Transamerica Life Insurance Company v. Caramadre et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Joseph Caramadre, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Estella Rodrigues, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., Lifemark Securities Corp. and Patrick Garvey
Case Number: 1:2009cv00471
Filed: October 2, 2009
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: David L. Martin
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2013 173 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael J. Daly Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Daly, Michael)
October 25, 2013 172 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 10/24/13. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
October 24, 2013 HEARING CANCELLED re Notice of Hearing on Motions to Compel: Motions Hearing set for 10/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan has been cancelled Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
October 24, 2013 Featured Case TEXT ORDER passing per request of counsel (155) Motion to Compel; passing per request of counsel (156) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS; passing per request of counsel (171) Motion to Compel; passing per request of counsel (172) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-PAS; passing per request of counsel (168) Motion to Compel; passing per request of counsel (169) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-PAS; passing per request of counsel (197) Motion to Compel; passing per request of counsel (198) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-PAS; passing per request of counsel (145) Motion to Compel; passing per request of counsel (146) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-PAS; passing per request of counsel (131) Motion to Compel; passing per request of counsel (132) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-PAS;passing per request of counsel (125) Motion to Compel; passing per request of counsel (126) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-PAS. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/24/13. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
October 16, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions (155 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-PAS, 171 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-PAS, 197 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-PAS, 145 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-PAS, 131 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-PAS, 125 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-PAS) MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories , (156 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS, 169 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-PAS, 172 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-PAS, 198 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-PAS, 146 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-PAS, 132 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-PAS, 126 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-PAS) MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories : Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
October 11, 2013 171 REPLY MEMORANDUM re (171 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-PAS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-PAS, 197 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-PAS, 125 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-PAS, 131 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-PAS, 145 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-PAS) MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories . Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Brenner, Jeffrey)
October 7, 2013 170 RESPONSE in Opposition re (171 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-PAS, 155 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS, 168 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-PAS, 197 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-PAS, 125 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-PAS, 131 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-PAS, 145 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-PAS) MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Western Reserve's Responses to Fortune Financial's 1st Set of Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit 2 Chart)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Daly, Michael)
September 20, 2013 169 MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories filed by Fortune Financial Services, Inc.. Responses due by 10/7/2013 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Brenner, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2013 168 MOTION to Compel More Responsive Answers to Second Set of Interrogatories filed by Fortune Financial Services, Inc.. Responses due by 10/7/2013 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Brenner, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 9/6/2013 with attorney Joseph Cavanaugh. ( Chambers at 12:10.) Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
September 5, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Settlement Conference held on 9/5/2013. (Chambers at 9:30.) Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
August 27, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Settlement Conference held on 8/27/2013. (Chambers at 9:00.) Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
August 27, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 9/5/2013 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with Lifemark Securities Corp., Transamerica Life Insurance Co. and Edward Maggiacomo, Jr.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
August 27, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 8/27/2013 with attorney Joseph Cavanagh, Jr. ( Chambers at 12:50.) Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
August 26, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Settlement Conference held on 8/26/2013. ( Chambers at 9:00.) Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
June 20, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 8/27/2013 09:00 AM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with plaintiff and defendant FORTUNE FINANCIAL. Settlement Conference set for 8/27/2013 1:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with plaintiff and defendants CONDIT and RADHAKRISHNAN. Settlement Conference set for 8/27/2013 3:00 PM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with plaintiff and defendants CARAMADRE, ADM and ESTATE PLANNING RESOURCES Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
June 20, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 8/26/2013 09:00 AM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan with plaintiff and defendant LIFEMARK. Settlement Conference set for 8/26/13 1:00 pm in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan for plaintiff and defendant MAGGIACOMO. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
May 7, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E. Smith: In Chambers Conference held on 5/7/2013; counsel present: B. Magratten; R. Flanders; R. Olen; T. Traini; J. Cavanagh; J. Brenner. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
April 11, 2013 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting in part and denying in part (153) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Granted as to Joseph Caramadre and Estate Planning Resources, denied as to Raymour Radhakrishnan and Harrison Condit until new counsel has entered an appearance for those parties; in cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS, 1:09-cv-00472-S-PAS, 1:09-cv-00471-S-PAS, 1:09-cv-00473-S-PAS, 1:09-cv-00502-S-PAS, 1:09-cv-00549-S-PAS, 1:09-cv-00564-S-PAS. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 4/11/13. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
April 9, 2013 Reset Hearings: In Chambers Conference RE-SCHEDULED for 5/7/2013 at 9:30 AM in Chambers before Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS, 1:09-cv-00471-S-PAS, 1:09-cv-00472-S-PAS, 1:09-cv-00473-S-PAS, 1:09-cv-00502-S-PAS, 1:09-cv-00549-S-PAS, 1:09-cv-00564-S-PAS(Jackson, Ryan)
April 9, 2013 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting (154) Motion to Continue in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS; granting (170) Motion to Continue in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-PAS; granting (167) Motion to Continue in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-PAS; granting (196) Motion to Continue in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-PAS; granting (144) Motion to Continue in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-PAS; granting (130) Motion to Continue in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-PAS; granting (124) Motion to Continue in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-PAS; Hearing will be rescheduled and a new notice will issue. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 4/9/13. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
April 4, 2013 167 MOTION to Continue by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Joseph A. Caramadre, ADM Associates, LLC. Responses due by 4/22/2013 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Olen, Randy)
April 4, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference scheduled for 4/29/2013 at 9:00 AM in Chambers before Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
April 1, 2013 Featured Case TEXT ORDER terminating as moot 125 Motion to Appoint Custodian ; terminating as moot 127 Motion to Join Emergency Motion for Partial Stay. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 3/29/13. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 29, 2013 166 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney WITH SUPPORTNG MEMO by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph A. Caramadre, Harrison Condit. Responses due by 4/15/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Flanders, Robert)
March 28, 2013 165 REPLY MEMORANDUM re (116 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-PAS) MOTION to Attach Prejudgment Attachment of Defendant Joseph Caramadre's Assets, including his Membership Interest in ADM Associates, LLC . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Magratten, Brooks)
March 22, 2013 164 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy Olen on behalf of Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc. (Olen, Randy)
March 22, 2013 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Randy Olen on behalf of Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Olen, Randy)
March 19, 2013 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting (150) Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to Reply to Defendant Caramadre's Objection to the Motion to Attach up to and including 3/28/13 in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS; granting (165) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-PAS; granting (160) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-PAS; granting (189) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-PAS; granting (139) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-PAS; granting (125) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-PAS; granting (119) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-PAS. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 3/19/13. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
March 13, 2013 160 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Reply to Defendant Caramadre's Objection to Motion to Attach to March 28, 2013 by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio. Responses due by 4/1/2013 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Daly, Michael)
March 6, 2013 162 MANDATE of USCA as to and in accordance with 161 USCA Judgment, 150 Notice of Appeal, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
March 6, 2013 161 USCA JUDGMENT as to 150 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Upon consideration of stipulation, it is hereby ordered that this appeal be voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) with each party to bear its own costs. Nothing in this judgment should be construed to affect Docket Nos. 12-2208 and 12-2209, which remain pending. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
March 4, 2013 159 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by Joseph Caramadre, Joseph A. Caramadre in support of (117 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-PAS) Response in Opposition to Motion,, Exhibit A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Flanders, Robert)
March 4, 2013 158 RESPONSE in Opposition re (116 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-PAS) MOTION to Attach Prejudgment Attachment of Defendant Joseph Caramadre's Assets, including his Membership Interest in ADM Associates, LLC WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Joseph Caramadre, Joseph A. Caramadre. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Joseph Caramadre's Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Attach)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Flanders, Robert)
February 5, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Settlement Conference held on 2/5/2013. (Chambers at 9:30.) (Saucier, Martha)
February 4, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Settlement Conference held on 2/4/2013. (Chambers at 1:50.) (Saucier, Martha)
January 29, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Settlement Conference held on 1/29/2013. (Chambers at 9:30.) Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
January 28, 2013 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan: Settlement Conference held on 1/28/2013. (Chambers at 9:30.) Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
December 28, 2012 SECOND RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference RESCHEDULED for 1/28/2013 at 9:30 am, 1/29/2013 at 9:30 am, 2/4/2013 at 1:30 pm and 2/5/2013 at 9:30 am in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. The parties are hereby directed to file a Joint "Roadmap" Submission to Magistrate Judge Sullivan on or before 1/7/13. Further, each party is directed to submit individual Settlement Conference Statements to the Court on or before 1/23/13; this statement is to be shared with the other parties in the case, but is not to be filed electronically through the CM/ECF system. In addition, any party that wishes to may submit a Confidential Settlement Statement directly to Magistrate Judge Sullivan on or before 1/23/13, which should not be filed electronically through the CM/ECF system. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Noel, Jeannine)
December 27, 2012 RESCHEDULING NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference RESCHEDULED for 1/28/2013, 1/29/2013, 2/4/2013 and 2/5/2013 at 09:30 AM in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-285 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. The parties are hereby directed to file a Joint "Roadmap" Submission to Magistrate Judge Sullivan on or before 1/7/13. Further, each party is directed to submit individual Settlement Conference Statements to the Court on or before 1/23/13; this statement is to be shared with the other parties in the case, but is not to be filed electronically through the CM/ECF system. In addition, any party that wishes to may submit a Confidential Settlement Statement directly to Magistrate Judge Sullivan on or before 1/23/13, which should not be filed electronically through the CM/ECF system. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Noel, Jeannine)
