McKnight V. Honeywell Safety Products Inc.
Plaintiff: Barbara McKnight
Defendant: Honeywell Safety Products USA, Honeywell International, Inc., David M Cote, Carl Johnson and Mark R James
Case Number: 1:2016cv00132
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Mary M. Lisi
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 133 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend/Correct Notice and Consent to Join the Collective Action and to Issue Reminder Notice (ECF No. 133) is granted in part and denied in part. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 11/16/2021. (Saucier, Martha)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 109 MOTION Extend Equitable Tolling of FLSA Claims . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/17/2020. (Saucier, Martha)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 75 Motion to Compel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 2/5/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting 49 Report and Recommendations and denying without prejudice 18 Motion to Certify Class- So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/11/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Strike. Defendants' 12 Motion to Strike the state class action allegations in paragraphs 45 to 53 is GRANTED without prejudice; Defe ndants' Motion to Strike the Fair Labor Standards Act collective class is DENIED. Plaintiffs are ordered to file their Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order. So Ordered by Senior Judge Mary M. Lisi on 2/23/2017. (Feeley, Susan)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKnight V. Honeywell Safety Products Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara McKnight
Represented By: Amato A. DeLuca
Represented By: Louise A. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell Safety Products USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M Cote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark R James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?