Summer Infant (USA), Inc. v. TOMY International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Summer Infant (USA), Inc.
Defendant: TOMY International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2017cv00549
Filed: November 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Patricia A. Sullivan
Presiding Judge: John J. McConnell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 65 Objection to Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Summer Infant's motion to amend its counterclaim is DENIED - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 8/3/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: The Court ADOPTS in its entirety the Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 54 ). TOMYs motion (ECF No. 34 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The constructions recommended by the Magistrate in the R&R at p. 21, are adopted - So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 3/31/2020. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 47 Summer Infant's Motion to Amend. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/25/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 42 MOTION to Exclude Summer Infant (USA), Inc.'s Fourth Supplemental Answers to TOMY International, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories . So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 10/24/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 34 MOTION for Claim Construction Order filed by TOMY International, Inc. I recommend that TOMYs motion (ECF No. 34) for Claim Construction Order be granted in part and denied in part. Objections to R&R due by 10/7/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 9/23/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summer Infant (USA), Inc. v. TOMY International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Infant (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Techentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOMY International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?