December 7, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conferences are scheduled for 1/28/13 through 1/30/13 at 9:30 am before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan in in Magistrate Judge Sullivan Chambers - Room P-282. The parties are hereby directed to file a Joint "Roadmap" Submission to Magistrate Judge Sullivan on or before 1/7/13. Further, each party is directed to submit individual Settlement Conference Statements to the Court on or before 1/23/13; this statement is to be shared with the other parties in the case, but is not to be filed electronically through the CM/ECF system. In addition, any party that wishes to may submit a Confidential Settlement Statement directly to Magistrate Judge Sullivan on or before 1/23/13, which should not be filed electronically through the CM/ECF system. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 12/7/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Saucier, Martha)
December 5, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to today's status conference and in preparation for settlement conferences tentatively scheduled for 1/29/13 through 1/31/13 before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan, the parties are hereby directed to file a Joint "Roadmap" Submission to Magistrate Judge Sullivan on or before 1/8/13. Further, each party is directed to submit individual Settlement Conference Statements to the Court on or before 1/24/13; this statement is to be shared with the other parties in the case, but is not to be filed electronically through the CM/ECF system. In addition, any party that wishes to may submit a Confidential Settlement Statement directly to Magistrate Judge Sullivan on or before 1/24/13, which should not be filed electronically through the CM/ECF system. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 12/5/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
December 5, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E. Smith: Status Conference held on 12/5/2012; Counsel present: B. Magratten, M. Daly; A. Ramos; A. Traini; M. Lepizzera; J. Brenner; M. Dunn; D. Prentiss; E. Maggiacomo, Sr.; also present: Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
November 28, 2012 157 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re: (152 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-PAS) Notice of Appeal, (178 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-PAS) Notice of Appeal, (150 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-PAS) Notice of Appeal; transmitting Statement of Reasons in each case entered by Judge William E. Smith on 11/27/12 (Jackson, Ryan)
November 27, 2012 156 STATEMENT OF REASONS re: This Court's grant of judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) of the F.R.C.P. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 20, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference scheduled for 12/5/2012 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-PAS et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
November 16, 2012 155 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 150 Notice of Appeal filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company: remanded to the District Court for a statement of reasons insupport of the entry of judgment.Signed by Margaret Carter, Clerk, USCA for the 1st Circuit (Jackson, Ryan)
October 9, 2012 USCA Case Number 12-2207 for 150 Notice of Appeal, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 5, 2012 154 Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 150 Notice of Appeal. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 5, 2012 153 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: Record on Appeal re 150 Notice of Appeal,, (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 5, 2012 152 APPEAL COVER SHEET Re: 150 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 3, 2012 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Magistrate Judge David L. Martin no longer assigned to the case. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
August 30, 2012 151 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455 receipt number 14670008856 re 150 Notice of Appeal, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (McGuire, Vickie)
August 30, 2012 150 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 149 Judgment by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel should register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf/. Counsel should also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm Appeal Record due by 10/1/2012. (Daly, Michael)
August 2, 2012 149 JUDGMENT in favor of Estella Rodrigues against Transamerica Life Insurance Company. So Ordered by Deputy Clerk: Ryan H. Jackson on 8/2/12. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 27, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Counsel for Defendants Caramadre, Radhakrishnan, and EPR has contacted the Court to indicate that they do not wish to file further briefing in response to Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaints. Accordingly, based on the arguments set forth by the parties in their briefing and at oral argument, the Court hereby DENIES the Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) filed by Defendants Caramadre, Radhakrishnan, and EPR (filed in C.A. No. 09-470, ECF No. 135) and GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaints (filed in C.A. Nos. 09-470 and 09-473, ECF No. 141); TEXT ORDER denying (135) Motion for Final Judgment; granting (141) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM; denying (137) Motion for Final Judgment; granting (144) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM; denying (135) Motion for Final Judgment; granting (142) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM; denying (163) Motion for Final Judgment; granting (170) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM; denying (123) Motion for Final Judgment; granting (129) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM; denying (110) Motion for Final Judgment; granting (116) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM; denying (103) Motion for Final Judgment; granting (109) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 7/27/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
July 20, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E. Smith: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2012 re (163 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 110 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 103 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 137 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 123 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 135 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 135 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph A. Caramadre, (137 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 124 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 111 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 136 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 165 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 139 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 104 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION for Reconsideration re (121 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 124 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 149 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 122 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 110 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 90 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 97 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) Order on Motion to Compe filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., (144 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 109 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 141 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 116 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 129 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 170 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 142 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (143 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 141 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 128 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 115 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 169 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 140 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 108 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Separate Final) filed by Fortune Financial Services, Inc., (136 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) filed by Estella Rodrigues, (138 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) filed by ADM Associates, LLC.(Daly, Ramos, Prentiss, Brenner, MacFadyen) Court addresses. Arguments heard on motion to amend/correct the complaint (filed by plaintiffs in CA 09-470 and CA 09-473; ECF #141). Court questions. Each side responds. Court allows Caramadre, Radhakrishnan, and EPR to file supplemental briefing on the matter and will issue an order after it considers such briefing. The ruling on this motion will affect the ruling on defts' motion for entry of final judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) as to Caramadre, Radhakrishnan, and EPR (filed in CA 09-470; ECF #135), and therefore this matter is also taken under advisement. Next, Court hears argument on defts motion for reconsideration (filed by defendant EPR in all related cases; ECF #136). Court questions. Each side responds. Court grants motion. Finally, Court hears argument on the individual motions for entry of final judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) as to defendants: Estella Rodrigues, DK LLC, ADM Associates, and Fortune Financial Services. Court grants motion as to Estella Rodrigues (filed in CA 09-471; ECF #136), DK LLC (filed in CA 09-473; ECF #162), and ADM Associates (filed in CA 09-472; ECF #138). Court denies motion as to Fortune Financial Services (filed in 09-470; ECF #140; CA 09-564; ECF #108, and CA 09-472; ECF #143). Recess. (Court Reporter Anne Clayton in Courtroom 2 at 2:10 p.m.) Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 18, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting (136) Motion for Reconsideration ; denying (140) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM; granting (138) Motion for Final Judgment; granting (139) Motion for Reconsideration ; denying (143) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM; granting (136) Motion for Final Judgment; granting (137) Motion for Reconsideration ; denying (141) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM; granting (162) Motion for Final Judgment; granting (165) Motion for Reconsideration ; denying (169) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM; granting (124) Motion for Reconsideration ; denying (128) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM; granting (111) Motion for Reconsideration ; denying (115) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM; granting (104) Motion for Reconsideration ; denying (108) Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 7/18/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Urizandi, Nisshy)
June 14, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: (140 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 141 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 143 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 169 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 128 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 115 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 108 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Separate Final), (136 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 137 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 139 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 165 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 124 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 111 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 104 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION for Reconsideration re (121 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 124 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 149 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 122 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 110 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 90 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 97 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) Order on Motion to Compe, (135 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 135 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 137 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 163 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 123 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 110 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 103 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b), (141 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 142 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 144 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 170 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 129 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 116 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 109 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Amend/Correct , (136 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b), (138 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b), (162 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Motion of DK, LLC for Entry of Final Judgment : Motion Hearing scheduled for 7/18/2012 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
June 4, 2012 148 RESPONSE in Support re (141 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 170 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaints filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Stay Orders)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
May 29, 2012 Motion Forwarded to Chambers (144 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 109 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 116 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 129 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 170 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 142 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 141 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Amend/Correct FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
May 29, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER Entering (143 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) Stipulation, filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre, Joseph A. Caramadre. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 5/29/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
May 29, 2012 147 RESPONSE in Opposition re (109 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Edward Hanrahan. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(MacFadyen, John)
May 25, 2012 146 RESPONSE in Opposition re (109 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Amend/Correct with Supporting Memo filed by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph A. Caramadre, Harrison Condit. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Ramos, Adam)
May 24, 2012 145 NOTICE by The Leaders Group, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Kelly M. Moore Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Sherman, Deming)
May 16, 2012 144 STIPULATION re (141 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Amend/Correct extending time to answer or otherwise respond up to and including May 25, 2012 by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph A. Caramadre. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Ramos, Adam)
May 8, 2012 143 RESPONSE in Opposition re (143 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 141 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 128 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 115 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 169 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 140 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 108 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Separate Final) WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
