA 07-1851ML) for proceedings held on June 15, 2015 before Judge Mary M. Lisi. (Brown, Michael)
August 18, 2015 Filing 4879 TRANSCRIPT of Plaintiff Hyland's Motion to Remand held on June 15, 2015 before Judge Mary M. Lisi. Court Reporter Denise P. Veitch, Telephone number 401-323-9337. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request go to #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov/ridPath.asp?id=/menu/caseinformation/transcrpts/transcrpts.html . Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2015. (Veitch, Denise)
August 18, 2015 Filing 4878 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Bijesse on behalf of Patricia Beekes (Bijesse, Christopher)
August 18, 2015 Filing 4877 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Bijesse on behalf of Plaintiff Patricia Beekes (Bijesse, Christopher) Modified on 8/18/2015 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: GRANTING Plaintiff NORMA OLMO's #4856 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint (as it relates to Olmo, CA 13-3820ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/18/2015. (Duhamel, John)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: #4874 Stipulation as to SHERRY AYERS (CA 08-2625ML), #4875 Stipulation as to HEIDI SCHUSTER (CA 12-3729ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/18/2015. (Duhamel, John)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4876 ORDER denying Plaintiff FELTON ESTES' #4733 MOTION to Vacate #4696 ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice (as it relates to ESTES, CA 12-3719ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/17/2015. (A copy of the attached Order was forwarded to Plaintiff Felton Estes via first-class mail on 8/17/2015.) (Duhamel, John)
August 17, 2015 Filing 4875 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF HEIDI SCHUSTER (1:12-CV-03729-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
August 17, 2015 Filing 4874 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF SHERRY AYERS (1:08-CV-02625-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: #4871 Stipulation as to KARMEN MILLIGAN/LOREN MILLIGAN (CA 12-3716), #4872 Stipulation as to TAMMY CRAMER/SCOTT CRAMER (CA 08-2597ML), #4873 Stipulation as to ALLAN EVANS (CA 09-2890ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/17/2015. (Duhamel, John)
August 14, 2015 Filing 4873 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ALLAN EVANS (1:09-CV-02890-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
August 14, 2015 Filing 4872 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS TAMMY CRAMER AND SCOTT CRAMER (1:08-CV-02597-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
August 14, 2015 Filing 4871 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS KARMEN MILLIGAN AND LOREN MILLIGAN (1:12-CV-03716-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order NOTICE of TELEPHONIC Hearing on Motion #4864 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel, (August 11, 2015 Text Order Denying Bard's Motion to Compel as Moot in Bowersock, et al. Case), #4853 MOTION for Protective Order as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock (CA 08-2635ML) : TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2015 03:00 PM (EST) before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Participants will be emailed call in information. Prior to the hearing, the parties are ordered to meet and confer in a good faith effort to resolve or narrow the issues presented in these discovery motions. In addition, Plaintiffs' counsel's request that the August 19, 2015 deposition of Dr. Lynch be postponed is DENIED. See Protective Order entered by Judge Lisi on May 7, 2014 as Document No. 4559. (Noel, Jeannine)
August 14, 2015 Filing 4870 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4856 MOTION for Leave to File Document : a First Amended Complaint (as it relates to NORMA OLMO, CA 13-3820ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 8/24/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Michael)
August 14, 2015 Filing 4869 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as it relates to AUDREY MORGAN (CA 12-3704ML) and KRISTEN GREENFIELD (CA 13-3826ML) filed by Kristen Greenfield, Audrey Morgan. Responses due by 8/31/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Duhamel, John)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4866 STIPULATON OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: FRANKIE FACCIOLLA (CA 11-3634ML), RICHARD JACKSON (CA 10-3125ML), KEVIN MUMMERT (CA 13-3785ML), DEAN RHOADES (CA 09-2728ML), LORA RODRIGUEZ (BROWN) (CA 12-3688ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/14/2015. (Duhamel, John)
August 14, 2015 Filing 4867 MOTION to Seal Document : Exhibits 1-7 in support of Plaintiffs' #4865 Response in Opposition to Defendants' #4853 Motion for Protective Order; as it relates to CA 08-2635ML filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK and CHARLOTTE ROBINSON. (Duhamel, John)
August 13, 2015 Filing 4866 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
August 13, 2015 Filing 4865 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4853 MOTION for Protective Order as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock (CA 08-2635ML) filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK and CHARLOTTE ROBINSON. Replies due by 8/24/2015. (Duhamel, John)
August 13, 2015 Filing 4864 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Compel, (August 11, 2015 Text Order Denying Bard's Motion to Compel as Moot in Bowersock, et al. Case) With Supporting Memo filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 8/31/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brown, Michael)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denied as moot in view of Plaintiffs counsels representation that supplemental interrogatory answers were served on July 23, 2015 re: #4849 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 8/11/2015. (Saucier, Martha)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: #4861 Stipulation as to MARY BANKER (CA 09-2727ML), DORIS CLOUSER (CA 10-3294ML), DEBRA PHIFER (CA 13-3789ML), LINDA PORRIER (CA 09-2729ML); #4862 Stipulation as to KENNETH DERDEN (CA 09-2760ML), FRANCES PORTER (CA 09-2762ML), CHARLES VANOVER (CA 09-2709ML); #4863 Stipulation as to BILL DOYLE (CA 08-2441ML), MARLA HALE (CA 08-2459ML), DELORES MARTINEZ (CA 08-2460ML), DANIEL RABATIN (CA 08-2440ML), JANET STOECKLE (CA 08-2443ML), MICHELLE WARNER (CA 08-2495ML), CHAD WOLF (CA 08-2419ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/11/2015. (Duhamel, John)
August 10, 2015 Filing 4863 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
August 10, 2015 Filing 4862 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
August 10, 2015 Filing 4861 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4860 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to TIMOTHY J. EDGAR (CA 07-1849ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 8/7/2015. (Duhamel, John)
August 6, 2015 Filing 4860 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to Plaintiff Timothy J. Edgar (as it relates to CA 07-1849ML) (Duhamel, John)
August 3, 2015 Filing 4859 RESPONSE in OPPOSITION to Motion re #4849 MOTION to Compel Discovery, filed by BOBBY DON BOWERSOCK et al. (as it relates to CA 08-2635ML). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Duhamel, John)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4858 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: ELOISE ALSUP (CA 10-3221ML); TIMOTHY BURDEN (CA 10-3546ML); LUISA E. MEDINA (CA 11-3591ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 7/31/2015. (Duhamel, John)
