United States of America et al v. Claris Vision, LLC et al
Case Number: 1:2018cv00176
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 64 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Relators' Motion for Award of Reasonable Expenses, Attorneys' Fees and Costs (ECF No. 29) be GRANTED in part in the total amount of $401,994.30 29 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Michele Bisbano. Objections to R&R due by 6/20/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 6/5/2024. (Noel, Jeannine)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER adopting 54 Report and Recommendations. So Ordered by District Judge Mary S. McElroy on 2/15/2024. (Potter, Carrie)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the Relators' Motion for Award of Reasonable Expenses, Attorneys' Fees and Costs (ECF No. 29) be GRANTED, in part, solely as to the legal determination that they are entitled to an award for r easonable expenses, attorneys' fees, and costs against Dr. Koch pursuant to 31 U.S.C. § 3730(d)(1). As stated herein, the issue of reasonableness is deferred and will be the subject of a subsequent report and recommendation, if necessary, after this Recommendation is acted upon by Judge McElroy. 29 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Michele Bisbano. Objections to R&R due by 1/30/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/16/2024. (Noel, Jeannine)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER Re: 40 Motion to Compel filed by Michele Bisbano. The Relators' Motion to Compel (ECF No. 40) is provisionally GRANTED as to Requests Nos. 1 and 2 as follows: Dr. Koch shall, within seven days, advise the Court if he i s withdrawing that part of his argument regarding the claimed fee disparity. If the argument is withdrawn, the Motion to Compel shall be DENIED as moot and Dr. Koch shall promptly file amended versions of ECF Nos. 32, 32-1 and 32-2 accordingly. If the argument is not withdrawn, Dr. Koch is ORDERED to produce the requested documents within twenty-one days. To the extent that responsive documents contain privileged information, the parties shall confer in good faith about a process for Dr. Koch to redact such information from the documents subject to documentation in a privilege log. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 11/15/2023. (Noel, Jeannine)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Claris Vision, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?