May 1, 2012 142 MOTION to Amend/Correct WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio. Responses due by 5/18/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed complaint (470), # 2 Exhibit B - proposed complaint (473))Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
April 19, 2012 Motion Forwarded to Chambers (137 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 139 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 124 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 111 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 136 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 104 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 165 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION for Reconsideration re (121 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 124 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 149 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 122 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 110 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 90 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 97 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) Order FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
April 18, 2012 141 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Separate Final) With Supporting Memo by Fortune Financial Services, Inc.. Responses due by 5/7/2012 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Brenner, Jeffrey)
April 11, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER Entering (138 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) Stipulation,, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio : Plaintiffs may have until 4/13/12 to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 4/11/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
April 10, 2012 140 RESPONSE in Opposition re (111 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 139 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 137 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 124 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 136 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 165 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 104 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION for Reconsideration re (121 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 124 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 149 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 122 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 110 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 90 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 97 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) Order on Motion to Compe WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Discovery Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Email, # 3 Exhibit C - Motion to Compel)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
April 9, 2012 139 STIPULATION re (136 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION for Reconsideration re (121 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 124 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 149 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 122 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 110 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 90 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 97 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) Order on Motion to Compe by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
April 6, 2012 Motion Forwarded to Chambers (138 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b), (135 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 135 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 137 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b), (136 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
April 5, 2012 138 RESPONSE in Opposition re (136 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b), (162 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Motion of DK, LLC for Entry of Final Judgment, (138 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b), (135 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) With Suppporting Memorandum filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
March 22, 2012 137 MOTION for Reconsideration re (121 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 124 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 149 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 122 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 110 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 90 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 97 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) Order on Motion to Compel,, with Supporting Memo by Estate Planning Resources, Inc.. Responses due by 4/9/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - EPR Opposition to Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit B - EPR Motion to Appoint Agent, # 3 Exhibit C - Ramos Declaration in Support of Motion to Appoint Agent, # 4 Exhibit D - Stay Order)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Ramos, Adam)
March 19, 2012 136 MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) with Supporting Memo by Estella Rodrigues. Responses due by 4/5/2012 (Ramos, Adam)
March 19, 2012 135 MOTION for Final Judgment Pursuant to Rule 54(b) with Supporting Memo by Joseph A. Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan. Responses due by 4/5/2012 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Ramos, Adam)
March 2, 2012 134 Featured Case STAY ORDER granting (125) Motion to Stay; granting (128) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM; granting (127) Motion to Stay; granting (130) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM; granting (124) Motion to Stay; granting (128) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM; granting (152) Motion to Stay; granting (155) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM; granting (113) Motion to Stay; granting (116) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM; granting (100) Motion to Stay; granting (103) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM; granting (93) Motion to Stay; granting (96) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 3/2/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
February 28, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting (111) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David G. Palmer; granting (112) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kelly M. Moore in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 2/28/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
February 22, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER finding as moot (50) Motion for Final Judgment; finding as moot (66) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM; finding as moot (50) Motion for Final Judgment; finding as moot (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM; finding as moot (51) Motion for Final Judgment; finding as moot (66) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM; finding as moot (48) Motion for Final Judgment; finding as moot (78) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM; finding as moot (54) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM; finding as moot (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM; finding as moot (34) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 2/22/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
February 22, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: Status Conference held on 2/22/2012; counsel present: B. Magratten, M. Daly; R. Flanders, A. Ramos; R. Ripple; A. Traini; J. Brenner; J. MacFadyen; D. Prentiss; M. Dunn; M. Lepizerra; J. McAdams. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
February 17, 2012 133 STIPULATION Extending time for all Defendants to file Answers to Remaining Counts of Complaints by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph A. Caramadre, Harrison Condit. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Ramos, Adam)
February 17, 2012 Reset Hearing re: Status Conference RE-SCHEDULED for 2/22/2012 at 9:00 AM in Chambers before Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
February 7, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference scheduled for 2/22/2012 at 9:30 AM in Chambers before Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
February 7, 2012 132 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (60) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (62) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (94) Motion to Dismiss; granting (95) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (96) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM; granting in part and denying in part (59) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (95) Motion to Dismiss; granting (97) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (98) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM; granting in part and denying in part (61) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (62) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (92) Motion to Dismiss; granting (93) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (94) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM; finding as moot (61) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting in part and denying in part (65) Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot (67) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (118) Motion to Dismiss; granting (121) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (122) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM; granting in part and denying in part (45) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (81) Motion to Dismiss; granting (83) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (84) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM; granting in part and denying in part (37) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (38) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (68) Motion to Dismiss; granting (69) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (70) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM; granting in part and denying in part (29) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (30) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (62) Motion to Dismiss; granting (63) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (64) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 2/7/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
January 17, 2012 131 REPLY to Response to Motion re (105 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 132 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 118 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 98 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 130 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 157 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 130 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Fortune Financial Services, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Brenner, Jeffrey)
January 11, 2012 Motion Forwarded to Chambers 125 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM Emergency MOTION to Stay , in Part, 126 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) Emergency MOTION to Appoint Custodian Agent to Answer Interrogatories - Conditional, 128 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM MOTION to Stay, and 127 (in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION To Join Emergency Motion For Partial Stay, FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
January 6, 2012 130 RESPONSE in Opposition re (93 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Emergency MOTION to Stay , in Part, (96 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay re (93 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Emergency MOTION to Stay , in Part WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
January 5, 2012 Reset Deadlines: Responses to Motions to Stay due by 1/6/2012 ; Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
January 5, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER Entering 129 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM (117 in 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM, 156 in 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM, 97 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 131 in 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM, 104 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 129 in 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM) Stipulation filed by Charles Buckman, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., ADM Associates, LLC, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Harrison Condit, Lifemark Securities Corp., Joseph A. Caramadre, Fortune Financial Services, Inc., Jason Veveiros, Patrick Garvey, Natco Products Corp., Conreal LLC, Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, Anthony Pitocco, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Edward Hanrahan, DK LLC, Estella Rodrigues, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Transamerica Life Insurance Company, The Leaders Group, Inc., Joseph Caramadre. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 1/5/12. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
December 30, 2011 129 STIPULATION re (96 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay re (93 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Emergency MOTION to Stay , in Part by All Parties. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
December 12, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER staying the deadline for Estate Planning Resourses, Inc.'s answer to interrogatories until the Court decides 125 Emergency Motion to Stay in Part by Joseph Caramadre, Raymour Radhakrishnan, ADM Associates, LLC and Estella Rodrigues. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 12/09/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
December 9, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: In Chambers Conference held on 12/9/2011; counsel present: B. Magratten, M. Daly; A. Ramos; T. Traini; R. Ripple; J. Brenner; J. MacFadyen; D. Prentiss; O. Thompson; M. Lepizerra; J. Cavanagh; L. Vilker. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
December 6, 2011 128 MOTION to Stay re (93 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Emergency MOTION to Stay , in Part by Edward Hanrahan. Responses due by 12/23/2011 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(MacFadyen, John)
December 6, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference scheduled for 12/9/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
December 5, 2011 127 MOTION To Join Emergency Motion For Partial Stay re 124 Emergency MOTION to Stay , in Part by Edward Maggiacomo, Jr. Responses due by 12/22/2011 (Traini, Anthony)
December 5, 2011 Motion Forwarded to Chambers 125 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM Emergency MOTION to Stay , in Part, 126 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM Emergency MOTION to Appoint Custodian Agent to Answer Interrogatories - Conditional FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
December 5, 2011 126 DECLARATION re (94 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Emergency MOTION to Appoint Custodian Agent to Answer Interrogatories - Conditional of Adam M. Ramos by Estate Planning Resources, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Ramos, Adam)
December 5, 2011 125 Emergency MOTION to Appoint Custodian Agent to Answer Interrogatories - Conditional with Supporting Memo by Estate Planning Resources, Inc.. Responses due by 12/22/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - November 1, 2011 Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Ramos Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C - November 23, 2011 Order)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Ramos, Adam)