July 30, 2015 Filing 4858 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4857 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to ROSEMARY S. ROBERTS (CA 14-3854ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 7/30/2015. (Duhamel, John)
July 29, 2015 Filing 4857 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ROSEMARY S. ROBERTS (1:14-CV-03854-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
July 29, 2015 Filing 4856 MOTION for Leave to File Document : a First Amended Complaint (as it relates to NORMA OLMO, CA 13-3820ML) filed by Norma Olmo. Responses due by 8/17/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Duhamel, John)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice re: #4854 Stipulation as to MELISSA JENKINS, as the ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF EARLENE ALLEN (CA 08-2647ML); #4855 Stipulation as to JENNIFER STACY SATTLER and KEVIN EDWARD SATTLER (CA 08-2528ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 7/28/2015. (Duhamel, John)
July 27, 2015 Filing 4855 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS JENNIFER STACY SATTLER AND KEVIN EDWARD SATTLER (1:08-CV-02528-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
July 27, 2015 Filing 4854 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF MELISSA JENKINS, AS THE ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF EARLENE ALLEN (1:08-CV-02647-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
July 27, 2015 Filing 4853 MOTION for Protective Order as it relates to the Estate of Georgia Bowersock (CA 08-2635ML) WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 8/13/2015 (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4)(Alexander, Eric)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4852 PRETRIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER as it relates to NORMA OLMO (CA 13-3820ML). Dispositive motions to be filed by 1/8/2016. (Final Pretrial Conference & Jury Empanelment dates to be determined. See Section F, Page 3 of the attached order.) -- So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 7/22/2015. (Duhamel, John)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4850 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: ASHLEY COCHRAN (CA 11-3636ML); RODNEY ERICKSON (CA 10-3100ML); MARY HOUGHTALIN (CA 09-2732ML); ARDEL WILLIAMS (CA 10-3114ML); SHIRLEY WOLF (CA 10-3112ML); ISRAEL AYALA (CA 09-2726ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 7/22/2015. (Duhamel, John)
July 21, 2015 Filing 4851 PROPOSED Pretrial Case Management Order (as it relates to Norma Olmo, CA 13-3820ML) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
July 21, 2015 Filing 4850 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
July 16, 2015 Filing 4849 MOTION to Compel Discovery With Supporting Memo (as it relates to BOWERSOCK et al.; CA 08-2635ML) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Responses due by 8/3/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Brown, Michael)
July 8, 2015 NOTICE: The Court is informed that releases have been received as to the following plaintiffs/cases (for which dismissals are pending): JENNIFER GRIFFITHE (CA 10-3113ML); JENNIFER/KEVIN SATTLER (CA 08-2528ML); SHERRY AYERS (CA 08-2625ML); TAMMY/SCOTT CRAMER (CA 08-2597ML); ALLAN EVANS (CA 09-2890ML);KARMEN/LOREN MILLIGAN (CA 12-3716ML); RUBEN CAVAZOS (CA 07-1871ML); DENISE/RON CROWDER (CA 12-3685ML); CHARLES/D'JUANNA SKINNER (CA 07-1942ML); WRENNETTE/PHILLI STEWART (CA 07-1954ML); SANDRA CORLESS et al. (CA 13-3826ML); SUSAN/BRUCE KALTREIDER (CA 09-2769ML); ELDON LEE WOOD (CA 13-3828ML); YVETTE ESPINOZA (CA 13-3840ML); GREG/BARBARA GARCIA (CA 09-2843ML); KATIE MOSEBY (CA 14-3857ML); BRENT S. RICE (CA 08-2231ML); ROSEMARY S. ROBERTS (CA 14-3854ML); JACQUELINE WESSLER (CA 08-2447ML); DEBRA S. WILLAMS (CA 08-2431ML); FRANKIE FACCIOLLA (CA 11-3634ML); JOHN BONEY (CA 08-2465ML); ROBERT BOSTWICK (CA 08-2466ML); REBECCA CHACON (CA 08-2469ML); LESLIE DARR (CA 08-2467ML); ROSEANN ELDRED (CA 08-2305ML); VIRGIL JOHNSON (Administrator of Estate of Lora Johnson) (CA 08-2472ML); HAZEL LANE (CA 08-2471ML); REX LEE (CA 08-2311ML); JOYCE McCONATHY (CA 08-2351ML); RANDAL McQUILLER (CA 08-2314ML); HAZEL NEVIL (CA 08-2153ML); RICKIE PATTON (CA 08-2316ML); RITA REED (CA 08-2352ML); MIKE ROOD (CA 08-2321ML); CHARLOTTE WRAY (CA 08-2475ML); DOROTHY M. YOUNG (CA 08-2326ML). -- The aforementioned cases will be closed for administrative purposes. (Duhamel, John)
July 8, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary M. Lisi: Telephone Conference re status of open cases held on 7/8/2015. Counsel participating: D. Migliori, E. Gladbach, J. Hooper. (Duhamel, John)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice re: #4846 Stipulation as to VICKI L. CORLEY (CA 07-1951ML); #4847 Stipulation as to PATRICIA CARO (CA 09-2799ML); #4848 Stipulation as to TRESSA/DENNIS SIMMS (CA 10-3337ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 7/7/2015. (Duhamel, John)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL without prejudice re #4844 Stipulation as to JOSEPH GIRTON, JR., on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated (CA 07-1949ML); #4845 Stipulation as to MONTIEL et al. (CA 07-064ML), HOROWITZ et al. (CA 07-1865ML), KANE et al. (CA 07-1914ML), BOGGS (CA 07-1934ML); BOST et al. (CA 07-1952ML), BARRIENTOS (CA 07-1946ML), GIRTon (CA 07-1949ML), GAYVONT (CA 07-1966ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 7/7/2015. (Duhamel, John)
July 6, 2015 Filing 4848 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS TRESSA SIMMS & DENNIS SIMMS (1:10-CV-03337-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
July 6, 2015 Filing 4847 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF PATRICIA CARO (1:09-CV-02799-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
July 6, 2015 Filing 4846 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF VICKI L. CORLEY (1:07-CV-01951-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
July 2, 2015 Filing 4845 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFFS MONTIEL, ET AL. (1:07-CV-00064); HOROWITZ, ET AL. (1:07-CV-01865 AND E.D. N.Y. 1:07-CV-02392); KANE (1:07-CV-01914 AND W.D. MO. 4:07-CV-00575); BOGGS (1:07-CV-01934 AND S.D. ILL. 3:07-CV-642); BOST, ET AL. (1:07-CV-01925 AND E.D. PA. 2:07-CV-03997); BARRIENTOS (1:07-CV-01946 AND M.D. FLA. 8:07-CV-01747); GIRTON (1:07-CV-01949 AND D. NJ. 2:07-CV-4678); AND GAYVONT (1:07-CV-01966 AND N.D. W.V.A. 5:07-CV-125) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
July 2, 2015 Filing 4844 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF JOSEPH GIRTON, JR., ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (1:07-CV-01949-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4842 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL without prejudice as to DONNA GAY EDENS (CA 07-1926ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 7/2/2015. (Duhamel, John)
July 1, 2015 Filing 4843 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as it relates to Thomas Hyland for proceedings held on 6/15/2015-6/16/2015 before Judge Lisi.. (Migliori, Donald)
July 1, 2015 Filing 4842 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF DONNA GAY EDENS (1:07-CV-01926-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 29, 2015 Filing 4841 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 6/15/2015 (Plaintiffs Thomas & Mary Jane Hyland's Motion to Remand; as it relates to CA 07-1851ML) before Judge Mary M. Lisi. (Duhamel, John)
June 29, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference (re remaining open MDL cases) with Attorneys D. Migliori, J. Hooper, E. Gladbach set for WEDNESDAY, 7/8/2015 at 12:00 NOON in Judge Lisi's Chambers. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. (Duhamel, John)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: #4838 Stipulation as to LEENELL TAYLOR (CA 09-2768ML); #4839 Stipulation as to DAYNE ANDERSON (CA 13-3816ML); #4840 Stipulation as to LATOYA JACSON-SIFUENTES (CA 09-2737ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/25/2015. (Duhamel, John)
