High Rock Westminster Street, LLC v. Bank of America, N.A.

Plaintiff: High Rock Westminster Street, LLC
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00500
Filed: July 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D. Almond
Presiding Judge: William E. Smith
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 257 Motion to Amend the Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 205 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/7/2016. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER denying 167 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/9/2016. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 86 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing Defendant's counterclaims; denying 91 Motion for Reconsideration. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/12/15. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 39 Motion to Dismiss; denying 65 Motion to Amend/Correct. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/6/14. (Jackson, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: High Rock Westminster Street, LLC v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: High Rock Westminster Street, LLC
Represented By: Shawn Lu
Represented By: Daniel J. Lyne
Represented By: Michael K. O'Neil
Represented By: Stephen J. Reid, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?