December 5, 2011 124 Emergency MOTION to Stay , in Part with Supporting Memo by Joseph Caramadre, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph A. Caramadre, ADM Associates, LLC, Estella Rodrigues. Responses due by 12/22/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Ramos, Adam)
November 28, 2011 123 Featured Case ORDER granting (123) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM; granting (125) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM; granting (122) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM; granting (150) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM; granting (111) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM; granting (98) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM; granting (91) Motion for Extension of Time in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM. EPR shall have until 12/12/11 to answer interrogatories.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 11/23/11. (Saucier, Martha)
November 23, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin: Motion Hearing held on 11/23/2011 re (91 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 123 in 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM, 125 in 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM, 111 in 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM, 98 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 150 in 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM, 122 in 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM) Emergency MOTION for an Extension of Time to Comply with Court Order and Answer Interrogatories filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc. Michael Daly for the plaintiff; Adam Ramos for defendant Estate Planning Resources; Jeffrey Brenner for defendant Fortune Financial Services, Inc. Plaintiff states objection to the motion; Defendant EPR responds to the objection; Court grants the motion; Mr. Ramos to prepare an order. (Courtroom B at 2:01.) Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Saucier, Martha)
November 22, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (123 in 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM, 122 in 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM, 125 in 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM, 150 in 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM, 111 in 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM, 98 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 91 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Emergency MOTION for an Extension of Time to Comply with Court Order and Answer Interrogatories : Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Saucier, Martha)
November 22, 2011 MOTIONS REFERRED: 123 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM Emergency MOTION for an Extension of Time to Comply with Court Order and Answer Interrogatories referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin for determination. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
November 22, 2011 122 Emergency MOTION for an Extension of Time to Comply with Court Order and Answer Interrogatories by Estate Planning Resources, Inc.. Responses due by 12/9/2011 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Ramos, Adam)
November 1, 2011 121 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ESTATE PLANNING RESOURCES TO RESPOND TO INTERROGATORIES (117) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM; (119) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM; (116) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM; (144) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM; (105) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM; (92) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM; (85) Motion to Compel in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 11/1/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Noel, Jeannine)
October 28, 2011 120 TRANSCRIPT of Motions to Dismiss held on July 20, 2011, before Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter Anne M. Clayton, Telephone number 401-255-2310. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion.. Redaction Request due 11/18/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/28/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2012. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Clayton, Anne)
October 28, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin: Motion Hearing held on 10/28/2011 re (92 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 105 in 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM, 117 in 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM, 119 in 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM, 144 in 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM, 85 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 116 in 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM) MOTION to Compel Defendant Estate Planning Resources to Respond to Interrogatories filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio. (Daly, Ramos, Brenner, Prentiss, O'Brien, Sherman) Argument; Court takes matter under advisement (Courtroom B at 10:14 am.) (Noel, Jeannine)
October 24, 2011 119 REPLY to Response to Motion re (87 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Transcript)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
October 17, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (117 in 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM, 116 in 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM, 119 in 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM, 144 in 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM, 105 in 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM, 92 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 85 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Compel Defendant Estate Planning Resources to Respond to Interrogatories : Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. (Saucier, Martha)
October 14, 2011 MOTIONS REFERRED: 117 (in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Compel Defendant Estate Planning Resources to Respond to Interrogatories referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin for determination. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
October 13, 2011 118 RESPONSE in Opposition re (85 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Compel Defendant Estate Planning Resources to Respond to Interrogatories WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A - Initial Case Management Order, # 3 Exhibit B - Answers to Interrogatories)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Flanders, Robert)
September 28, 2011 117 NOTICE by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph A. Caramadre, Harrison Condit, ADM Associates, LLC, Estella Rodrigues Withdrawal of Appearance of Matthew H. Parker and Entry of Appearance of Adam M. Ramos Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Parker, Matthew)
September 26, 2011 116 MOTION to Compel Defendant Estate Planning Resources to Respond to Interrogatories by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio. Responses due by 10/13/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant Estate Planning Resources, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Magratten, Brooks)
September 26, 2011 115 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 07/20/2011 before Judge William E. Smith.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
August 23, 2011 114 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 113 MOTION for Kelly M. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Leaders Group, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 23, 2011 113 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 112 MOTION for David G. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Leaders Group, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 23, 2011 112 MOTION for Kelly M. Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Leaders Group, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Sherman, Deming)
August 23, 2011 111 MOTION for David G. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Leaders Group, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Sherman, Deming)
August 23, 2011 110 NOTICE by The Leaders Group, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Douglas J. Friednash Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Sherman, Deming)
August 15, 2011 HEARING CANCELLED re: Status Conference previously scheduled for 8/24/2011 at 3:00 p.m. in Chambers before Judge William E. Smith is hereby CANCELLED. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 11, 2011 109 NOTICE by The Leaders Group, Inc. Withdrawal of Appearance by John B. Rosenquest III Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Rosenquest, John)
August 11, 2011 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond M. Ripple on behalf of The Leaders Group, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Ripple, Raymond)
August 10, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference scheduled for 8/24/2011 at 3:00 PM in Chambers before Judge William E. Smith (Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.)(Jackson, Ryan)
July 20, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: Motion Hearing held on 7/20/2011 re (118 in 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM, 95 in 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM, 92 in 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM, 94 in 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM, 62 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 68 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 81 in 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM) MOTION to Dismiss the Newly Amended Complaints and Request for Reconsideration filed by Estella Rodrigues, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., ADM Associates, LLC, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre, Harrison Condit, Joseph A. Caramadre, (96 in 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM, 98 in 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM, 84 in 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM, 70 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 94 in 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM, 64 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 122 in 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Consideration Or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement filed by Edward Hanrahan, (95 in 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM, 93 in 1:09-cv-00471-S -DLM, 69 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 121 in 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM, 83 in 1:09-cv-00502-S -DLM, 97 in 1:09-cv-00472-S -DLM, 63 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by DK LLC.(Magratten, Daly, Flanders, Traini, MacFayden, Prentiss, Sherman, Brenner, Parker, Dunn) Arguments heard on defendants motions to dismiss. Court takes matter under advisement and will issue a written ruling. Recess. (Court Reporter Anne Clayton in Courtroom 2 at 9:32 a.m.) Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 31, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER finding as moot (48) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM; finding as moot (47) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM; finding as moot (48) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM; finding as moot (45) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM; finding as moot (37) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM; finding as moot (28) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM; finding as moot (21) Motion to Stay in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 5/31/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
May 31, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: ( 95 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint; ( 94 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss the Newly Amended Complaints and Request for Reconsideration; ( 96 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Consideration Or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement : Motion Hearing scheduled for 7/20/2011 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
May 26, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: In Chambers Conference held on 5/26/2011; counsel present: B. Magratten, M. Daly; R. Flanders, M. Parker; A. Traini; J. Brenner; T. MacFadyen; M. Dunn; J. Rosenquest; D. Prentiss Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
May 18, 2011 107 RESPONSE in Support re (122 in 1:09-cv-00473-S -DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Consideration Or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement filed by Edward Hanrahan. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S -DLM et al.(MacFadyen, John)
May 18, 2011 106 RESPONSE in Support re (118 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 95 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 92 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 94 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 62 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 68 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 81 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss the Newly Amended Complaints and Request for Reconsideration Consolidated Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support filed by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph A. Caramadre, Harrison Condit, ADM Associates, LLC, Estella Rodrigues. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Flanders, Robert)
May 6, 2011 105 NOTICE by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph A. Caramadre, Harrison Condit, ADM Associates, LLC, Estella Rodrigues Withdrawal of Appearance of Eric S. Giroux Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Giroux, Eric)
May 3, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER Entering 105 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM Stipulation filed by Edward Hanrahan, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Transamerica Life Ins. Co., Eastate Planning Resources, Inc., Joseph A. Caramadre, Raymour Radhadkirshnan, Harrison Condit, Estela Rodrigues, ADM Associates, Edward Maggiacomo allowing Defendants up to and including 5/19/11 to file a reply memorandum re: Plaintiffs' Consolidated Objection to Defendants' Motions for Reconsideration, Dismissal and for a More Definite Statement. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 5/3/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
April 29, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER Entering 103 (in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Fortune Financial Services, Inc., Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Estella Rodrigues, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Transamerica Life Insurance Company, ADM Associates, LLC, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Harrison Condit, Joseph Caramadre, Joseph A. Caramadre extending Defendants reply memorandum filing deadline to 5/19/11. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 4/29/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
April 29, 2011 104 STIPULATION by Edward Hanrahan. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(MacFadyen, John)
April 29, 2011 Reset Hearings re: Notice of In Chambers Conference RE-SCHEDULED for 5/26/2011 at 3:30 PM in Chambers before Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
April 28, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference SCHEDULED for 5/19/2011 at 2:30 PM in Chambers before Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
April 28, 2011 103 RESPONSE in Support re (121 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by DK LLC. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Prentiss, R.)