June 24, 2015 Filing 4840 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF LATOYA JACKSON-SIFUENTES (1:09-CV-02737-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 24, 2015 Filing 4839 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF DAYNE ANDERSON (1:13-cv-03816-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL as to the following: #4821 Stipulation (with prejudice) as to DENISE GONZALES (CA 09-2844ML); #4822 Stipulation (with prejudice) as to TAMMY MOORE (CA 12-3737 ML); #4823 Stipulation (with prejudice) as to RODNEY WINGER (CA 08-2481ML); #4824 Stipulation (with prejudice) as to JACQUELINE WHITE (CA 08-2371ML); #4825 Stipulation (with prejudice) as to AILEEN REESE (CA 08-2489ML); #4826 Stipulation (without prejudice) as to: ROGER DIFATE (CA 08-293ML), DEBRA HONIOTES (CA 10-082ML), TRACI HURSTON (CA 10-341ML), PAIGE LINCOLN-EVANS (CA 10-086ML); ANITA WALKER (CA 09-613ML); and FRANCES SHIRLEY (CA 08-294ML); #4827 Stipulation (with prejudice) as to JEFFREY CARR (CA 14-3852ML); #4828 Stipulation (with prejudice) as to BOBBIE WEED (CA 10-3423ML); #4829 Stipulation (with prejudice) as to LISA RUBCHINUK (CA 13-3784ML); #4830 Stipulation (without prejudice) as to ALBERT E. BARNES (CA 08-2349ML); #4831 Stipulation (without prejudice) as to VERA A. CLAY (CA 08-2349ML), #4832 Stipulation (with prejudice) as to: LINDA ACQUISTA (CA 13-3847ML) and ROLAND SMITH (CA 13-3838ML); #4834 Stipulation (with prejudice) as to DANIEL/DARLINE POSTON (CA 07-1846ML); #4835 Stipulation (with prejudice) as to GRACE/EDWARD MURREY, IV (CA 08-2372ML); #4836 Stipulation (with prejudice) as to PETER/EMILY CUMMINS (CA 08-370ML); #4837 Stipulation (with prejudice) as to EDITH STARKEY (CA 10-3495ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/24/2015. (Duhamel, John)
June 24, 2015 Filing 4838 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF LEENELL TAYLOR (1:09-CV-02768-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 23, 2015 Filing 4837 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF EDITH STARKEY (1:10-CV-03495-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 23, 2015 Filing 4836 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS PETER CUMMINS AND EMILY CUMMINS (1:08-CV-00370-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 23, 2015 Filing 4835 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS GRACE MURREY AND EDWARD MURREY, IV (1:08-CV-02372-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 23, 2015 Filing 4834 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS DANIEL POSTON AND DARLINE POSTON (1:07-CV-01846-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4833 ORDER re mandatory mediation process established as to remaining unresolved cases before this Court, as delineated in the attached document. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: list of unresolved cases)(Duhamel, John)
June 23, 2015 Filing 4832 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
June 23, 2015 Filing 4831 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF VERA A. CLAY (1:08-CV-02349-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 23, 2015 Filing 4830 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ALBERT E. BARNES (1:08-CV-02349-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 23, 2015 Filing 4829 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF LISA RUBCHINUK (1:13-CV-03784-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 23, 2015 Filing 4828 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF BOBBIE WEED (1:10-CV-03423-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 23, 2015 Filing 4827 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF JEFFREY CARR (1:14-CV-03852-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 19, 2015 Filing 4826 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
June 18, 2015 Filing 4825 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF AILEEN REESE (1:08-CV-02489-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 18, 2015 Filing 4824 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF JACQUELINE WHITE (1:08-CV-02371-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 18, 2015 Filing 4823 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF RODNEY WINGER (1:08-CV-02481-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 18, 2015 Filing 4822 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF TAMMY MOORE (1:12-CV-03737-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 18, 2015 Filing 4821 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF DENISE GONZALES (1:09-CV-02844-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice re #4819 Stipulation as to GERTRUDE GRAY (CA 13-3839ML), #4820 Stipulation as to RICHARD WAYNE SMITH (CA 08-2650ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/17/2015. (Duhamel, John)
June 17, 2015 Filing 4820 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF RICHARD WAYNE SMITH (1:08-CV-02650-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 17, 2015 Filing 4819 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF GERTRUDE GRAY (1:13-CV-03839-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4818 Motion for 30-Day Extension of Time for NORMA OLMO (CA 13-3820ML) to provide Defendant with her expert report. The deadline is hereby extended to JULY 16, 2015. (SEE also #4780 Order denying Motion to Remand). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/17/2015. (Duhamel, John)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice re: #4812 Stipulation as to JACQUELINE/WILLIAM STEY (CA 08-2520ML), #4813 Stipulation as to GERALD KING, LAVERNE KING, HEIDI KING, GERALD L. KING II, GERARD KING, HEATHER OSWALD, HOLLY FAGAN, and GREGORY KING (CA 09-2985ML), #4814 Stipulation as to MARK PASNIK (CA 09-191ML), #4815 Stipulation as to MARGARET SPIERS (CA 12-3686ML), #4816 Stipulation as to PRUDENCE O'CONNOR (CA 12-3722ML), #4817 Stipulation as to CHARLES STONE. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/17/2015. (Duhamel, John)
June 16, 2015 Filing 4818 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Produce Expert Report as it relates to Olmo (13-3820) filed by Norma Olmo. Responses due by 7/6/2015 (Migliori, Donald)
June 16, 2015 Filing 4817 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF CHARLES STONE (1:09-CV-00442-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 16, 2015 Filing 4816 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF PRUDENCE O'CONNOR (1:12-CV-03722-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 16, 2015 Filing 4815 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF MARGARET SPIERS (1:12-CV-03686-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 16, 2015 Filing 4814 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF MARK PASNIK (1:09-CV-00191-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 16, 2015 Filing 4813 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS GERALD KING, LAVERNE KING, HEIDI KING, GERALD L. KING II, GERARD KING, HEATHER OSWALD, HOLLY FAGAN AND GREGORY KING (1:09-CV-02985-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 16, 2015 Filing 4812 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS JACQUELINE STEY AND WILLIAM D. STEY (1:08-CV-02520-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 15, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary M. Lisi: Motion Hearing held on 6/15/2015 re #4798 MOTION to Remand (as it relates to Hyland CA 07-1851ML). Counsel present: D. Migliori, J. Hooper; Attorney E. Schwarz participating by telephone. -- Motion to Remand DENIED (w/o prejudice). Counsel to prepare/submit order as to today's proceedings/ruling. (Court Reporter Denise Veitch.) (Duhamel, John)
