State of Rhode Island v. Atlantic Richfield Company et al
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Defendant: Shell Petroleum, Inc., Valero Refining-Texas, L.P., CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Motiva Enterprises LLC, BP Products North America Inc, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, TRMI-H LLC, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Marathon Oil Company, Hess Corporation, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, Valero Energy Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Irving Oil Limited, Atlantic Richfield Company, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, TMR Company, Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation, Shell Trading (US) Company, Equilon Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C., Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), ConocoPhillips Company, Mobil Corporation, Shell Trading (US) Company individually formerly known as Equiva Trading Company doing business as Stusco, Chevron U.S.A., Inc. formerly known as Gulf Oil Corporation doing business as Chevron Products Company doing business as Chevron Chemical Company, ConocoPhillips Company individually, as successor-by-merger to Conoco, Inc., and Tosco Corporation formerly known as Phillips Petroleum Company doing business as Phillips 66 Company doing business as Phillips Chemical Company doing business as Philli, Atlantic Richfield Company individually, as successor-by-merger to Atlantic Richfield Company (a Pennsylvania corporation), and doing business as ARCO Products Company formerly known as Atlantic Richfield Delaware Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation formerly known as Exxon Corporation doing business as ExxonMobil Refining and Supply Company doing business as Exxon Chemical U.S.A formerly known as ExxonMobil Chemical Corporation, Shell Oil Products Company LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products Company, Socony Vacuum Oil Company, Incorporated, Valero Refining Company-Texas, Marathon Petroleum Company LLC, ExxonMobil Chemical Corporation, Valero Refining Company, Atlantic Richfield Delaware Corporation, Derby Refining Company, TOTAL Petrochemicals USA, Inc., Equilon Enterprises LLC individually, and as successor-by-merger to Equiva Services LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products US, American Petrofina Company of Texas, Amerada Hess Corporation, Exxon Corporation, Atofina Petrochemicals, Inc., Mobil Oil Corporation, Gulf Oil Corporation, Cities Service RMT Corporation, Coastal Derby Refining Company, Sun Oil Company of Pennsylvania, Getty Oil Company (Eastern Operations), Inc., USS Holdings Company, Texaco Refining and Marketing, Inc., Sun Refining and Marketing Company, Equiva Trading Company, Irving Oil Corporation, Fina Oil and Chemical Company, Coastal Refining & Marketing, Inc., Star Enterprises LLC, Sun Company, Inc (R&M), Phillips Petroleum Company, TRMI Holdings Inc, Colorado Oil and Gas Corporation, Socony Mobile Oil Company, Inc., The American Oil Company, Getty Refining and Marketing Inc., Amoco Oil Company and The Premcor Refining Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00204
Filed: May 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 6901 Resource & Recovery Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTICE by Valero Energy Corporation, The Premcor Refining Group, Inc., Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P., Ultramar Energy, Inc., Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Richard B. Lumley (Lumley, Richard)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Order Entering Stipulation of Dismissal re #254 Assented MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/7/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Order Entering Stipulation of Dismissal re #253 Assented MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/7/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Order Entering Stipulation of Dismissal re #252 Assented MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/7/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER granting #254 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/7/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER granting #253 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/7/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER granting #252 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/7/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE by State of Rhode Island re #233 Pretrial Scheduling Order,, Amendment Request to the Case Management Order (Hoffman, Alison)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Assented MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 signed Consent Judgment, #2 signed Joint Stipulation of Dismissal)(Hoffman, Alison)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Assented MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 signed Consent Judgment, #2 signed Joint Stipulation of Dismissal)(Hoffman, Alison)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Assented MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 8/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 signed Consent Judgment, #2 Exhibit signed Joint Stipulation of Dismissal)(Hoffman, Alison)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 251 NOTICE by Chevron U.S.A., Inc. WITHDRAWAL of Appearance of Jeremiah Anderson, Pro Hac Vice (Nakasian, Stacey)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: A review of the roll of attorneys admitted to practice before this Court indicates that Attorney Sean H. Lyness failed to renew his bar membership in accordance with LR Gen 203(c). Accordingly, he may no longer represent State of Rhode Island in this action and his appearance is withdrawn absent reinstatement in accordance with LR Gen 215.. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/2/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: A review of the roll of attorneys admitted to practice before this Court indicates that Attorney Sean H. Lyness failed to renew his bar membership in accordance with LR Gen 203(c). Accordingly, he may no longer represent State of Rhode Island in this action and his appearance is withdrawn absent reinstatement in accordance with LR Gen 215.. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/2/2022. (DaCruz, Kayla)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Order Entering Stipulation of Dismissal re #245 . So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/2/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Order Entering Stipulation of Dismissal re #245 . So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/2/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Order Entering Stipulation of Dismissal re #244 . So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/2/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Order Entering Stipulation of Dismissal re #244 . So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/2/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 248 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of State of Rhode Island against ConocoPhillips Company. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/29/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of State of Rhode Island against CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C., Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), TMR Company. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/29/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #244 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment; granting #245 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/29/2022. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation Withdrawal of Appearance of Jed P. Winer, Pro Hac Vice (Oliverio, Matthew)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation Withdrawal of Appearance of Jed P. Winer, Pro Hac Vice (Oliverio, Matthew)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Assented MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 4/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 signed Consent Judgment, #2 signed Joint Stipulation of Dismissal)(Hoffman, Alison)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Assented MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 4/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 signed Consent Judgment, #2 signed Joint Stipulation of Dismissal)(Hoffman, Alison)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE by The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P. Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Paul M. Sanford (Lumley, Richard)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE by The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P. Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Paul M. Sanford (Lumley, Richard)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE by The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P. Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance of Paul M. Sanford (Lumley, Richard)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: Discovery Hearing held on 1/26/2022. Alison B. Hoffman, William Walsh, Matthew Olivero, David J. Lender, Jed Winer, and Jessica Early addressed the Court. (by Zoom at 2:35 p.m.) (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: Discovery Hearing held on 1/26/2022. Alison B. Hoffman, William Walsh, Matthew Olivero, David J. Lender, Jed Winer, and Jessica Early addressed the Court. (by Zoom at 2:35 p.m.) (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Remote Discovery Dispute Conference set for 1/26/2022 at 2:30 PM by Zoom before District Judge William E. Smith. Zoom access information will be sent to counsel by email. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER entering Stipulation of Dismissal as to Hess Corporation. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/27/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 CONSENT JUDGMENT entered. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/27/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #240 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/27/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Assented MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 12/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 signed Consent Judgment, #2 signed Joint Stipulation of Dismissal)(Hoffman, Alison)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #238 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting #239 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Tricia K. Jedele and Neil F.X. Kelly terminated. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 10/15/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 10/18/2021. (Kelly, Neil)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 10/14/2021. (Hoffman, Alison)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison B. Hoffman on behalf of State of Rhode Island (Hoffman, Alison)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MOTION for Jessica Ragosta Early to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1644142 ) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation. (Oliverio, Matthew)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MOTION for Jed P. Winer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1644141 ) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation. (Oliverio, Matthew)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #235 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jed P. Winer; granting #236 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jessica Ragosta Early. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 7/14/2021. (Potter, Carrie)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #213 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Amounts Paid Out of the UST Fund. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/24/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: 'In' Chambers Conference re: Protocols for and Issues regarding Discovery via Zoom held on 5/13/2021; parties resolved issued prior to conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Factual Discovery to be completed by 8/31/2022; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 9/30/2022; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/29/2022; All Expert Discovery and Depositions to be completed by 1/30/2023; Dispositive Motions and Daubert Motions to be filed by 3/31/2023; Pretrial Memorandum due 30 days after decision on any pending motions, or if no motions are pending, by 3/31/2023. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/20/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: 'In' Chambers Conference re: Protocols for and Issues regarding Discovery via Zoom scheduled for THURSDAY 5/13/2021 at 2:00 PM as a Remote Hearing before District Judge William E. Smith; Zoom invitation will be emailed to counsel. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER entering #230 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. filed by State of Rhode Island. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/1/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER Entering #229 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company LP filed by State of Rhode Island. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 4/1/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by State of Rhode Island. (Kelly, Neil)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by State of Rhode Island. (Kelly, Neil)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER granting/entering #226 Assented-to MOTION for Entry of Consent Judgment (Marathon Petroleum Company LP). So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/31/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER granting/entering #225 Assented-to MOTION for Entry of Consent Judgment (Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.). So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/31/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Assented MOTION Entry of Consent Judgment filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kelly, Neil)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Assented MOTION Entry of Consent Judgment filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kelly, Neil)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER terminating #207 MOTION Entry of Case Management Order. As discussed during the hearing held on December 16, 2020, the Court will review the parties' submissions, enter a case management order, and rule on the pending partial motion for summary judgment as soon as practicable. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/29/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #222 Motion for Extension of Time. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/4/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 NOTICE by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation Defendants' Submission of Updated Proposed Case Management Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oliverio, Matthew)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE by State of Rhode Island Plaintiff State of Rhode Island's Submission of Updated Proposed Case Management Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pickrel, Carla)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time March 3, 2021 to Submit Proposed Case Management Order filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation. Responses due by 3/16/2021. (Oliverio, Matthew)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 REPLY to Response re #219 Response to Motion, for Partial Summary Judgment on the State's Claim for Amounts Paid out of the UST Fund filed by All Defendants. (Cooper, Harmon (Monty))
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #220 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Case Management Order up to and including 3/2/21. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 2/23/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to submit Proposed Case Management Order filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 3/8/2021. (Kelly, Neil)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 RESPONSE In Opposition to #213 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Amounts Paid Out of the UST Fund filed by State of Rhode Island. Replies due by 2/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Disputed Facts, #2 Summary Chart of Statement of Disputed Facts, #3 Declaration of Benjamin Krass, #4 Exhibit A-C to Krass Declaration)(Pickrel, Carla)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Amended Filing Deadlines as set in 12/17/20 Text Order: Plaintiffs' response to Partial Motion for Summary Judgment is due on February 12, 2021; and Defendants' reply is due on February 23, 2021. A joint proposed case management order shall be filed by February 23, 2021; If a joint schedule cannot be agreed upon, the parties shall instead file competing schedules by February 23, 2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/26/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing, held on December 16, 2020, before District Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter Denise P. Veitch, Telephone number 401-752-7031. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 2/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/26/2021. (Veitch, Denise)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #216 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Veitch. (Dias, Jennifer)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/16/2020 before Judge William E. Smith. 3-Day Transcript Selected. Transcript to be delivered within 3 calendar days.. (Pickrel, Carla)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #214 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Veitch. (Dias, Jennifer)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/16/20 before Judge William E. Smith. Expedited Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered within 7 calendar days.. (Oliverio, Matthew)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claim for Amounts Paid Out of the UST Fund filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Facts, #3 Declaration of John Guttmann in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Cooper, Harmon (Monty))
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering the following schedule to brief the past costs issue, as discussed at the December 16, 2020 hearing. Defendants motion is due on January 15, 2021; Plaintiffs response is due on February 5, 2021; and Defendants reply is due on February 12, 2021. A joint proposed case management order shall be filed by February 12, 2021. If a joint schedule cannot be agreed upon, the parties shall instead file competing schedules by February 12, 2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/16/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2020 re #207 MOTION Entry of Case Management Order : Speakers: D. Lender, M. Pawa, C. Corrll, W. Walsh. Court addresses the parties. Arguments heard. Briefing schedule set. Text Order to Enter. (Court Reporter D. Veitch via Video Hearing at 2:04 pm.) (Potter, Carrie)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 Notice of Withdraw as Attorney for Sean Lyness filed by State of Rhode Island. (Kelly, Neil) Modified on 12/3/2020 (Potter, Carrie).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 DOCKET NOTE: Regarding: Notice of Hearing on Motion: ZOOM INVITATION AND INSTRUCTIONS:Judge William Smith is inviting you to a scheduled ZoomGov meeting.Topic: COURTROOM HEARING: CA17-204WES State of Rhode Island v. Atlantic Richfield Company et alTime: Dec 16, 2020 02:00 PM Eastern Time (US and Canada)Join ZoomGov Meeting https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1608912556Meeting ID: 160 891 2556Passcode: 061164One tap mobile +16692545252,,1608912556#,,,,,,0#,,061164# US (San Jose)+16468287666,,1608912556#,,,,,,0#,,061164# US (New York)Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 646 828 7666 US (New York) 833 568 8864 US Toll-freeMeeting ID: 160 891 2556Passcode: 061164Find your local number: https://www.zoomgov.com/u/abVd5lL3FJJoin by SIP 1608912556@sip.zoomgov.comJoin by H.323161.199.138.10 (US West)161.199.136.10 (US East)Meeting ID: 160 891 2556Passcode: 061164 (Jackson, Ryan) Modified on 12/4/2020: docket entry number (211) removed, there is no attached document (Jackson, Ryan).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on #207 MOTION Entry of Case Management Order: Motion Hearing via Zoom scheduled for WEDNESDAY 12/16/2020 at 2:00 PM as a Remote Hearing before District Judge William E. Smith; Zoom invite and info will be emailed to all counsel. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc of Withdrawal of Appearance of Benjamin R. O'Connor (Jacobowski, Amanda)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 REPLY to Response re #208 Response to Motion, Plaintiff State of Rhode Island's Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Entry of Case Management Order filed by State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to State Reply Brief on CMO, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to State Reply Brief on CMO, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C State Reply Brief on CMO, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D State Reply Brief on CMO)(Krass, Benjamin)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 RESPONSE In Opposition to #207 MOTION Entry of Case Management Order filed by All Defendants. Replies due by 7/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - I)(MacGillivray, Stephen)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MOTION Entry of Case Management Order filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Case Management Order, #2 Supporting Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff State of Rhode Island's Motion for Entry of Case Management Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A through F to Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff State of Rhode Island's Motion for Entry of Case Management Order)(Krass, Benjamin)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order AMENDED TEXT ORDER: (Updating Deadlines) Pursuant to the teleconference held on May 27, 2020, the parties are directed to submit briefs to the Court regarding the management of this case. The Plaintiff's brief is due no later than 6/24/2020. The Defendants shall respond no later than 7/24/2020. The Plaintiff shall file a reply no later than 8/14/2020. The Court will schedule an oral argument after briefing is complete. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/17/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MOTION for Matthew Pawa to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1507648 ) filed by State of Rhode Island. (Kelly, Neil)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MOTION for M. Cristina Sanchez to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1507644 ) filed by State of Rhode Island. (Kelly, Neil)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #205 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of M. Cristina Sanchez, ; granting #206 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew F. Pawa. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/1/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #204 Motion for Leave to File Additional Pro Hac Vice Application. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/28/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: Telephone Conference held on 5/27/2020. Counsel of the call: N. Kelly, W. Walsh, C. Sanchez, and M. Pawa for the Plaintiffs; D. Lender for the Defendants. Additional counsel were present on the call but did not speak. (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the teleconference held on May 27, 2020, the parties are directed to submit briefs to the Court regarding the management of this case. The Plaintiff's brief is due no later than 21 days from entry of this order. The Defendants shall respond no later than 21 days after the filing of the Plaintiff's brief. The Plaintiff shall file a reply no later than 10 days after the filing of the Defendants' response. The Court will schedule an oral argument after briefing is complete. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/27/2020. (Simoncelli, Michael)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 MOTION for Leave to File Document Motion for Leave to File Additional Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 6/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Pawa Pro Hac Vice Motion)(Krass, Benjamin)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) identifying Corporate Parent ETC Sunoco Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Operating L.P. for Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).. (Fine, Robert)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference scheduled for Wednesday 5/27/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge William E. Smith; this office will distribute dial-in instructions prior to the date of the call, via email, to all counsel of record. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/23/2020; counsel on call: N. Kelly, W. Walsh; D. Lender; additional counsel were present on call but did not speak. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order UPDATED NOTICE OF Hearing: Status Conference is now a Dial-in Telephone Conference scheduled for Monday 3/23/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge William E. Smith; Dial-in instructions will be distributed via email shortly following this notice. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference scheduled for MONDAY 3/23/2020 at 2:00 PM in Chambers before District Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert D. Fine (Fine, Robert)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order HEARING CANCELLED re: Notice of Status Conference previously scheduled for 1/8/2020 is hereby CANCELLED at the request of the parties and will be re-scheduled to a date to be determined in late-February 2020 (Jackson, Ryan)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #201 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paula J. Schauwecker. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/20/2019. (Hicks, Alyson)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MOTION for Paula J. Schauwecker to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1447988 ) filed by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M). (Fine, Robert)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #199 Motion for Leave to File. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/8/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference scheduled for WEDNESDAY 1/8/2020 at 3:30 PM Chambers before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Status Conference re: held on 11/4/2019; counsel present: S. Nakasian; C. Corren; P. Condron; J. Padwa; L. Meyer; S. Razzano; J. Bulman; D. Yoder; D. Barnara; D. Lender; M. Oliverio; S. Dillard; R. Flanders; A. Jacobowski; N. Kelly; A. Hoffman; R. Jedele; C. Sanchez; E. Anderson; B. Krass; S. Olsen; W. Walsh; J. Tarantino; J. Guttmann; R. Fine; G. Petros; G. Pogust; S. Lyness; M. Dolan; R. Lumley; B. Wall (Jackson, Ryan)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Dolan on behalf of Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company (Dolan, Mark)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MOTION for Leave to File Document Motion for Leave to File Additional Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Pickrel, Carla)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE of Appearance by Tricia K. Jedele on behalf of State of Rhode Island (Jedele, Tricia)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings: Notice of Status Conference (re: Discovery Progress and the Establishment of a CMO) is hereby RE-SCHEDULED to Monday 11/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in the Judicial Conference Room (2nd Floor) before Chief Judge William E. Smith; conference rescheduled from 10/25/19 due to a Court conflict(Jackson, Ryan)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Reset Hearings re: Notice of Status Conference (re: Discovery Progress and the Establishment of a CMO) is hereby RE-SCHEDULED to Friday 10/25/2019 at 11:30 AM in the Judicial Conference Room (2nd Floor) before Chief Judge William E. Smith; conference rescheduled from 9/9/19 by joint request of the parties. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting #196 Assented to Motion Authorizing Electronic Service. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/23/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Assented MOTION Authorizing Electronic Service filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Pickrel, Carla)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #195 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sina Mansouri. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/23/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MOTION for Sina Mansouri to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1398918 ) filed by Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited. (Gainor, Ryan)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #192 Motion to Enter Order re: Agreement on the Production of Electronically Stored Information (ESI) and Hard-Copy Documents. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/17/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT by State of Rhode Island in support of #192 Assented MOTION to Enter Order . (Pickrel, Carla)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Assented MOTION to Enter Order filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Pickrel, Carla)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Lumley on behalf of Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P. (Lumley, Richard)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MOTION for Harmon L. (Monty) Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1384187 ) filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(McBurney, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION for Richard E. Wallace to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1384169 ) filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(McBurney, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #189 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard E. Wallace ; granting #190 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Harmon L. (Monty) Cooper.. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/19/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #187 Motion for Benjamin O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/13/2019. (Jackson, Kerrie)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stacey P. Nakasian (Nakasian, Stacey)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 MOTION for Benjamin O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1359083 ) filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc. (Tarantino, John)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #186 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Rebecca Tedford Partington terminated. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/7/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #171 Motion for Leave to File Additional Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/7/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 5/15/2019. (Partington, Rebecca)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc of Filing of Agreements to Confidentiality Order (Langan, J.)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE by Chevron U.S.A., Inc., TRMI-H LLC of Acknowledgement of Confidentiality Order (Nakasian, Stacey)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE by Hess Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Petroleum Company LP re #166 Order of Confidentiality (Fine, Robert)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 NOTICE by ConocoPhillips Company Notice of Acknowledgment (Dillard, Stephen)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 NOTICE by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company of Acknowledgement of Confidentiality Order (McBurney, Matthew)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE by Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company of Acknowledgment of Confidentiality Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dolan, Mark)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 179 NOTICE by Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P. Acknowledgment of Confidentiality Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sanford, Paul)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) of Acknowledgment of Confidentiality Order (Guttmann, John)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 NOTICE by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation regarding Acknowledgment of Confidentiality Order for Attorneys Matthew Oliverio, David Lender, Jessica Falk, Deborah Barnard, Michael Maroney, James Pardoe and Lisa Gerson (Oliverio, Matthew)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 NOTICE by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C. regarding Acknowledgment of Confidentiality Order for Attorneys John E. Bulman, and Stephen J. MacGillivray (MacGillivray, Stephen)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE by Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited of Acknowledgement of Confidentiality Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Petros, Gerald)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C. regarding Acknowledgment of Confidentiality Order for Attorneys Nathan P. Eimer, Pamela R. Hanebutt, Lisa S. Meyer, and Susan M. Razzano (Razzano, Susan)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. of Filing of Agreements to Confidentiality Order (for Attorneys Padwa, Domingo, Lovitt and Myers) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Padwa, Jeffrey)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE by State of Rhode Island Notice of Acknowledgement of Confidentiality Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kelly, Neil)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #170 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amanda Jacobowski. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/16/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 MOTION for Leave to File Document (Motion for Leave to File Additional Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc. Responses due by 4/29/2019. (Benjamin, Nicole)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION for Amanda Jacobowski to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1348680 ) filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc. (Tarantino, John)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc of Withdrawal of Appearance of Bradley H. Weidenhammer (Weidenhammer, Bradley)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 NOTICE by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc of Filing of Agreements to Confidentiality Order (for Attorneys Tarantino, Rocha, Zambarano and Benjamin) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Zambarano, Kyle)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #167 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Susan M. Razzano. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/10/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION for Susan M. Razzano to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1346428 ) filed by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Bulman, John)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 166 CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER re: #164 Assented MOTION to Enter Orders filed by State of Rhode Island. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/9/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #164 Assented MOTION to Enter Orders. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/9/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #162 MOTION to Request Expansion of Pro Hac Vice Counsel. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/9/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Assented MOTION to Enter Orders filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 4/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Pickrel, Carla)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey P. Nakasian on behalf of TRMI-H LLC (Nakasian, Stacey)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION to Request Expansion of Pro Hac Vice Counsel filed by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C.. Responses due by 4/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bulman, John)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 161 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/18/2019 before Judge William E. Smith. Ordinary Transcript delivery selected. Transcript to be delivered in 30 days.. (Oliverio, Matthew)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TRANSCRIPT ORDER RESCINDED re: #161 Transcript Order The Court Reporter certifies the transcript order is unable to be fulfilled for the following reasons: Hearing was not recorded. (Dias, Jennifer)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Duffy on behalf of TRMI-H LLC (Duffy, Robert)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Duffy on behalf of Chevron U.S.A., Inc. (Duffy, Robert)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Status and Scheduling Conference held on 3/18/2019; counsel present: D. Lender; D. Barnard; R. Marcaccio; J. Pardo; P. Condron; R. Duffy; J. Padwa; C. Domingo; T. Lovitt; J. Messenger; J. Anderson; J. Bulman; D. Yods; J. Petros; G. Pogust; T. Baldwin; J. Farley; R. Gainor; R. Lumley; L. Meyer; N. Kelly; B. Krass; W. Walsh; C. Pickrel; C. Sanchez; S. Lyness; S. Olsen; M. Dolan, Jr.; J. Tarantino. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference re; Discovery Progress and Scheduling scheduled for Monday 9/9/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 3 (location in Courthouse subject to change) before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION for David J. Lender to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1329443 ) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation. (Oliverio, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION for Jessica L. Falk to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1329438 ) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation. (Oliverio, Matthew)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #158 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David J. Lender. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/27/2019. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #157 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jessica L. Falk. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/27/2019. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ANSWER to Complaint by Marathon Oil Company.(Fine, Robert)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ANSWER to Complaint Ultramar Energy, Inc's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ultramar Energy, Inc..(Anderson, Erika)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ANSWER to Complaint The Premcor Refining Group's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Premcor Refining Group Inc.(Anderson, Erika)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ANSWER to Complaint Valero Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P..(Anderson, Erika)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ANSWER to Complaint by Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company.(Dolan, Mark)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ANSWER to Complaint by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C..(Hanebutt, Pamela)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ANSWER to Complaint by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).(Guttmann, John)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ANSWER to Complaint by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc.(Zambarano, Kyle)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ANSWER to Complaint by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation.(Oliverio, Matthew)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ANSWER to Complaint by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc..(Padwa, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ANSWER to Complaint by ConocoPhillips Company.(Dillard, Stephen)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ANSWER to Complaint by Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited.(Petros, Gerald)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ANSWER to Complaint of State of Rhode Island by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company.(McBurney, Matthew)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. McBurney on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company (McBurney, Matthew)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ANSWER to Complaint by Marathon Petroleum Company LP.(Fine, Robert)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ANSWER to Complaint by Hess Corporation.(Fine, Robert)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ANSWER to Complaint by Chevron U.S.A., Inc., TRMI-H LLC.(Nakasian, Stacey)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION for James J. Maher to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1323182 ) filed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Nakasian, Stacey)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #139 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of James J. Maher. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/8/2019. (Simoncelli, Michael)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 138 STIPULATION - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading filed by Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.. (Anderson, Erika)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION to extend answer date filed by Marathon Oil Company. (Fine, Robert)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #136 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company answer due 2/22/2019; El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company answer due 2/22/2019.. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/7/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Responsive Pleading filed by Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company. Responses due by 2/19/2019. (Dolan, Mark)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order HEARING CANCELLED re: the Telephone Status and Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for Thursday 1/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge William E. Smith is hereby CANCELLED and will be re-scheduled at a date to be determined (Jackson, Ryan)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Setting Deadline: All Parties shall submit (via email to Case Manager Ryan Jackson) a proposed Case Management Order ("CMO") on or before March 4, 2019. These submissions can be made jointly if a single proposed CMO is agreed to by all parties and/or groups of parties. Following submission of these proposed CMO's, the Court will hold a conference to finalize the CMO for this matter on March 18, 2019, at 2 PM. Notice of that conference will issue separately. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/8/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Status and Scheduling Conference scheduled for MONDAY 3/18/2019 at 2:00 PM in Chambers (location in the Courthouse subject to change) before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE by ConocoPhillips Company Withdrawal of Appearance of Gabriel D. Kaim (Dillard, Stephen)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re #133 Stipulation. By agreement of the Parties, Defendants may have up to and including February 11, 2019, to file their answers and affirmative defenses to the State's complaint - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/2/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #132 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael T. Maroney. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/21/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 STIPULATION To Extend Time to Answer Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Oliverio, Matthew)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MOTION for Michael T. Maroney to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1303656 ) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation. (Oliverio, Matthew)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION for Lisa Gerson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1302947 ) filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation. (Oliverio, Matthew)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #131 Motion for Lisa Gerson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/18/2018. (Jackson, Kerrie)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle M. Zambarano on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc (Zambarano, Kyle)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole J. Benjamin on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc (Benjamin, Nicole)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status and Scheduling Conference scheduled for Thursday 1/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Chief Judge William E. Smith; call-in instructions will be sent to all counsel of record via email within 24 hours of the date of the hearing. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 OPINION AND ORDER denying #88 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; finding as moot #89 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #91 Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/11/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Defendant Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.'s second Motion for Leave To File Document (ECF No. 123) in Support of Its Motion To Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (ECF No. 88) is GRANTED. The Court takes notice of the authority cited by Defendant. The Court will consider the Response (ECF No. 126) filed by Plaintiff the State of Rhode Island when reviewing the case. - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/20/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE by Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P. of Withdrawal of Appearance by Benjamin Caldwell (Caldwell, Benjamin)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #119 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Carlton D. Wilde, III; Christopher L. Dodson and Amy E. Parker terminated. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/9/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 126 RESPONSE In Opposition to #123 Second MOTION for Leave to File Document in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by State of Rhode Island. Replies due by 3/15/2018. (Pickrel, Carla)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE by State of Rhode Island Withdrawal of Appearance (Rubin, Michael)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean H. Lyness on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lyness, Sean)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Second MOTION for Leave to File Document in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. Responses due by 3/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supplemental Authority)(Padwa, Jeffrey)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MOTION for Traci L. Lovitt to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1179355 ) filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. (Padwa, Jeffrey)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for Diane L. Myers to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1179354 ) filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. (Padwa, Jeffrey)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MOTION for Christopher H. Domingo to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1179345 ) filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. (Padwa, Jeffrey)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #122 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Traci L. Lovitt. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/16/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #121 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Diane L. Myers. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/16/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #120 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher H. Domingo. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/16/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. Responses due by 2/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Withdraw Appearance)(Parker, Amy)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 NOTICE by Hess Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Petroleum Company LP of withdrawal of Steven L. Leifer by reason of retirement (Fine, Robert)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE of Change of Address by John E. Bulman (Bulman, John)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #115 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Veitch. Transcript due by 11/22/2017. (Dias, Jennifer)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10/24/2017 before Judge Smith. Expedited Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered within 7 calendar days.. (Kelly, Neil)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT of Motions to Dismiss and Motion for Joinder Hearing, held on October 24, 2017, before Chief Judge William E. Smith. Court Reporter Denise P. Veitch, Telephone number 401-323-9337. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Redaction Requests must be filed for personal identifiers only. All other redactions must be requested by motion. For local policy and sample redaction request visit our website at www.rid.uscourts.gov and select Transcripts under the Case Information menu option. Redaction Request due 11/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2018. (Veitch, Denise)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT Entered re: #112 Transcript Order. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Veitch. Transcript due by 11/3/2017. (Dias, Jennifer)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 10-24-2017 before Judge Smith. Expedited Transcript selected. Transcript to be delivered within 7 calendar days.. (Tarantino, John)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany M. Whitmarsh on behalf of Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company (Whitmarsh, Bethany)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company. (Boughton, Shanna)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Motion Hearing held on 10/24/2017 re #91 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Marathon Oil Company, Shell Trading (US) Company, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Mobil Corporation, TMR Company, Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Shell Petroleum, Inc., TRMI-H LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Valero Energy Corporation, CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), Atlantic Richfield Company, Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, ConocoPhillips Company, Shell Oil Company, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, BP Products North America Inc, PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C., Hess Corporation, Irving Oil Limited, Equilon Enterprises LLC, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, #88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., #90 MOTION for Joinder filed by El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, #95 MOTION for Joinder in defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., #89 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Marathon Oil Company, Shell Trading (US) Company, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Mobil Corporation, TMR Company, Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Shell Petroleum, Inc., Exxon Mobil Corporation, Valero Energy Corporation, CITGO Petroleum Corporation, ConocoPhillips Company, Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Atlantic Richfield Company, Shell Oil Company, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C., BP Products North America Inc, Irving Oil Limited, Hess Corporation, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P., Equilon Enterprises LLC, Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company. (Tarantino, Parker, Pickrel, Kelly, Rubin) Court addresses and grants motions for joinder (ECF 90 & 95). Arguments heard on defts' motion to dismiss. Court questions. Parties respond. Court takes matter under advisement and will issue a ruling at a later date. Recess. (Court Reporter Denise Veitch in Courtroom 2 at 2:10 p.m..) (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #90 Motion for Joinder; granting #95 Motion for Joinder. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/24/2017. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Welspun Case)(Parker, Amy)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. re #88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Parker, Amy)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 RESPONSE in Support re #91 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc, CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, ConocoPhillips Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Equilon Enterprises LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Hess Corporation, Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Mobil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises LLC, PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C., Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), TMR Company, TRMI-H LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.. (Oliverio, Matthew)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE of Change of Address by Benjamin Krass (Krass, Benjamin)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #104 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jessica Farley. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/8/2017. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #105 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gabriel D Kaim. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/8/2017. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #103 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen Dillard. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/8/2017. (Simoncelli, Michael)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Gabriel D. Kaim to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1122333 ) filed by ConocoPhillips Company. (Baldwin, Timothy)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION for Jessica G. Farley to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1122327 ) filed by ConocoPhillips Company. (Baldwin, Timothy)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION for Stephen C. Dillard to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1122323 ) filed by ConocoPhillips Company. (Baldwin, Timothy)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 NOTICE by ConocoPhillips Company to Withdraw Appearnce of Pro Hac Vice Counsel Matthew D. Thurlow (Baldwin, Timothy)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE by ConocoPhillips Company to Withdraw Appearance of Pro Hac Vice Counsel Mary Rose Alexander (Baldwin, Timothy)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy K. Baldwin on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company (Baldwin, Timothy)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on #95 MOTION for Joinder in defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss, #91 Amended MOTION to Dismiss, #89 MOTION to Dismiss, #88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #90 MOTION for Joinder: Motion Hearing scheduled for Tuesday 10/24/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 Amended MOTION to Dismiss with supporting memorandum filed by State of Rhode Island. Replies due by 8/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Supplement Declaration for Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Walsh, William)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #97 Motion for Extension of Time and entering #98 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/9/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: State's Responses due by 8/23/2017; Defendants' Replies due by 9/13/2017(Jackson, Ryan)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATION re #91 Amended MOTION to Dismiss filed by State of Rhode Island. (Kelly, Neil)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 8/22/2017. (Kelly, Neil)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 RESPONSE in Support re #88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Padwa, Jeffrey)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MOTION for Joinder in defendants' Amended Motion to Dismiss filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. Responses due by 8/9/2017. (Padwa, Jeffrey)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by State of Rhode Island. Replies due by 7/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E)(Pickrel, Carla)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION for Peter C. Condron to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #93 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Peter Condron. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 7/14/2017. (Simoncelli, Michael)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #92 First MOTION for Peter C. Condron to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1103075 ). The name of the ECF Filer must be preceded by an "s/" and typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. The filer is directed to re-file the document within one day. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 First MOTION for Peter C. Condron to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1103075 ) filed by Equilon Enterprises LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company. (Boughton, Shanna)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Amended MOTION to Dismiss With Supporting Memorandum filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc, CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, ConocoPhillips Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Equilon Enterprises LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Hess Corporation, Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Mobil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises LLC, PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C., Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), TMR Company, TRMI-H LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.. Responses due by 7/25/2017. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Oliverio, Matthew)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Joinder filed by El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company. Responses due by 7/24/2017. (Wall, Brian)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Dismiss With Supporting Memorandum filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc, CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, ConocoPhillips Company, Equilon Enterprises LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Hess Corporation, Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Mobil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises LLC, PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C., Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, TMR Company, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.. Responses due by 7/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Oliverio, Matthew)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. Responses due by 7/21/2017. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Kim Arterburn, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Anthony T. Giorgio, #4 Exhibit Order on Defendant Equistar's Motion to Dismiss in New Hampshire v. Hess Corp., et al, Merrimack County Superior Court, C.A. No.: 03-C-0550 (2008))(Padwa, Jeffrey)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: ANSWER DEADLINE as to All Defendants is 7/10/17. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #86 Stipulation re: Time to Answer or otherwise respond to Complaint and Time for Plaintiff to Respond to any such motion filed by Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Motiva Enterprises LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Marathon Oil Company, Shell Trading (US) Company, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Mobil Corporation, TMR Company, Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Shell Petroleum, Inc., TRMI-H LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Valero Energy Corporation, Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), ConocoPhillips Company, Atlantic Richfield Company, Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Shell Oil Company, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, BP Products North America Inc, PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C., Hess Corporation, Irving Oil Limited, Equilon Enterprises LLC, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/15/2017. (Jackson, Ryan)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.. (Padwa, Jeffrey)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION ReTime to Answer and Rule 12(b)(6) and (2) Motions filed by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc, CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, ConocoPhillips Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company, Equilon Enterprises LLC, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Hess Corporation, Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Mobil Corporation, Motiva Enterprises LLC, PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C., Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, Shell Oil Company, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, Shell Petroleum, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco, Inc. (R&M), TMR Company, TRMI-H LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc., Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.. (Oliverio, Matthew)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE by TRMI-H LLC Consent to Removal (Anderson, Jeremiah)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company, El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company. (Wall, Brian)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Wall on behalf of Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company (Wall, Brian)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley H. Weidenhammer on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc (Weidenhammer, Bradley)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew R. Running on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc (Running, Andrew)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Andrew Langan on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc (Langan, J.)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips Company. (Flanders, Robert)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC. (Gainor, Ryan)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Irving Oil Limited. (Gainor, Ryan)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valero Refining-Texas, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for Valero Refining-Texas, L.P... (Caldwell, Benjamin)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valero Marketing and Supply Company identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for Valero Marketing and Supply Company.. (Caldwell, Benjamin)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Valero Energy Corporation. (Caldwell, Benjamin)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ultramar Energy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for Ultramar Energy, Inc... (Caldwell, Benjamin)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Premcor Refining Group Inc identifying Corporate Parent Valero Energy Corporation for The Premcor Refining Group Inc.. (Caldwell, Benjamin)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PBF Holding Company LLC for Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC.. (Caldwell, Benjamin)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa S. Meyer on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C. (Meyer, Lisa)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela R. Hanebutt on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C. (Hanebutt, Pamela)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan P. Eimer on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C. (Eimer, Nathan)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent VPHI Midwest, Inc., Corporate Parent CITGO for PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C... (MacGillivray, Stephen)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. identifying Corporate Parent CITGO Investment Company, whose parent corporation is CITGO for CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P... (MacGillivray, Stephen)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITGO Petroleum Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CITGO Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent PDV Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent Petroleos de Venezuela S.A. for CITGO Petroleum Corporation.. (MacGillivray, Stephen)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. MacGillivray on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C. (MacGillivray, Stephen)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Bulman on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P., PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C. (Bulman, John)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Valero Refining-Texas, L.P. waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Valero Marketing and Supply Company waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Valero Energy Corporation waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Ultramar Energy, Inc. waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. TMR Company waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Shell Trading (US) Company waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Shell Petroleum, Inc. waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Shell Oil Products Company LLC waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Shell Oil Company waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. The Premcor Refining Group Inc waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C. waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Motiva Enterprises LLC waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Mobil Corporation waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Marathon Petroleum Company LP waiver sent on 4/27/2017, answer due 6/26/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Marathon Oil Company waiver sent on 4/28/2017, answer due 6/27/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Irving Oil Limited waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Hess Corporation waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. ExxonMobil Oil Corporation waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Exxon Mobil Corporation waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Equilon Enterprises LLC waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. ConocoPhillips Company waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P. waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. CITGO Petroleum Corporation waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. BP Products North America Inc waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Rhode Island. Atlantic Richfield Company waiver sent on 5/5/2017, answer due 7/5/2017. (Pickrel, Carla)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by William A. Walsh on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Walsh, William)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. Rocha on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc (Rocha, Patricia)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #25 Motion for Benjamin Krass, #26 Motion for Carla Burke Pickrel and #7 Motion for William A. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/22/2017. (Jackson, Kerrie)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Rubin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rubin, Michael)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Neil F.X. Kelly on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kelly, Neil)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for William A. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1086762 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rubin, Michael)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Carla Burke Pickrel to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1086760 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rubin, Michael)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Benjamin Krass to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1086738 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Rubin, Michael)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED Since Chief Judge William E. Smith has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 16-495-S; this case is permanently assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith for all further proceedings (Jackson, Ryan)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Dolan on behalf of Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company (Dolan, Mark)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron U.S.A., Inc., TRMI-H LLC. (Nakasian, Stacey)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert G. Flanders, Jr on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company (Flanders, Robert)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) identifying Corporate Parent Sunoco, Inc. for Sunoco, Inc. (R&M).. (Fine, Robert)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marathon Petroleum Company LP identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Petroleum Corporation, Corporate Parent MPC Investment LLC for Marathon Petroleum Company LP.. (Fine, Robert)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marathon Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Oil Corporation for Marathon Oil Company.. (Fine, Robert)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Corporation. (Fine, Robert)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Charles C. Correll to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1085706 ) filed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Nakasian, Stacey)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Jeremiah J. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 50.00, receipt number 0103-1085698 ) filed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Nakasian, Stacey)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey P. Nakasian on behalf of Chevron U.S.A., Inc. (Nakasian, Stacey)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Padwa on behalf of Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc. (Padwa, Jeffrey)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation. (Oliverio, Matthew)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M. Sanford on behalf of Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P. (Sanford, Paul)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. Caldwell on behalf of Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC, The Premcor Refining Group Inc, Ultramar Energy, Inc., Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valero Refining-Texas, L.P. (Caldwell, Benjamin)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Jeremiah J. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/16/2017. (Jackson, Kerrie)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Charles C. Correll, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/16/2017. (Jackson, Kerrie)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Thomas Oliverio on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation, Mobil Corporation (Oliverio, Matthew)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc. (Tarantino, John)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Tarantino on behalf of Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Products North America Inc (Tarantino, John)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Gainor on behalf of Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited (Gainor, Ryan)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Gainor on behalf of Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited (Gainor, Ryan)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald J. Petros on behalf of Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC, Irving Oil Limited (Petros, Gerald)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Fine on behalf of Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) (Fine, Robert)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Fine on behalf of Hess Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Petroleum Company LP (Fine, Robert)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number 2017-1879. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1084183, filed by Mobil Corporation, Exxon Mobil Corporation, ExxonMobil Oil Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice to Superior Court, #3 Exhibit Exh. 2 to Notice, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Oliverio, Matthew)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. Related Case Number 16-cv-495. (Simoncelli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Rhode Island v. Atlantic Richfield Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Petroleum, Inc.