April 28, 2011 102 STIPULATION re (70 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Response in Opposition to Motion,,, Extending Time to May 19, 2011 for Stipulating Defendants to File a Reply Memorandum to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Objection to Defendants' Motions for Reconsideration, Dismissal and for a More Definitive Statement by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Joseph A. Caramadre, Fortune Financial Services, Inc., Harrison Condit, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, ADM Associates, LLC, Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, Estella Rodrigues. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Parker, Matthew)
April 27, 2011 Motion Forwarded to Chambers 94 (in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss the Newly Amended Complaints and Request for Reconsideration, 96 (in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Consideration Or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, 95 (in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
April 25, 2011 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re (118 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 95 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 92 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 94 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 62 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 68 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 81 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss the Newly Amended Complaints and Request for Reconsideration, (96 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 98 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 84 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 70 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 94 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 64 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 122 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Consideration Or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement, (95 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 93 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 69 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 121 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 83 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 97 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 63 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by All Plaintiffs. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
April 20, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER Entering (76 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 100 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 101 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr. re: responses to Amended Complaints. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 4/20/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
April 18, 2011 100 STIPULATION by Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
April 18, 2011 99 Reply to Counterclaim of LifeMark Securities Corp. by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
April 18, 2011 98 Reply to Counterclaim of Lifemark Securities Corp. by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
April 13, 2011 Reset Deadlines: Responses re: 94 MOTION to Dismiss the Newly Amended Complaints and Request for Reconsideration and 95 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaintdue by 4/25/2011 Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
April 13, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER ENTERING (73 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 124 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 86 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 66 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 98 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 100 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 97 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) Stipulation, filed by Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, DK LLC, Estella Rodrigues, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Transamerica Life Insurance Company, ADM Associates, LLC, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Harrison Condit, Joseph Caramadre, Joseph A. Caramadre extending time for parties to respond to Motions to Dismiss. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 4/13/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
April 11, 2011 97 STIPULATION by Joseph Caramadre, DK LLC, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Joseph A. Caramadre, Harrison Condit, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, ADM Associates, LLC, Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, Estella Rodrigues. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
April 8, 2011 96 ANSWER to 89 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Transamerica Life Insurance Company by Lifemark Securities Corp..(Cavanagh, Joseph)
April 7, 2011 95 Reply to Counterclaim of Defendant The Leaders Group, Inc. by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
April 6, 2011 94 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Consideration Or, in the Alternative, For a More Definite Statement With Supporting Memo by Edward Hanrahan. Responses due by 4/25/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application, # 2 Exhibit Broker-Dealer Agreement)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(MacFadyen, John)
April 4, 2011 93 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint With Supporting Memo by DK LLC. Responses due by 4/21/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Prentiss, R.)
March 24, 2011 92 MOTION to Dismiss the Newly Amended Complaints and Request for Reconsideration WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph A. Caramadre, Harrison Condit, ADM Associates, LLC, Estella Rodrigues. Responses due by 4/11/2011 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Flanders, Robert)
March 17, 2011 91 STIPULATION by Fortune Financial Services, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Brenner, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2011 Reset Deadlines: Joseph Caramadre answer due 4/6/2011; Estate Planning Resources, Inc. answer due 4/6/2011; Raymour Radhakrishnan answer due 4/6/2011; Joseph A. Caramadre answer due 4/6/2011; Harrison Condit answer due 4/6/2011; ADM Associates, LLC answer due 4/6/2011; Estella Rodrigues answer due 4/6/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM(Jackson, Ryan)
March 14, 2011 Featured Case TEXT ORDER ENTERING 90 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM (59 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM, 66 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM, 114 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM, 92 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM, 92 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM, 78 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) Stipulation, filed by Conreal LLC, Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, DK LLC, Estella Rodrigues, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Harrison Condit, Joseph Caramadre, Joseph A. Caramadre. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 3/14/11. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Jackson, Ryan)
March 9, 2011 90 STIPULATION re (58 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Amended Complaint, (57 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Amended Complaint, Extension of Time to Respond by Joseph Caramadre, DK LLC, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Joseph A. Caramadre, Conreal LLC, Harrison Condit, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, Estella Rodrigues. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Flanders, Robert)
March 7, 2011 89 AMENDED COMPLAINT (THIRD) against Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Patrick Garvey, Lifemark Securities Corp., Edward Maggiacomo, Jr, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estella Rodrigues, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company.(Daly, Michael)
March 7, 2011 88 AMENDED COMPLAINT (THIRD) against Joseph A. Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Fortune Financial Services, Inc., Harrison Condit, Raymour Radhakrishnan, filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio.Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
March 7, 2011 87 STIPULATION by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
March 4, 2011 86 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on January 7, 2011 before Judge David L. Martin. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maryann V. Young, Telephone number 508-384-2003. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion.. Redaction Request due 3/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2011. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Young, Maryann)
February 22, 2011 85 STIPULATION regarding plaintiff's response to DK's discovery by DK LLC, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
February 21, 2011 84 STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiffs' Responses to EPR's Interrogatories by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio. Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM et al.(Daly, Michael)
February 18, 2011 Cases associated: Create association to 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 18, 2011 83 Featured Case CONSOLIDATION ORDER. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 2/18/11. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 16, 2011 82 Featured Case ORDER DENYING (80 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (83 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (49 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, (82 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (56 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (99 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (68 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 2/16/11. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 1, 2011 Referred ( 83 in CA09-470) APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio re ( 80 in CA09-470) Order (Plaintiffs' Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Denial of Plaintiffs' Omnibus Motion for Protective Order Striking Defendant Estate Planning Resources, Inc.'s Interrogatories AND Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay the Magistrate Judge's Order Pending Determination of this Objection) to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith (Jackson, Ryan)
January 31, 2011 81 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by Estate Planning Resources, Inc. re 80 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Flanders, Robert)
January 21, 2011 80 Featured Case APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Transamerica Life Insurance Company re 79 Order,,, (Daly, Michael)
January 14, 2011 79 Featured Case ORDER Denying re (73 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (59 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (72 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (40 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, (47 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (71 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (84 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 1/14/11. (Saucier, Martha)
January 13, 2011 78 Featured Case ORDER granting (72) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM; granting (73) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM; granting (71) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM; granting (84) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM; granting (59) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM; granting (47) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM; granting (38) Motion ; granting (40) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM/CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 1/13/11. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Saucier, Martha)
January 10, 2011 77 Featured Case ORDER granting (70) Motion for Entry of a Confidentiality Order in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM; granting (69) Motion in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM; granting (81) Motion in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM; granting (56) Motion in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM; granting (45) Motion in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Martin on 1/10/11. (Saucier, Martha)
January 7, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin: Motion Hearing held on 1/7/2011 re (73 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (59 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (45 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (81 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (72 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (40 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, (47 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (56 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (71 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (70 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a confidentiality Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (38 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, (69 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (70 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (84 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio. Brooks Magratten and Michael Daly for the plaintiff; Matthew Parker, Anthony Traini, Deming Sherman, R. Daniel Prentiss and Jeffrey Brenner for the defendants; Both sides argue motions; Court grants the motion for confidentiality order; Court to issue an order; Court denies the motion for protective order; Mr. Parker to prepare an order. (Courtroom B at 11:42.) (Saucier, Martha)
January 3, 2011 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions (71 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order, (69 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (73 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order, (70 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a confidentiality Order, (84 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order, (81 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (56 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (59 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order, (47 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order, (45 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (40 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order, (38 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order : Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. (Saucier, Martha)