June 15, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary M. Lisi: In-Chambers Conference held on 6/15/2015 re status of mediations. Counsel present: D. Mogliori, J. Hooper. (Duhamel, John)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4811 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to the following: JAMES BISHOP (CA 10-3282ML); CHERYL BODER (CA 09-3036ML); LONNY DUMPPROPE (CA 10-3556ML); ROBERT KAMINSKI (CA 11-3595ML); LYNDA LAMOTHE (CA 10-3398ML); TOMMY PACK (CA 12-3684ML); KIMBERLY SPRADLEY (CA 11-3657ML); LYDIA SUNDQUIST (CA 12-3714ML); JENNIFER WRIGHT (CA 09-2739ML); DEBORAH ANDERSON (CA 10-3481ML); RITA BERGER (CA 11-3621ML); DARWIN DICK (CA 10-3128ML); RAELYNN DUNSMORE (CA 11-3663ML); DONNA EVERETT (CA 12-3713ML); DONNA GILESPIE(STICE) (CA 10-3502ML); PATTI RALEY (CA 12-3727ML); VICKIE TAYLOR (CA 12-3695ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/12/2015. (Duhamel, John)
June 11, 2015 Filing 4811 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4810 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to PATRICIA/JACK SMITH (CA 12-3678ML); entering #4809 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to RUSSELL GARCIA (CA 13-3819ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/3/2015. (Duhamel, John)
June 2, 2015 Filing 4810 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF RUSSELL GARCIA (1:13-CV-03819-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 2, 2015 Filing 4809 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS PATRICIA SMITH AND JACK SMITH (1:12-CV-03678-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4808 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to ADAM WILSON (CA 10-3152ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 6/2/2015. (Duhamel, John)
June 1, 2015 Filing 4808 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ADAM WILSON (1:10-CV-03152-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 29, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re #4798 MOTION to Remand as it relates to Hyland, CA 07-1851ML: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for MONDAY, 6/15/2015 at 01:00 PM in Judge Lisi's Chambers (third floor) before Judge Mary M. Lisi. -- Participating counsel have been notified via e-mail re contact information.(Duhamel, John)
May 28, 2015 Filing 4807 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4798 MOTION to Remand as it relates to Hyland 07-1851 filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. Replies due by 6/4/2015. (Brown, Michael)
May 20, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice re: #4801 Stipulation as to TYLER EFAU, CRYSTAL EFAU, STANLEY EFAU, and AMANDA GARRETT (CA 09-2917ML); #4802 Stipulation as to ERNEST BURGE and SHARON BURGE (CA 08-2144ML); #4803 Stipulation as to MISCHELLE ANDRES (CA 13-3768ML); #4804 Stipulation as to ANGEL MARIE WILSON (CA 07-1910ML); #4805 Stipulation as to MAGANA and JULIA MAGANA (CA 14-3866ML); #4806 Stipulation as to JOHN A. VON ESSEN (CA 09-2715ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/20/2015. (Duhamel, John)
May 19, 2015 Filing 4806 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF JOHN A. VON ESSEN (1:09-CV-02715-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 19, 2015 Filing 4805 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS JAVIER MAGANA AND JULIA MAGANA (1:14-CV-03866-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 19, 2015 Filing 4804 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ANGEL MARIE WILSON (1:07-CV-01910-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 19, 2015 Filing 4803 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF MISCHELLE ANDRES (1:13-CV-03768-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 19, 2015 Filing 4802 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS ERNEST BURGE AND SHARON BURGE (1:08-CV-02144-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 19, 2015 Filing 4801 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS TYLER EFAU, CRYSTAL EFAU, STANLEY EFAU, AND AMANDA GARRETT (1:09-CV-02917-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4800 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to the following: SAMMY BAILEY (CA 10-145ML), GLADYS BANKS (CA 10-084ML), HELEN COX (CA 10-060ML), KATHERINE GILLARD (CA 10-349ML), MICHAEL JONES (CA 08-525ML), BILYE MARTINEZ (CA 08-283ML), VICKI POLE (CA 08-204ML), MONA ROSE (CA 08-387ML), OLETA STONE (CA 09-455ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/19/2015. (Duhamel, John)
May 18, 2015 Filing 4800 STIPULATION DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
May 11, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: In-Chambers Conference with liaison counsel D. Migliori & J. Hooper re mediations set for MONDAY, 6/15/2015 at 12:00 NOON in Judge Lisi's Chambers - (third floor) before Judge Mary M. Lisi. (Duhamel, John)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4799 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to the following: THELMA HAIRSTON (CA 10-3247ML), BRANDEE FAGER (CA 10-3057ML), ROBERT LaMAR (CA 10-3433ML), JEANETTE WOODY (CA 09-2937ML); LONNIE GODDARD (CA 10-3253ML), HORACE LEDWELL (CA 08-2560ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/8/2015. (Duhamel, John)
May 7, 2015 Filing 4799 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
May 6, 2015 Filing 4798 MOTION to Remand as it relates to Hyland (CA 07-1851ML) filed by Thomas D. Hyland. Responses due by 5/26/2015 (Migliori, Donald)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4793 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to DAN ELLIS (CA 13-3829ML); #4794 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to KAREN/TROY HALL (CA 13-3830ML); #4795 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to CASEY N. OPPENHEIM (CA 14-3859ML); #4796 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to LINDA MARTIN (CA 13-3837ML); #4797 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to LAVELLE ALLEN (CA 14-3853ML), JAMES BYRD (CA 13-3833ML), KRISTIE HARLIN (CA 14-3856ML), STEPHANIE HARRISON (CA 13-3835ML), COLLINS LONG (CA 13-3834ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/5/2015. (Duhamel, John)
May 4, 2015 Filing 4797 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
May 4, 2015 Filing 4796 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF LINDA MARTIN (1:13-CV-03837-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 1, 2015 Filing 4795 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF CASEY N. OPPENHEIM (1:14-CV-03859-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 1, 2015 Filing 4794 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS KAREN HALL A/K/A KAREN RAWLINGS AND TROY HALL (1:13-CV-03830-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 1, 2015 Filing 4793 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF DAN ELLIS (1:13-CV-03829-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4788 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to EVA MARILYN GOGGANS (CA 10-3219ML); #4789 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to MARINA WEIS (CA 08-2486ML); #4790 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to WALTER PITCHER (CA 12-3742ML); #4791 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to SUSANNA G. SANDBERG (CA 09-2986ML); #4792 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to JANET S. SAYERS (CA 10-3451ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 5/1/2015. (Duhamel, John) Modified on 5/1/2015 to note that the case as to S. SANDBERG (CA 09-2986ML) was previously dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the #4745 Order granting #4739 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. (Duhamel, John).