Represented By: Harmon (Monty) L. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Peter Condron
Represented By: Richard E. Wallace
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Refining-Texas, L.P.
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Richard Lumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITGO Refining and Chemicals Company L.P.
Represented By: John E. Bulman
Represented By: Stephen J. MacGillivray
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Pamela R. Hanebutt
Represented By: Susan M. Razzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motiva Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Harmon (Monty) L. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Peter Condron
Represented By: Richard E. Wallace
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America Inc
Represented By: Benjamin O'Connor
Represented By: Bradley H. Weidenhammer
Represented By: J. Andrew Langan
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Represented By: Nicole J. Benjamin
Represented By: Patricia K. Rocha
Represented By: Amanda Jacobowski
Represented By: Andrew R. Running
Represented By: Kyle M. Zambarano
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highlands Fuel Delivery, LLC
Represented By: Gerald J. Petros
Represented By: James D. Herschlein
Represented By: Glenn J. Pogust
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Represented By: Sina Mansouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Merchant Energy-Petroleum Company
Represented By: James L. Messenger
Represented By: Mark P. Dolan
Represented By: Brian J. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRMI-H LLC
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Robert M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultramar Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Richard Lumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Represented By: Joshua B. Frank
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Represented By: Joshua B. Frank
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Eagle Point Oil Company
Represented By: James L. Messenger
Represented By: Mark P. Dolan
Represented By: Brian J. Wall
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Energy Corporation
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Richard Lumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Represented By: Joshua B. Frank
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITGO Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: John E. Bulman
Represented By: Stephen J. MacGillivray
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Pamela R. Hanebutt
Represented By: Susan M. Razzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irving Oil Limited
Represented By: Gerald J. Petros
Represented By: James D. Herschlein
Represented By: Glenn J. Pogust
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Represented By: Sina Mansouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Premcor Refining Group Inc
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Richard Lumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: David J. Lender
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Jessica L. Falk
Represented By: Jed P. Winer
Represented By: Jessica Ragosta Early
Represented By: Lisa Gerson
Represented By: Michael T. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TMR Company
Represented By: Harmon (Monty) L. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Peter Condron
Represented By: Richard E. Wallace
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Petrochemicals & Refining USA, Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Parker
Represented By: Carlton D. Wilde, III
Represented By: Christopher L. Dodson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Padwa
Represented By: Christopher H. Domingo
Represented By: Diane L. Myers
Represented By: Traci L. Lovitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Trading (US) Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Harmon (Monty) L. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Peter Condron
Represented By: Richard E. Wallace
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PDV Midwest Refining, L.L.C.
Represented By: John E. Bulman
Represented By: Stephen J. MacGillivray
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Pamela R. Hanebutt
Represented By: Susan M. Razzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulsboro Refining Company, LLC
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Richard Lumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Richard Lumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco, Inc. (R&M)
Represented By: Daniel M. Krainin
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Represented By: John S. Guttmann
Represented By: Nessa Horewitch Coppinger
Represented By: Paula J. Schauwecker
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: David J. Lender
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Jessica L. Falk
Represented By: Jed P. Winer
Represented By: Jessica Ragosta Early
Represented By: Lisa Gerson
Represented By: Michael T. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Trading (US) Company individually formerly known as Equiva Trading Company doing business as Stusco
Represented By: Harmon (Monty) L. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Peter Condron
Represented By: Richard E. Wallace
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc. formerly known as Gulf Oil Corporation doing business as Chevron Products Company doing business as Chevron Chemical Company
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Charles C. Correll, Jr.