January 3, 2011 MOTIONS REFERRED: (73 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order, (59 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order, (45 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (81 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (72 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order, (40 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order, (47 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order, (56 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (71 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order, (70 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a confidentiality Order, (69 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (70 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (84 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION for Protective Order referred to Magistrate Judge David L. Martin for determination. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 3, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: Status Conference held on 1/3/2011; all counsel of record present: Magratten, Daly, Barry; Flanders, Parker; Lepizzera; Sherming; Prentiss; MacFadyen; Traini; Brenner; Cavanagh (Jackson, Ryan)
December 22, 2010 76 REPLY to Response to Motion re 75 Response in Opposition to Motion, For a Confidentiality Order filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Magratten, Brooks)
December 17, 2010 Motion Forwarded to Chambers (66 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, (61 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration, (67 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss (PARTIAL), (66 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, (62 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration, (59 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration, (65 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration, (45 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (45 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration, (81 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (37 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration, (54 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, (42 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, (30 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration, (60 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, (56 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (62 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration, (38 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration, (70 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a confidentiality Order, (38 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (69 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (78 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, (68 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, (34 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, (70 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order, (29 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 16, 2010 75 RESPONSE in Opposition re 69 MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estella Rodrigues. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Flanders, Robert)
December 15, 2010 74 REPLY to Response to Motion re 67 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Edward Maggiacomo, Jr. (Traini, Anthony)
December 10, 2010 73 RESPONSE in Support re 61 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration filed by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estella Rodrigues. (Flanders, Robert)
December 10, 2010 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re 71 MOTION for Protective Order WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc.. (Flanders, Robert)
December 4, 2010 71 MOTION for Protective Order With Supporting Memo by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 12/21/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Daly, Michael)
December 3, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ORDER ENTERING (70 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) Stipulation, filed by Estella Rodrigues, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., Joseph Caramadre; TEXT ORDER ENTERING (72 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., The Leaders Group, Inc.; TEXT ORDER ENTERING (71 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Harrison Condit, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Joseph A. Caramadre; TEXT ORDER ENTERING (82 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Hanrahan, Joseph Caramadre, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio; TEXT ORDER ENTERING (57 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Hanrahan, Joseph Caramadre, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio; TEXT ORDER ENTERING (39 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre, Harrison Condit; TEXT ORDER ENTERING (46 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., Joseph Caramadre. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 12/3/10. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 1, 2010 70 STIPULATION re 62 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Edward Maggiacomo, Jr, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estella Rodrigues, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Flanders, Robert)
November 29, 2010 69 MOTION For Entry of a Confidentiality Order With Supporting Memorandum by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 12/16/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Confidentiality Order)(Magratten, Brooks)
November 18, 2010 68 STIPULATION Dismissal by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan. (Flanders, Robert)
November 17, 2010 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re 61 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration, 62 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration With Supporting Memo filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - EPR/Maggiacomo, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit C - Appointment Agreement, # 4 Exhibit D - Bulletin)(Daly, Michael) (Attachment 3 replaced with redacted version on 11/18/2010) (Smith, Rana).
November 17, 2010 66 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estella Rodrigues. Responses due by 12/6/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Matthew H. Parker, # 2 Exhibit Notices of Assent)(Flanders, Robert)
October 27, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ORDER ENTERING (69 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Hanrahan, Joseph Caramadre, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (31 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre, Harrison Condit, (63 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) Stipulation, filed by Estella Rodrigues, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., Joseph Caramadre, (63 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Harrison Condit, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Joseph A. Caramadre, (61 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Hanrahan, Joseph Caramadre, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (47 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Hanrahan, Joseph Caramadre, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (39 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) Stipulation, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., Joseph Caramadre. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 10/26/10. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 25, 2010 65 Reply to Counterclaim of Lifemark Securities Corp. by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Barry, David)
October 19, 2010 64 STIPULATION by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Edward Maggiacomo, Jr, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Flanders, Robert)
October 19, 2010 63 STIPULATION re 61 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration, 62 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Edward Maggiacomo, Jr, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estella Rodrigues, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Flanders, Robert)
October 4, 2010 62 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Edward Maggiacomo, Jr. Responses due by 10/21/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum)(Traini, Anthony)
October 4, 2010 61 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Reconsideration WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estella Rodrigues. Responses due by 10/21/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Flanders, Robert)
October 4, 2010 60 Defendant LifeMark Securities Corp.'s ANSWER to 58 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Transamerica Life Insurance Company by Lifemark Securities Corp..(Cavanagh, Joseph)
September 13, 2010 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference scheduled for 1/3/2011 at 10:00 AM in Judge Smith Chambers before Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 13, 2010 59 Featured Case INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 9/10/10. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 7, 2010 58 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Patrick Garvey, Lifemark Securities Corp., Edward Maggiacomo, Jr, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estella Rodrigues, filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company.(Daly, Michael)
August 13, 2010 Motion Forwarded to Chambers (48 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment (CORRECTED), (50 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment, (50 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment (CORRECTED), (51 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment (CORRECTED) FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 6, 2010 57 RESPONSE to Motion re 51 MOTION for Final Judgment (CORRECTED) With Supporting Memorandum filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Daly, Michael)
July 28, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ORDER ENTERING (55 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Fortune Financial Services, Inc., Conreal LLC, Anthony Pitocco, Harrison Condit, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (54 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., The Leaders Group, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Hanrahan, Joseph Caramadre, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, DK LLC, (33 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., Joseph Caramadre, Lifemark Securities Corp., (26 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Fortune Financial Services, Inc., Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Western Reserve Life Assuance Co. of Ohio, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre, Harrison Condit, (55 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) Stipulation, filed by Charles Buckman, Edward Hanrahan, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., ADM Associates, LLC, The Leaders Group, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre, (56 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., Estella Rodrigues, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre, Lifemark Securities Corp., (42 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Edward Hanrahan, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., The Leaders Group, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 7/28/10. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 28, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ORDER ENTERING (54 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estella Rodrigues, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre, (53 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) Reply Memorandum, (53 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Harrison Condit, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (53 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., ADM Associates, LLC, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Hanrahan, Joseph Caramadre, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 7/28/10. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 23, 2010 56 Featured Case STIPULATION re 9 Amended Complaint, by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Lifemark Securities Corp., Edward Maggiacomo, Jr, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estella Rodrigues, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Flanders, Robert)
July 22, 2010 55 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM re 52 Response to Motion IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY. (Flanders, Robert)
July 22, 2010 54 Featured Case STIPULATION by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estella Rodrigues, Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Magratten, Brooks)
July 21, 2010 53 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (50 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment, (48 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay, (48 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay, (51 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment (CORRECTED), (50 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment (CORRECTED), (47 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay, (45 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay, (48 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION for Final Judgment (CORRECTED), (37 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay, (28 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay, (21 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing scheduled for 8/17/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 20, 2010 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: In Chambers Conference held on 7/20/2010; Counsel present: B. Magratten, M. Daly, D. Barry; J. Brenner; A. Traini; J. Cavanagh; M. Waring; R. Flanders, M. Parker; D. Sherman, D. Friednash (via teleconference) (Jackson, Ryan)
July 15, 2010 Featured Case Motion Forwarded to Chambers (47 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay, (45 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay, (37 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay, (21 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay, (28 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay, (48 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay, (48 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Stay FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 13, 2010 52 Featured Case RESPONSE to Motion re 48 MOTION to Stay With Supporting Memorandum filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum)(Magratten, Brooks)
July 9, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting extention, re: Stipulation 49 - response to Motion to Stay is due 7/13/10. So Ordered by Judge William E Smith on 7/9/10. (Gilfillan, Barbara)
July 7, 2010 51 Featured Case MOTION for Final Judgment (CORRECTED) WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Estella Rodrigues. Responses due by 7/26/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit)(Flanders, Robert)
July 6, 2010 50 Featured Case Incorrect document filed; motion to be terminated; see 51 for correct filing MOTION for Final Judgment WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Estella Rodrigues. Responses due by 7/23/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Flanders, Robert) Modified on 7/7/2010 (Smith, Rana).