April 30, 2015 Filing 4792 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF JANET S. SAYERS (1:10-CV-03451-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 30, 2015 Filing 4791 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF SUSANNA G. SANDBERG (1:09-CV-02986-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 30, 2015 Filing 4790 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF WALTER PITCHER (1:12-CV-03742-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 30, 2015 Filing 4789 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF MARINA WEIS (1:08-CV-02486-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 30, 2015 Filing 4788 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF EVA MARILYN GOGGANS (1:10-CV-03219-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4786 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to ROBERT FICKENSCHER (CA 10-3293ML); #4785 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to DONNA L. STEWART (CA 10-3150ML); #4787 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to ROBERT C. LENTZ (CA 08-2418ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/29/2015. (Duhamel, John)
April 28, 2015 Filing 4787 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ROBERT C. LENTZ (1:08-CV-02418-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 28, 2015 Filing 4786 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF DONNA L. STEWART (1:10-CV-03150-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 28, 2015 Filing 4785 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ROBERT FICKENSCHER (1:10-CV-03293-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4783 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to THOMAS A. JONES, III (CA 12-3706ML); entering #4784 Stipulation as to W.FRANK/CAMILLE COFER (CA 09-2800ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/22/2015. (Duhamel, John)
April 21, 2015 Filing 4784 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS W. FRANK AND CAMILLE COFER (1:09-CV-02800-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 21, 2015 Filing 4783 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF THOMAS A. JONES (1:12-CV-03706-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4781 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to ROBYN/DANNY PERKINS (CA 07-1939ML); entering #4782 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to ALICIA DANIEL (CA 13-3823ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/21/2015. (Duhamel, John)
April 20, 2015 Filing 4782 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ALICIA DANIEL (1:13-CV-03823-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 20, 2015 Filing 4781 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS ROBYN & DANNY PERKINS (1:07-CV-01939-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4780 ORDER denying without prejudice #4760 Motion to Remand as to NORMA OLMO (CA 13-3820ML). The Stay of Discovery is hereby partially lifted and limited to the production of an expert report by Plaintiff, and examination of same by both parties. Plaintiff shall provide Defendants with an expert report which includes an examination of the mesh at issue in this matter by June 16, 2015. Testing shall be conducted in accordance with an agreed upon protocol between the parties. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/17/2015. (Duhamel, John)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4779 Stipulation of Dismissal as to the following: MICHELLE BESKE (CA 13-3798ML); SUZANNE CARTER (CA 13-3795); CHERYL DE LA S (CA 11-3617ML); CAROL JUNTA (CA 13-3761ML); JOE NEWKIRK, JR. (CA 13-3760ML); JODI SCHALLER (CA 13-3781ML); SANDRA WADSWORTH (CA 10-3162ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/10/2015. (Duhamel, John)
April 9, 2015 Filing 4779 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4778 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to the following: DELPHINE BOND (CA 08-2333ML); FLORENCE HOROWITZ (CA 07-1865ML); KIMBERLY STRAIN (CA 08-2572ML); and CARMEN WOLFRAM (CA 09-2710ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/9/2015. (Duhamel, John)
April 8, 2015 Filing 4778 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4777 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to TOBY A. DIRESTA, as Administratrix of the Estate of Ronald P. DiResta (CA 13-3849ML); entering #4776 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to JOSEPH CARNS (CA 08-2629ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/8/2015. (Duhamel, John)
April 6, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary M. Lisi: Telephone Conference held in Chambers on 4/6/2015 re: CA13-3829 Norma Olmo. Counsel present: Michael K. Brown and Justin R. Parafinczuk. (Jackson, Kerrie)
April 6, 2015 Filing 4777 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF JOSEPH CARNS (1:08-CV-02629-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 6, 2015 Filing 4776 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF TOBY A. DIRESTA (1:13-CV-03849-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4775 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to MARTIN/VALERIE FISHGOLD (CA 08-2536ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 4/1/2015. (Duhamel, John)
March 31, 2015 Filing 4775 STIPULATION of DISMISSAL with prejudice (as it relates to Fishgold, CA 08-2536ML) by Martin Fishgold, Valerie Fishgold, Davol, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Duhamel, John)
March 27, 2015 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC Hearing on Motion re #4760 MOTION to Remand as it relates to NORMA OLMO (CA 13-3820ML): Telephonic Motion Hearing set for MONDAY, 4/6/2015 at 01:00 PM in Judge Lisi's Chambers. Particpating counsel (Donald Migliori, Marcus John Susen & Michael Brown) have been provided with call-in instructions.(Duhamel, John)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL (without prejudice) as to the following: #4768 Stipulation as to JEFF BOGGS (CA 07-1934ML), on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated; #4769 Stipulation as to CAROL NUNES-MCNAMARA (CA 07-0064ML), on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated; #4770 Stipulation as to FLORENCE HOROWITZ, ARNOLD HOROWITZ, AND RUTH ANN BABCOCK (CA 07-1865ML), on behhalf of themselves and all others similarly situated; #4771 Stipulation as to BRENDA GAYVONT (CA 07-1966ML), on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated; #4772 Stipulation as to HUGH FRENCH AND MICHAEL EARLES (CA 08-2463ML), on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated; #4773 Stipulation as to STEVEN BOST AND DONNA BYERS (CA 07-1952ML), on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/26/2015. (Duhamel, John)
March 25, 2015 Filing 4774 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4760 MOTION to Remand as it relates to Olmo (13-3820) filed by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Brown, Michael)
March 25, 2015 Filing 4773 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFFS STEVEN BOST AND DONNA BYERS, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (1:07-CV-01952-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 25, 2015 Filing 4772 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFFS HUGH FRENCH AND MICHAEL EARLES, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (1:08-CV-02463-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 25, 2015 Filing 4771 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF BRENDA GAYVONT, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (1:07-CV-01966-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 25, 2015 Filing 4770 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFFS FLORENCE HOROWITZ, ARNOLD HOROWITZ, AND RUTH ANN BABCOCK, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (1:07-CV-01865-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 25, 2015 Filing 4769 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF CAROL NUNES-MCNAMARA, ON BEHALF OF HERSELF AND ALL OTHERS SIMILARLY SITUATED (1:07-CV-00064-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 25, 2015 Filing 4768 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF JEFF BOGGS, ON BEHALF OF HIMSELF AND ALL OTHERS SITUATED (1:07-CV-01934-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4767 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: REBECCA BLAIR (CA 13-3756ML); JOYCE CHEVARRIA (CA 11-3571ML); MARSHA DRAKE (CA 12-3738ML); BOBBY FORD (CA 12-3712ML); JULIE KIMURA (CA 10-3317ML); JULIE KURSCHNER-PINEDA (CA 10-3540ML); EDWARD ROSS (CA 09-2731ML); CLIFFORD VIERRA, SR. (CA 10-3396ML); ADALINE WAKEFIELD (CA 12-3697ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/20/2015. (Duhamel, John)