Represented By: James J. Maher
Represented By: Jeremiah J. Anderson
Represented By: Robert M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company individually, as successor-by-merger to Conoco, Inc., and Tosco Corporation formerly known as Phillips Petroleum Company doing business as Phillips 66 Company doing business as Phillips Chemical Company doing business as Philli
Represented By: Jessica Farley
Represented By: Mary Rose Alexander
Represented By: Matthew D Thurlow
Represented By: Stephen Dillard
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Represented By: Gabriel D Kaim
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Robert G. Flanders, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company individually, as successor-by-merger to Atlantic Richfield Company (a Pennsylvania corporation), and doing business as ARCO Products Company formerly known as Atlantic Richfield Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Bradley H. Weidenhammer
Represented By: J. Andrew Langan
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Represented By: Nicole J. Benjamin
Represented By: Patricia K. Rocha
Represented By: Amanda Jacobowski
Represented By: Andrew R. Running
Represented By: Benjamin O'Connor
Represented By: Kyle M. Zambarano
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation formerly known as Exxon Corporation doing business as ExxonMobil Refining and Supply Company doing business as Exxon Chemical U.S.A formerly known as ExxonMobil Chemical Corporation
Represented By: David J. Lender
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Jessica L. Falk
Represented By: Jed P. Winer
Represented By: Jessica Ragosta Early
Represented By: Lisa Gerson
Represented By: Michael T. Maroney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products Company
Represented By: Harmon (Monty) L. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Peter Condron
Represented By: Richard E. Wallace
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Socony Vacuum Oil Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: David J. Lender
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Jessica L. Falk
Represented By: Jed P. Winer
Represented By: Jessica Ragosta Early
Represented By: Lisa Gerson
Represented By: Michael T. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Refining Company-Texas
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Richard Lumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LLC
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Represented By: Joshua B. Frank
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: David J. Lender
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Jessica L. Falk
Represented By: Jed P. Winer
Represented By: Jessica Ragosta Early
Represented By: Lisa Gerson
Represented By: Michael T. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Refining Company
Represented By: Erika M. Anderson
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: Paul M. Sanford
Represented By: Benjamin C. Caldwell
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Richard Lumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Bradley H. Weidenhammer
Represented By: J. Andrew Langan
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Represented By: Nicole J. Benjamin
Represented By: Patricia K. Rocha
Represented By: Amanda Jacobowski
Represented By: Andrew R. Running
Represented By: Benjamin O'Connor
Represented By: Kyle M. Zambarano
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derby Refining Company
Represented By: James L. Messenger
Represented By: Mark P. Dolan
Represented By: Brian J. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOTAL Petrochemicals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Parker
Represented By: Carlton D. Wilde, III
Represented By: Christopher L. Dodson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Padwa
Represented By: Christopher H. Domingo
Represented By: Diane L. Myers
Represented By: Traci L. Lovitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises LLC individually, and as successor-by-merger to Equiva Services LLC doing business as Shell Oil Products US
Represented By: Harmon (Monty) L. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Peter Condron
Represented By: Richard E. Wallace
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Petrofina Company of Texas
Represented By: Amy E. Parker
Represented By: Carlton D. Wilde, III
Represented By: Christopher L. Dodson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Padwa
Represented By: Christopher H. Domingo
Represented By: Diane L. Myers
Represented By: Traci L. Lovitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerada Hess Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Represented By: Joshua B. Frank
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: David J. Lender
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Jessica L. Falk
Represented By: Jed P. Winer
Represented By: Jessica Ragosta Early
Represented By: Lisa Gerson
Represented By: Michael T. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atofina Petrochemicals, Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Parker
Represented By: Carlton D. Wilde, III
Represented By: Christopher L. Dodson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Padwa
Represented By: Christopher H. Domingo
Represented By: Diane L. Myers
Represented By: Traci L. Lovitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Oil Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: David J. Lender
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Jessica L. Falk
Represented By: Jed P. Winer
Represented By: Jessica Ragosta Early
Represented By: Lisa Gerson
Represented By: Michael T. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Oil Corporation
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Charles C. Correll, Jr.
Represented By: James J. Maher
Represented By: Jeremiah J. Anderson
Represented By: Robert M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cities Service RMT Corporation
Represented By: John E. Bulman
Represented By: Stephen J. MacGillivray
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Pamela R. Hanebutt
Represented By: Susan M. Razzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Derby Refining Company
Represented By: James L. Messenger
Represented By: Mark P. Dolan
Represented By: Brian J. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Oil Company of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Daniel M. Krainin
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Represented By: John S. Guttmann
Represented By: Nessa Horewitch Coppinger
Represented By: Paula J. Schauwecker
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getty Oil Company (Eastern Operations), Inc.
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Robert M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USS Holdings Company
Represented By: Christopher Danley
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Represented By: Joshua B. Frank
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Refining and Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Harmon (Monty) L. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Peter Condron
Represented By: Richard E. Wallace
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Robert M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Refining and Marketing Company
Represented By: Daniel M. Krainin
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Represented By: John S. Guttmann
Represented By: Nessa Horewitch Coppinger
Represented By: Paula J. Schauwecker
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equiva Trading Company
Represented By: Harmon (Monty) L. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Peter Condron
Represented By: Richard E. Wallace
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irving Oil Corporation
Represented By: Gerald J. Petros
Represented By: James D. Herschlein
Represented By: Glenn J. Pogust
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Represented By: Sina Mansouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fina Oil and Chemical Company
Represented By: Amy E. Parker
Represented By: Carlton D. Wilde, III
Represented By: Christopher L. Dodson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Padwa
Represented By: Christopher H. Domingo
Represented By: Diane L. Myers
Represented By: Traci L. Lovitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coastal Refining & Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: James L. Messenger
Represented By: Mark P. Dolan
Represented By: Brian J. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Harmon (Monty) L. Cooper
Represented By: Matthew J. McBurney
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Peter Condron
Represented By: Richard E. Wallace
Represented By: Shanna M. Boughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Company, Inc (R&M)
Represented By: Daniel M. Krainin
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Represented By: John S. Guttmann
Represented By: Nessa Horewitch Coppinger
Represented By: Paula J. Schauwecker
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips Petroleum Company
Represented By: Jessica Farley
Represented By: Mary Rose Alexander
Represented By: Matthew D Thurlow
Represented By: Stephen Dillard
Represented By: Timothy K. Baldwin
Represented By: Gabriel D Kaim
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: Robert G. Flanders, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRMI Holdings Inc
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Robert M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Oil and Gas Corporation
Represented By: James L. Messenger
Represented By: Mark P. Dolan
Represented By: Brian J. Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Socony Mobile Oil Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Represented By: David J. Lender
Represented By: Deborah E. Barnard
Represented By: James Anthony Pardo
Represented By: Jessica L. Falk
Represented By: Jed P. Winer
Represented By: Jessica Ragosta Early
Represented By: Lisa Gerson
Represented By: Michael T. Maroney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Oil Company
Represented By: Benjamin O'Connor
Represented By: Bradley H. Weidenhammer
Represented By: J. Andrew Langan
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Represented By: Nicole J. Benjamin
Represented By: Patricia K. Rocha
Represented By: Amanda Jacobowski
Represented By: Andrew R. Running
Represented By: Kyle M. Zambarano
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getty Refining and Marketing Inc.
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Represented By: Robert M. Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amoco Oil Company
Represented By: Benjamin O'Connor
Represented By: Bradley H. Weidenhammer
Represented By: J. Andrew Langan
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Represented By: Nicole J. Benjamin
Represented By: Patricia K. Rocha
Represented By: Amanda Jacobowski
Represented By: Andrew R. Running
Represented By: Kyle M. Zambarano
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Premcor Refining Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Alison B. Hoffman
Represented By: Benjamin Krass
Represented By: Carla Burke Pickrel
Represented By: M. Cristina Sanchez
Represented By: Matthew F. Pawa
Represented By: Michael Rubin
Represented By: Neil F.X. Kelly
Represented By: Rebecca Tedford Partington
Represented By: Sean H. Lyness
Represented By: Tricia K. Jedele
Represented By: William A. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?