June 28, 2010 49 Featured Case STIPULATION by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Magratten, Brooks)
June 22, 2010 Featured Case Reset Deadlines: ANSWERS DUE BY 7/23/10 for all defendants (Jackson, Ryan)
June 22, 2010 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference RE-SCHEDULED for 7/20/2010 at 2:00 PM in Judge Smith Chambers before Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 21, 2010 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference scheduled for 6/28/2010 at 2:00 PM in Judge Smith Chambers before Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 17, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ORDER ENTERING (27 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., Joseph Caramadre, Lifemark Securities Corp., (47 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) Stipulation, filed by Estella Rodrigues, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., Joseph Caramadre, Lifemark Securities Corp., (46 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) Stipulation, filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Charles Buckman, ADM Associates, LLC, The Leaders Group, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Hanrahan, Joseph Caramadre, (20 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Fortune Financial Services, Inc., Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre, Harrison Condit, (36 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., The Leaders Group, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Hanrahan, Joseph Caramadre, (47 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) Stipulation filed by Fortune Financial Services, Inc., Conreal LLC, Anthony Pitocco, Harrison Condit, (44 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) Stipulation, filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., The Leaders Group, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Hanrahan, Joseph Caramadre, Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, DK LLC. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 6/17/10. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 16, 2010 48 Featured Case MOTION to Stay WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Joseph Caramadre, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr, Raymour Radhakrishnan. Responses due by 7/6/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit)(Flanders, Robert)
June 14, 2010 47 Featured Case STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint by Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Lifemark Securities Corp., Edward Maggiacomo, Jr, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estella Rodrigues. (Flanders, Robert)
June 11, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ORDER denying (42) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM pursuant to the Opinion and Ordered entered on 6/10/10 in MC10-52-S; denying (43) Motion for Protective Order in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM pursuant to the Opinion and Ordered entered on 6/10/10 in MC10-52-S. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 6/10/10. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 2, 2010 46 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part (21) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (22) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM; granting in part and denying in part (24) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (27) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM; granting in part and denying in part (26) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (32) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (33) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM; granting in part and denying in part (21) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (22) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM; granting in part and denying in part (16) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (17) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM; granting in part and denying in part (9) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (13) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (15) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM; granting in part and denying in part (7) Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part (9) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 6/2/10. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 28, 2010 45 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S. Giroux on behalf of Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estella Rodrigues (Giroux, Eric)
April 27, 2010 44 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support re 43 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Joseph Caramadre, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr, Raymour Radhakrishnan. (Flanders, Robert)
April 15, 2010 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: In Chambers Conference held on 4/15/2010;counsel present: B. Magratten, D. Barry (via telecnf.), M. Daly; R. Hershfang, J. Kaleba, E. Moynahan (via telecnf.); A. Traini; R. Flanders, M. Parker; J. Cavanagh; D. Prentiss (via telecnf.); D. Sherman (Jackson, Ryan)
April 15, 2010 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference scheduled for 4/15/2010 at 3:00 PM in Judge Smith Chambers before Judge William E. Smith; counsel for SEC will attend via teleconference - this office will initiate that call. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 14, 2010 43 Featured Case Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Joseph Caramadre, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr, Raymour Radhakrishnan. Responses due by 5/3/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Flanders, Robert)
March 15, 2010 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2010 re (21 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fortune Financial Services, Inc., (32 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lifemark Securities Corp., (7 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fortune Financial Services, Inc., (24 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Leaders Group, Inc., (16 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Leaders Group, Inc., (26 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Estella Rodrigues, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre, (27 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., ADM Associates, LLC, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Hanrahan, Joseph Caramadre, (33 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., (9 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre, Harrison Condit, (15 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lifemark Securities Corp., (21 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Leaders Group, Inc., (13 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., (17 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Hanrahan, Joseph Caramadre, (22 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Edward Hanrahan, Joseph Caramadre, DK LLC, (9 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre, (22 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss filed by Conreal LLC, Harrison Condit. B. Magratten and M. Daly for Plaintiffs. R. Flanders, Jr.; A. Triani; D. Sherming; J. Cavanagh; A. Batastini; D. Prentiss; and J. Rosenquest, III for Defendants. Court addresses. Arguments heard as to all Motions to Dismiss in civil actions: 09-470, 09-471, 09-472, 09-473, 09-502, 09-549, and 09-564. Court takes all matters under advisement and will issue a ruling. (Court Reporter Anne Clayton in Courtroom 2 at 2:14 p.m.) (Smith, Rana)
February 25, 2010 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: In Chambers Conference held on 2/25/2010; counsel present: M. Daly; D. Sherman; A. Traini; J. Kilpatrick; J. Greene; R. Prentiss; J. Cavanagh; A. Batastini; L. Vilker. Present via teleconference: B. Magratten; D. Barry; D. Friednash; R. Flanders. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 23, 2010 Featured Case Motion Forwarded to Chambers 26 MOTION to Dismiss, 33 MOTION to Dismiss, 32 MOTION to Dismiss FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 23, 2010 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference scheduled for 2/25/2010 at 3:00 PM in Judge Smith Chambers before Judge William E. Smith (Jackson, Ryan)
February 22, 2010 41 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Lifemark Securities Corp.. (Cavanagh, Joseph)
February 22, 2010 40 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 37 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Edward Maggiacomo, Jr. (Traini, Anthony)
February 22, 2010 39 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM re 26 MOTION to Dismiss CONSOLIDATED REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO DISMISS. (Flanders, Robert)
February 9, 2010 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting (38) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (21 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss, (22 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss ( Replies due by 2/22/2010.) in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM; granting (38) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (21 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss, (22 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM; granting (38) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (21 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss, (22 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM; granting (37) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (21 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss, (22 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM; granting (29) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (21 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss, (22 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM; granting (18) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (21 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss, (22 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM; granting (12) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re (21 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss, (22 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION to Dismiss in case 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 2/9/10. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 8, 2010 Featured Case Motion Forwarded to Chambers (37 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (36) Response in Opposition to Motion to DismissConsent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (36) Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, (38 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (37) Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, (18 in 1:09-cv-00549-S-DLM) Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (17) Response in Opposition to Motion to DismissConsent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (17) Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, (38 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (37) Response in Opposition to Motion to DismissConsent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (37) Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, (38 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (37) Response in Opposition to Motion to DismissConsent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (37) Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, (12 in 1:09-cv-00564-S-DLM) Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (11) Response in Opposition to Motion to DismissConsent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (11) Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 5, 2010 38 Featured Case Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 37 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Joseph Caramadre, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Estella Rodrigues, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr, Lifemark Securities Corp.. Responses due by 2/22/2010 (Flanders, Robert)
February 1, 2010 37 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Dismiss, 33 MOTION to Dismiss WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agent Agreement)(Daly, Michael)
January 26, 2010 36 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER granting (32) Motion for a Standing Order Re: Filing and Service of Redacted Documents in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM; granting (35) Motion for a Standing Order Re: Filing and Service of Redacted Documents in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM; granting (35) Motion for a Standing Order Re: Filing and Service of Redacted Documents in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM; granting (33) Motion for a Standing Order Re: Filing and Service of Redacted Documents in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM; granting (26) Motion for a Standing Order Re: Filing and Service of Redacted Documents in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 1/25/10. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 15, 2010 Featured Case Motion Forwarded to Chambers (26 in 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM) MOTION For a Standing Order Regarding Filing And Service of Redacted Documents, (35 in 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM) MOTION For a Standing Order Regarding Filing and Service of Redacted Documents, (35 in 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM) MOTION For a Standing Order Regarding Filing And Service of Redacted Documents, (33 in 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM) MOTION For a Standing Order Regarding Filing and Service of Redacted Documents, (32 in 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM) MOTION For a Standing Order Regarding Filing And Service of Redacted Documents FORWARDED to Chambers of Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 13, 2010 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 26 MOTION to Dismiss, 33 MOTION to Dismiss, 32 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing scheduled for 3/15/2010 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Judge William E. Smith(Jackson, Ryan)