March 19, 2015 Filing 4767 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
March 19, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4766 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to JAMES PIETRANGELO (CA 10-3376ML) & SHERRY THIBEAULT (CA 10-3375ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/19/2015. (Duhamel, John)
March 18, 2015 Filing 4766 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4765 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (without prejudice) as it relates to Plaintiffs CINDY L. & ROBERT J. RHOADES (CA 09-2943ML) for failure to comply with Magistrate Judge Almond's #4734 Order directing said Plaintiffs to enter the case "pro se" or engage successor counsel within 30 days of the #4734 Order granting counsel's #4715 Motion to Withdraw. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/17/2015. (A copy of the attached Order was forwarded via first-class mail to the last known address of Plaintiffs.)(Duhamel, John)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4763 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to NANCY NICOLAYSON (CA 10-3179ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/11/2015. (Duhamel, John)
March 10, 2015 Filing 4764 TRANSCRIPT of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (as it relates to BOWERSOCK, CA 08-2635ML) held on December 4, 2014, before Judge Mary M. Lisi. Court Reporter Denise P. Veitch, Telephone number 401-323-9337. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion.. Redaction Request due 3/31/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2015. (Veitch, Denise)
March 10, 2015 Filing 4763 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF NANCY NICOLAYSON (1:10-CV-03179-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: #4761 Stipulation as to J.W. COLLINS (CA 07-1858ML); #4762 Stipulation as to RHONDA BRYANT (CA 13-3778ML), ROBERT CASILE (CA 13-3772ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/10/2015. (Duhamel, John)
March 9, 2015 Filing 4762 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
March 9, 2015 Filing 4761 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF J. W. COLLINS (1:07-CV-01858-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4759 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to DOUGLAS GREER (CA 10-3080ML), BRYAN WHIPP (CA 08-2590ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/5/2015. (Duhamel, John)
March 4, 2015 Filing 4760 MOTION to Remand as it relates to Olmo (13-3820) filed by Norma Olmo. Responses due by 3/23/2015 (Migliori, Donald)
March 4, 2015 Filing 4759 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering the following STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: #4749 Stipulation as to TAMARA AGUNDEZ (CA 13-3786ML); #4750 Stipulation as to BETTE RAE BRICKER (CA 08-2454ML), CHERYL CARR (CA 08-2335ML), TIMOTHY HOFF, SR. (CA 08-2574ML), DORIS KENNEDY (CA 09-2786ML), LARRY MOORE (CA 08-2530ML), MARYLOU WILL (CA 09-2740ML); #4751 Stipulation as to LINDA MONTELONGO (CA 10-3397ML); #4752 Stipulation as to RACHEL S. LISA (CA 10-3151ML); #4753 Stipulation as to JOSEPH A. HUDSON (CA 09-2939ML); #4755 Stipulation as to RONALD LAKE (CA 13-3800ML); #4756 Stipulation as to PAULA BILLYARD (CA 08-0136ML); #4757 Stipulation as to GERALD R. SCHULTZ (CA 09-3007ML); #4758 Stipulation as to WENDELL ADAMS (CA 13-3759ML), SHARON ADKINS (CA 10-3290ML), RICK AURICH (CA 10-3106ML), ANTHONY BLACKBURN, SR. (CA 11-3648ML), TERESA BLAND (CA 12-3675ML), GLADYS BOSQUE (CA 11-3596ML), JAMES BOWNS (CA 13-3766ML), DANNY (NOBERTO) CANTU (CA 12-3711ML), WILLIAM COLLIER (CA 09-2717ML), WINDY CROMWELL (CA 11-3637ML), LANNY CUTSFORTH (CA 12-3683ML), DANNY DANIELS (CA 11-3614ML), TORRE DANNER (CA 10-3503ML), LILLY DAVIS (CA 11-3635ML), DAWN DEMPSTER (CA 11-3649ML), LESLIE ECKER (CA 11-3569ML), OPAL ESAKOV (CA 10-3126ML), GARY HALL (CA 10-3101ML), (DALE) THURMAN HAMMETT (CA 11-3664ML), JOSEPH IMBROGNO (CA 12-3699ML), PAUL JAMES (CA 09-2738ML), DAVID JEFFRIES (CA 13-3763ML), WENDY JOHNSON (CA 13-3764ML), TRACY JONES (CA 10-3105ML), KENNETH LEALIE (CA 13-3767ML), TAMICO LIPSEY (CA 12-3731ML), CURTIS LONG (CA 09-2736ML), JULIA MATTISON (CA 12-3671ML), TODD MILLER (CA 08-2546ML), DAWN MOORE (CA 12-3739ML), ROCHELLE NAJOR (CA 13-3765ML), RANDY NEUENFELDT (CA 12-3677ML), PATRICIA NUARA (CA 09-30365ML), FRANK OFFLEY (CA 09-2992ML), DUVALLE PERRY (CA 11-3654ML), TIMOTHY POWERS (CA 10-3161ML), VIRGINIA ROSILLO (CA 10-3399ML), SHEILA ROWLAND (CA 11-3570ML), KENNETH SMITH (CA 11-3667ML), ANGELA STARK (CA 10-3291ML), ALAN SUNDEM (CA 10-3124ML), ALVIN TAYLOR (CA 13-3771ML), RICKIE VOSS (CA 10-3501ML), DOROTHY WADE (CA 10-3110ML), ARTHUR WHITE (CA 13-3762ML), DANA WILLIAMS-CLARK (CA 10-3054ML), LANCE ZUELKE (CA 09-2837ML), DONNA ANDERSON (CA 10-3473ML), SHARON BEANE (CA 09-2896ML), ARMINTA BELL (CA 12-3670ML), BRENT BETTERIDGE (CA 10-3261ML), ANGELA BRIDGES (CA 10-3480ML), VICTORIA CARABALLO (CA 11-3607ML), KATHLEEN GRANT (CA 10-3292ML), RALPH JOHN (CA 10-3520ML), MICHAEL KEENE (CA 10-3127ML), DOROTHY OVERBEY (CA 10-3315ML), THANE PARTON (CA 08-2545ML), JOYCE REGISTER (CA 10-3316ML), BRENDA RICKETTS (CA 10-3129ML), LINDA ROBERTSON (CA 11-3622ML), TERRY WHITE (CA 09-2838ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 3/4/2015. (Duhamel, John)
March 3, 2015 Filing 4758 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
March 3, 2015 Filing 4757 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF GERALD R. SCHULTZ (1:09-CV-03007-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 3, 2015 Filing 4756 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF PAULA BILLYARD (1:08-CV-00136-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 3, 2015 Filing 4755 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF RONALD LAKE (1:13-CV-03800-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 3, 2015 Filing 4754 NOTICE of Appearance (pro se) by Patricia Melom (as it relates to Melom, CA 09-2996ML) re #4720 Order granting Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Migliori, Donald)
March 3, 2015 Filing 4753 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF JOSPEH A. HUDSON (1:09-CV-02939-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 3, 2015 Filing 4752 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF RACHEL LISA (1:10-CV-03151-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 3, 2015 Filing 4751 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF LINDA MONTELONGO (1:10-CV-03397-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
March 3, 2015 Filing 4750 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
March 3, 2015 Filing 4749 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF TAMARA AGUNDEZ (1:13-CV-03786-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 26, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: In-Chambers Conference with liaison counsel John Hooper & Donald Migliori set for FRIDAY, 3/27/2015 at 01:00 PM in Judge Lisi's Chambers (third floor) before Judge Mary M. Lisi. (Duhamel, John) Modified on 3/27/2015 to note that this conference was not held. (Duhamel, John).
