Wai Feng Trading Co. LTD et al v. Quick Fitting, Inc.

Plaintiff: Wai Feng Trading Co. LTD and Eastern Foundry & Fittings Inc.
Defendant: Quick Fitting, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00033
Filed: January 17, 2013
Court: Rhode Island District Court
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: William E. Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2016 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying (157 in 1:13-cv-00033-S-PAS, 214 in 1:13-cv-00056-S-PAS) APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Quick Fitting, Inc. re 150 in 1:13-cv-00033-S-PAS and (205) in 1:13-cv-00056-S-PAS, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion t o Quashfiled by Quick Fitting, Inc. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/30/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00033-S-PAS, 1:13-cv-00056-S-PAS(Jackson, Ryan)
September 30, 2015 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 82 Motion to Dismiss Count IV of Quick Fitting's Counterclaim; terminating 88 Report and Recommendations; adopting 94 Amended Report and Recommendations; and, reconsolidating this matter with CA13-56-S-PAS. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/30/2015. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 22, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting (49) Motion to Vacate Consolidation Order ; adopting (63) Report and Recommendations in case 1:13-cv-00033-S-PAS; granting (57) Motion to Vacate Consolidation Order; adopting (72) Report and Recommendations in case 1:13-cv-00056-S-PAS. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/22/14. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00033-S-PAS, 1:13-cv-00056-S-PAS(Jackson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wai Feng Trading Co. LTD et al v. Quick Fitting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wai Feng Trading Co. LTD
Represented By: Thomas W. Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastern Foundry & Fittings Inc.
Represented By: Thomas W. Lyons, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quick Fitting, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas R. Noel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?