January 11, 2010 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: Telephone Conference held on 1/11/2010; all counsel of record present on call (Jackson, Ryan)
January 4, 2010 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference scheduled for 1/11/2010 at 3:30 PM before Judge William E. Smith; dial-in information and conference call ID # will be sent to all case participants via email; please contact the Clerk's Office if you have any questions regarding this conference call. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 23, 2009 35 Featured Case MOTION For a Standing Order Regarding Filing And Service of Redacted Documents with supporting memo by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/11/2010 (Daly, Michael)
December 23, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting (23) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David E. Barry in case 1:09-cv-00470-S-DLM; granting (29) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David E. Barry in case 1:09-cv-00472-S-DLM; granting (27) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David E. Barry in case 1:09-cv-00471-S-DLM; granting (25) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David E. Barry in case 1:09-cv-00473-S-DLM; granting (20) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David E. Barry in case 1:09-cv-00502-S-DLM. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 12/23/09. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 21, 2009 34 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 12/21/09. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 10, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: Status Conference held on 12/10/2009; counsel present: B. Magratten, M. Daly; R. Flanders, M. Parker; A. Traini; J. Cavanaugh; J. Rosenquest; A. Moser; J. Brenner, A. Batastini (Jackson, Ryan)
December 4, 2009 33 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Edward Maggiacomo, Jr. Responses due by 12/21/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit 1-Annuity Contract, # 3 Exhibit 2-Annuity Application)(Traini, Anthony)
December 4, 2009 32 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss with Supporting Memo by Lifemark Securities Corp.. Responses due by 12/21/2009 (Cavanagh, Joseph)
December 3, 2009 31 Featured Case Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lifemark Securities Corp.. (Cavanagh, Joseph)
November 20, 2009 Featured Case Reset Deadlines: Lifemark Securities Corp. answer due 12/4/2009. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 20, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ORDER re 28 Stipulation filed by Lifemark Securities Corp., Transamerica Life Insurance. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 11/20/09. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 20, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: All response deadlines to pending motions in these related matters are POSTPONED until the status conference scheduled before Judge William E. Smtih on 12/10/09, when new response deadlines will be established for all pending motions. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 11/20/09. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 20, 2009 Featured Case Reset Deadlines: Edward Maggiacomo, Jr answer/responsive pleading due 12/4/2009. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 20, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ORDER re 25 Stipulation filed by Edward Maggiacomo, Jr., Transamerica Life Insurance. So Ordered by Judge William E. Smith on 11/20/09. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 20, 2009 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference scheduled for 12/10/2009 at 11:00 AM in Judge Smith Chambers before Judge William E. Smith (Jackson, Ryan)
November 20, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William E Smith: In Chambers Conference held on 11/20/2009; counsel present: M. Daly; D. Sherman; J. Rosenquest; R. Flanders; M. Parker; D. Prentiss; A. Traini; J. Cavanagh; A. Batastini (Jackson, Ryan)
November 19, 2009 30 Featured Case STIPULATION by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Joseph Caramadre, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Estella Rodrigues. (Magratten, Brooks)
November 17, 2009 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing:In Chambers Conference scheduled for 11/20/2009 at 11:00 AM in Judge Smith Chambers before Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 16, 2009 29 Featured Case APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE re 27 MOTION for David E. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Smith, Rana)
November 16, 2009 28 Featured Case STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Lifemark Securities Corp.. (Cavanagh, Joseph)
November 16, 2009 27 Featured Case MOTION for David E. Barry to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Daly, Michael)
November 13, 2009 26 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss WITH SUPPORTING MEMO by Joseph Caramadre, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Estella Rodrigues. Responses due by 11/30/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit B)(Flanders, Robert)
November 12, 2009 25 Featured Case STIPULATION re 9 Amended Complaint, Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading by Edward Maggiacomo, Jr. (Traini, Anthony)
November 11, 2009 24 Featured Case Corporate Disclosure Statement by Estate Planning Resources, Inc.. (Flanders, Robert)
November 5, 2009 23 Featured Case Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Daly, Michael)
November 5, 2009 22 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL: Chief Judge Mary M Lisi recused; Case reassigned to Judge William E Smith for all further proceedings -- So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 11/5/09. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 4, 2009 21 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Mary C. Dunn on behalf of Lifemark Securities Corp. (Dunn, Mary)
November 4, 2009 20 Featured Case STIPULATION by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Lifemark Securities Corp.. (Cavanagh, Joseph)
November 4, 2009 19 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph V. Cavanagh, Jr on behalf of Lifemark Securities Corp. (Cavanagh, Joseph)
November 4, 2009 18 Featured Case Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Lifemark Securities Corp. (Duhamel, John)
November 3, 2009 17 Featured Case MOTION for Entry of Default of Lifemark Securities Corp. With Supporting Memo by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/20/2009 (Daly, Michael)
October 30, 2009 Featured Case Reset Deadlines: Joseph Caramadre answer due 11/16/2009; Raymour Radhakrishnan answer due 11/16/2009; Estate Planning Resources, Inc. answer due 11/16/2009; Estella Rodrigues answer due 11/16/2009; Edward Maggiacomo, Jr answer due 11/16/2009. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 30, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ORDER entering 13 Stipulation filed by Estella Rodrigues, Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Raymour Radhakrishnan, Joseph Caramadre, 14 Stipulation filed by Edward Maggiacomo, Jr. - So Ordered by Chief Judge Mary M Lisi on 10/30/09. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 27, 2009 16 Featured Case Sealed Document placed in Magistrate Judges' Vault. (Saucier, Martha)
October 27, 2009 15 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Patrick Garvey served on 10/21/2009, answer due 11/10/2009. (Magratten, Brooks)
October 27, 2009 14 Featured Case STIPULATION re 9 Amended Complaint, Extending Time for Responsive Pleading by Edward Maggiacomo, Jr. (Traini, Anthony)
October 27, 2009 13 Featured Case STIPULATION by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Joseph Caramadre, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Estella Rodrigues. (Flanders, Robert)
October 26, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2009 re (3 in 1:09-cv-00473-ML-DLM) MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (4 in 1:09-cv-00470-ML-DLM) MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (4 in 1:09-cv-00471-ML-DLM) MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, (2 in 1:09-cv-00472-ML-DLM) MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio, (2 in 1:09-cv-00473-ML-DLM) MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Western Reserve Life Assurance Co. of Ohio. Court grants the motion. (Courtroom B at 10:13.) (Saucier, Martha)
October 22, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Mary M Lisi: Telephone Conference held on 10/22/2009; counsel of record present (Barletta, Barbara)
October 21, 2009 12 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Flanders, Jr on behalf of Joseph Caramadre, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Estella Rodrigues (Flanders, Robert)
October 21, 2009 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing:( Telephone Conference set for Thursday, 10/22/2009 at 09:00 AM before Chief Judge Mary M Lisi.) (Barletta, Barbara)
October 16, 2009 11 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M. Traini on behalf of Edward Maggiacomo, Jr (Traini, Anthony)
October 16, 2009 10 Featured Case NOTICE AND ORDER 4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge David L. Martin. (Noel, Jeannine)
October 16, 2009 9 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT against Patrick Garvey, Joseph Caramadre, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estate Planning Resources, Inc., Estella Rodrigues, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr, Lifemark Securities Corp., filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Catholic Paper Ad)(Daly, Michael)
October 14, 2009 8 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Lifemark Securities Corp. served on 10/5/2009, answer due 10/26/2009. (Magratten, Brooks)
October 8, 2009 7 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Edward Maggiacomo, Jr served on 10/5/2009, answer due 10/26/2009. (Daly, Michael)
October 8, 2009 6 Featured Case SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Estella Rodrigues served on 10/5/2009, answer due 10/26/2009. (Daly, Michael)
October 6, 2009 5 Featured Case STIPULATION by Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Joseph Caramadre, Estate Planning Resources, Inc.. (Magratten, Brooks)
October 5, 2009 Featured Case MOTIONS REFERRED: 4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Motions referred to David L. Martin for determination (Barletta, Barbara)
October 5, 2009 Featured Case CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since Chief Judge Mary M Lisi has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 09-470ML this case is permanently assigned to Chief Judge Mary M Lisi for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
October 2, 2009 4 Featured Case MOTION to Expedite Discovery With Supporting Memo by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/19/2009 (Daly, Michael)
October 2, 2009 Featured Case CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED: Related Case Number 09-470ML based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Duhamel, John)
October 2, 2009 Featured Case Summonses Issued as to: Patrick Garvey, Joseph Caramadre, Raymour Radhakrishnan, Estate Planning Resources, Inc.; Estella Rodrigues, Edward Maggiacomo, Jr.; Lifemark Securities Corp. (Duhamel, John)
October 2, 2009 3 Featured Case EXHIBIT E (Annuity Policy) by Transamerica Life Insurance Company in support of 1 Complaint. (Duhamel, John)
October 2, 2009 2 Featured Case EXHIBIT B (Annuity Brochure) by Transamerica Life Insurance Company in support of 1 Complaint. (Duhamel, John)
October 2, 2009 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350.00; Receipt number 14670001993), filed by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A: Program Specifics, # 3 Exhibit C: Affidavit of Patrick Garvey, # 4 Exhibit D: Annuity Application, # 5 Exhibit F: Rescission Letter) -- NOTE: Exhibits B and E docketed separately. (Duhamel, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transamerica Life Insurance Company v. Caramadre et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Caramadre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymour Radhakrishnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate Planning Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estella Rodrigues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Maggiacomo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifemark Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?