February 26, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mary M. Lisi: In-Chambers Conference held on 2/26/2015. Liaison counsel participating: D. Migliori (by telephone); J. Hooper. (Duhamel, John)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice as to the following: #4740 Stipulation as to TRINIDAD ROSE TREJO (CA 08-2558ML); #4741 Stipulation as to JEFFREY TOBIN (CA 12-3732ML); #4742 Stipulation as to ROBERT AUTHEMENT (CA 09-2723ML); #4743 Stipulation as to FRANK BULLOCK (CA 11-3592ML); #4744 Stipulation as to JAMES BRANSKE & VENIECE GELARDI (Special Administrator of Estate of Angeline Branske) (CA 10-3561ML); #4746 Stipulation as to ANDRADE CONCEPCION (CA 12-3701ML), GEORGE AZAR (CA 13-3799ML), EVELYN SMILES (CA 13-3842ML); #4747 Stipulation as to MERILYN HERBST (CA 08-2616ML). -- So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/25/2015. (Duhamel, John)
February 24, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing: In-Chambers Conference with liaison counsel John Hooper & Donald Migliori set for THURSDAY, 2/26/2015 at 02:30 PM in Judge Lisi's Chambers - Room 310 before Judge Mary M. Lisi. (Attorney Migliori to participate by telephone; Court will initiate the call to Mr. Migliori.)(Duhamel, John)
February 24, 2015 Filing 4748 RESPONSE to the Court's #4735 Order as it relates to FELTON ESTES (CA 12-3719ML), directing Mr. Estes to provide to the Court the reasons why he believes he is entitled to the Court granting his #4733 Motion to Vacate the Court's #4696 Order of Dismissal. (Attachments: #1 Physicians' Reports) (received on 2/23/2015)(Duhamel, John)
February 24, 2015 Filing 4747 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF MARILYN HERBST (1:08-CV-02616-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 24, 2015 Filing 4746 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4745 ORDER granting #4739 Motion to Dismiss Complaint with prejudice (as it relates to SUSANNA G. SANDBERG, CA 09-2986ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/24/2015. (Duhamel, John)
February 24, 2015 Filing 4744 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS JAMES BRANSKE, INDIVIDUALLY, AND VENIECE GELARDI, AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF ANGELINE BRANSKE (1:10-CV-03561-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 24, 2015 Filing 4743 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF FRANK BULLOCK (1:11-CV-03592-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 24, 2015 Filing 4742 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ROBERT AUTHEMENT (1:09-CV-02723-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 24, 2015 Filing 4741 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF JEFFREY TOBIN (1:12-CV-03732-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 24, 2015 Filing 4740 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF TRINIDAD ROSE TREJO (1:08-CV-02558-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 23, 2015 Filing 4739 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Susanna G Sandberg. Responses due by 3/12/2015 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Migliori, Donald)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4737 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to ROBYN LINDER (CA 09-3032ML); entering #4738 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to CATHERINE O'NEILL (CA 12-3694ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/19/2015. (Duhamel, John)
February 18, 2015 Filing 4738 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF CATHERINE O'NEILL (1:12-CV-03694-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 18, 2015 Filing 4737 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFF ROBYN LINDER (1:09-CV-03032-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4736 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to the following: JEAN BARRESI (CA 08-2549ML), HARRY BARSAMIAN (CA 07-1911ML), JUDITH CONNOR (CA 08-2630ML), DAVID DEEN (CA 08-2551ML), BRENDA NEAR (CA 08-2331ML), ROSELLA NELSON (CA 09-2761ML), MICHAEL YOUNG (CA 09-2887ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/17/2015. (Duhamel, John)
February 16, 2015 Filing 4736 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4735 ORDER as it relates to FELTON ESTES, CA 12-3719ML: Mr. Estes is hereby directed to provide to the Court the reasons why he believes he is entitled to the Court granting his #4733 Motion to Vacate the Court's #4696 Order of Dismissal. Plaintiff shall file his response to this Order on or before MARCH 6, 2015. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/13/2015. (A copy of the attached order was forwarded to Felton Estes via first-class mail on 2/13/2015.)(Duhamel, John)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4734 ORDER granting #4715 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed by Cindy L Rhodes. (as it relates to CINDY RHODES/ROBERT J. RHODES, CA 09-2943ML). Plaintiffs Cindy L. and Robert J. Rhoades are hereby directed to enter their appearance "pro se" or engage successor counsel within thirty days of entry of this Order. Failure to do so will result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs' former counsel shall immediately forward a copy of this ORDER to Plaintiffs at their last-known address. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 2/12/2015. (Noel, Jeannine)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering the following Stipulations of Dismissal with prejudice: #4728 Stipulation as to DERRICK/JOY PAYNE (CA 13-3850ML), WILLIAM S. ROGERS, III (CA 13-3832ML), ANGIE/ROB SPRING (CA 13-3827ML); #4729 Stipulation as to CHARLOTTE M. WEEKS (CA 08-0260ML); #4730 Stipulation as to TRESSICA HELTON (CA 08-0259ML); #4731 Stipulation as to SUSAN BOEGNER (CA 12-3687ML); #4732 Stipulation as to DEBRAH HORNSTEIN (CA 13-3841ML), RICHARD J. MCINTOSH, II (CA 11-3587ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/10/2015. (Duhamel, John)
February 9, 2015 Filing 4733 MOTION to Vacate #4696 ORDER OF DISMISSAL (without prejudice) as it relates to Plaintiffs FELTON and VICTORIA ESTES (CA 12-3719ML) for failure to comply with Magistrate Judge Almond's #4678 Order directing said Plaintiffs to enter the case "pro se" or engage successor counsel within 30 days of the #4678 Order granting counsel's #4669 Amended Motion to Withdraw) filed by Felton Estes. Responses due by 2/26/2015 (Duhamel, John)
February 9, 2015 Filing 4732 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
February 6, 2015 Filing 4731 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF SUSAN BOEGNER (1:12-CV-03687-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 6, 2015 Filing 4730 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF TRESSICA HELTON (1:08-CV-00259-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 6, 2015 Filing 4729 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF CHARLOTTE M. WEEKS (1:08-CV-00260-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 6, 2015 Filing 4728 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering the following Stipulations of Dismissal with prejudice: #4723 Stipulation as to JANIE POLING (CA 14-3865ML); #4724 Stipulation as to DEBORAH ANN PLATTEN (CA 13-3812ML); #4725 Stipulation as to SOPHIA/NICHOLAS KATECHIA (CA 07-1852ML) ; #4726 Stipulation as to CHERYL HAGERSTRAD (CA 13-3743ML); #4727 Stipulation as to RANDY/LAURA LECK (CA 09-2796ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/6/2015. (Duhamel, John)
February 5, 2015 Filing 4727 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFFS RANDY LECK & LAURA LECK (1:09-CV-02796-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 5, 2015 Filing 4726 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF CHERYL HAGERSTRAD (1:13-CV-03743-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 5, 2015 Filing 4725 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFFS SOPHIA KATECHIS & NICHOLAS KATECHIS (1:07-CV-01852-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 5, 2015 Filing 4724 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF DEBRAH ANN PLATTEN (1:13-CV-03812-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
February 5, 2015 Filing 4723 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF JANIE POLING (1:14-CV-03865-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
January 30, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering the following STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL with prejudice: #4716 Stipulation as to DEBRA/MICHAEL WILTERMOOD (CA 07-1882ML); #4717 Stipulation as to DONNA PALANGE (CA 08-2497ML); #4718 Stipulation as to MARTIN DOROUGH (CA 10-3277ML), VALLI ENRIONE (CA 11-3618ML), ELOISE MCKNIGHT (CA 09-3001ML), KENNETH RANDALL (CA 08-2382ML), JAMES REGAN (CA 12-3725ML), HARRY SHAPIRO (CA 12-3723ML), NANCY STONE (CA 11-3656ML), JAMES VEYERA (CA 12-3721ML), KENT WARD (CA 13-3752ML), JOYCE WILLIAMS (CA 10-3098MK); #4719 Stipulation as to PATRICK CAIL (CA 13-3787ML), MELISSA VICE (CA 09-2735ML); #4721 Stipulation as to SHERRIE GREENIER (CA 12-3707ML); #4722 Stipulation as to KIMBERLY CATLETT (CA 08-2249ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 1/30/2015. (Duhamel, John)
January 29, 2015 Filing 4722 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF KIMBERLY CATLETT (1:08-CV-02249-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
January 29, 2015 Filing 4721 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF SHERRIE GREENIER (1:12-CV-03707-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4720 ORDER granting #4692 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (as it relates to PATRICIA MELOM, CA 09-2996ML) filed by Patricia Melom. This matter came before the Court on January 28, 2015. It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Document No. 4692) is GRANTED. Plaintiff Patricia Melon is hereby directed to enter her appearance "pro se" or engage successor counsel within sixty days of entry of this Order. Failure to do so will result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's former counsel shall immediately forward a copy of this ORDER to Plaintiff at her last-known address. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/29/2015. (Noel, Jeannine)
January 28, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2015 re #4692 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (as it relates to PATRICIA MELOM, CA 09-2996ML) filed by Patricia Melom. (Banks, Kaufman, Donaldson, Melom) Defense Counsel not present on call; Plaintiff has no objection to Motion; Court grants motion; Order to follow (Courtroom A at 3:10 pm.) (Noel, Jeannine) Modified on 1/29/2015 (Noel, Jeannine).
