Callahan v. Wall et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Callahan
Defendant: Ashbel T. Wall, Fred Vohr, Jennifer Clarke and Adult Correctional Institution
Case Number: 1:2016cv00160
Filed: April 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: William E. Smith
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER adopting 103 Report and Recommendations and granting 94 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 102 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Plaintiff shall show cause within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order whey his claim against Defendant Clarke should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/11/2017. (Barletta, Barbara)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 78 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 78 Motion for TRO; adopting 86 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/12/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 39 Motion for prima facie Evidence; adopting 41 Report and Recommendations; denying 44 Motion for Re-Hearing; and, denying without prejudice 23 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/22/2016. (Jackson, Ryan)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Callahan v. Wall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashbel T. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Vohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adult Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?