January 28, 2015 Filing 4719 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
January 28, 2015 Filing 4718 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
January 28, 2015 Filing 4717 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF DONNA PALANGE (1:08-CV-02497-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
January 28, 2015 Filing 4716 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFFS DEBRA A. WILTERMOOD AND MICHAEL WILTERMOOD (1:07-CV-01882-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
January 26, 2015 Filing 4715 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed by Cindy L Rhodes. (as it relates to CINDY RHODES/ROBERT J. RHODES, CA 09-2943ML) Responses due by 2/12/2015 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit: Military)(Migliori, Donald)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4714 ORDER: Subsequent to Plaintiff's letter request to the Court, Plaintiff Felton Estes shall file his Motion to Vacate the dismissal order entered by this Court at #4696 on or before February 10, 2015 (as it relates to FELTON & VICTORIA ESTES; CA 12-3719ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 1/20/2015. (Attachments: #1 Felton Estes' letter requesting leave to file) (A copy of the instant order was forwarded to Felton Estes via first-class mail to the return address indicated on the envelope containing Mr. Estes' letter correspondence).(Duhamel, John)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4713 ORDER granting #4712 Motion to Substitute Attorney as it relates to Susanna G Sandberg (CA 09-2986ML).. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 1/13/2015. (Duhamel, John)
January 9, 2015 Filing 4712 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Stephen Fieweger filed by Susanna G Sandberg. Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Migliori, Donald)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4711 ORDER: Further to the #4637 Order entered on 9/16/2014 establishing a settlement process for the unresolved cases identified on Exhibit A, the settlement process is extended, with additional in-person settlement conferences to be held on 2/25 & 2/26, 2015 and 3/25 & 3/26, 2015. By 1/13/2015, Plaintiff's counsel for those cases listed on Exhibit "B" shall select one of the aforementioned sessions to attend, and subsequently notify attorneys John Hooper and Donald Migliori as directed on Page 1 of the attached Order. So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 1/6/2015. (Duhamel, John)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4709 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to KRAIG VALDEZ (CA 08-2458ML); entering #4710 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to GERALD ROTHENFLUCH (CA 14-3862ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 1/6/2015. (Duhamel, John)
January 5, 2015 Filing 4710 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF GERALD ROTHENFLUCH (1:14-CV-03862-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
January 5, 2015 Filing 4709 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF KRAIG VALEDEZ (1:08-CV-02458-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
December 24, 2014 Filing 4708 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION of Attorney Barry R. Murner filed by Debra Reedy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit: Certificate of Good Standing)(Migliori, Donald) Modified on 12/24/2014 to note that the attached "notice" was filed as a "motion" -- "motion" terminated; response due date deleted. (Duhamel, John).
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #4707 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to WILLIAM B. DEBOARD (CA 08-2222ML) & MORRIS WEIBEL (CA 08-2270ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/24/2014. (Duhamel, John)
December 23, 2014 Filing 4707 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering the following Stipulations of Dismissal: #4699 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to ROBERT/DIANE RAITT (CA 08-2539ML); #4700 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to TAMMY JENSEN (CA 13-3845ML); #4701 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to ANGELA DENISE/JERRY KITCHEN (CA 08-2414ML); #4702 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to ANGELA CASANAVE (CA 11-3668ML), FRANCISCO CHAVEZ (CA 13-3831ML), NOEL BONNIE INGRAM (CA 11-3666ML), ANASTACIA MACKLEY (CA 13-3749ML), JONATHAN SPENCER (CA 12-3674ML), TONYA THOMAS (CA 12-3691ML); #4703 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to CARLETHA BREWTON-STRICKLAND (CA 10-3462ML), DIANA DUHART (CA 11-3665ML), DEBORAH MITCHELL (CA 08-2591ML), DIANE RILEY (CA 10-3097ML), ANGELA SPRUILL (CA 10-3076ML), DURWOOD TRAMMELL (CA 10-3460ML); #4704 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to TRACY BALLINGER (CA 13-3804ML), DAVID/ROSINA BRENDEL (CA 11-3653ML), MARLENE ENDERS (CA 13-3803ML), JANE FOX (CA 10-3437ML), JERRY HARVEY (CA 10-3521ML), WILLIAMS KETCHENS (CA 13-3821ML), JOSEPH MORABITI (CA 13-3805ML), JERRY PEMBERTON (CA 10-3436ML), RENE PEREZ (CA 13-3822ML), EUGENE REEDER (CA 13-3806ML), KEITH ROGERS (CA 13-3809ML), LAURA SMITH (CA 13-3808ML), LISA TAYLOR (CA 09-2839ML), DOROTHY TERRY (CA 13-3802ML), JUDY WILBER (CA 13-3807ML), CATHERINE WITCHEK (CA 13-3824ML); #4705 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to AMANDA GREEN (CA 13-3758ML); #4706 of Dismissal with prejudice as to ROBERT KARDES (CA 09-2788ML). So Ordered by Judge Mary M. Lisi on 12/23/2014. (Duhamel, John)
December 22, 2014 Filing 4706 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF ROBERT KARDES (1:09-CV-02788-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
December 22, 2014 Filing 4705 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF AMANDA GREEN (1:13-CV-03758-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
December 22, 2014 NOTICE of TELEPHONIC Hearing on Motion #4692 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (as it relates to PATRICIA MELOM, CA 09-2996ML) filed by Patricia Melom. TELEPHONIC Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2015 03:00 PM (EST) before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. Parties will be provided with call in information via email or fax. Plaintiff's Counsel shall notify Plaintiff of the telephonic hearing and call in instructions. (Noel, Jeannine) Modified on 1/28/2015 (Noel, Jeannine).
December 22, 2014 Filing 4704 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
December 22, 2014 Filing 4703 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
December 22, 2014 Filing 4702 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE PLAINTIFFS LISTED ON THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT A by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hooper, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 4701 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFFS ANGELA DENISE KITCHEN AND JERRY KITCHEN (1:08-CV-02414-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)
December 19, 2014 Filing 4700 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO PLAINTIFF TAMMY JENSEN (1:13-cv-03845-ML-LDA) by C.R. Bard, Inc, Davol, Inc. (Hooper, John)