Santagata v. MiniLuxe, Inc
Plaintiff: Jaimie Santagata
Defendant: MiniLuxe, Inc
Case Number: 1:2018cv00428
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Office: Providence Office
County: Providence
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE of VIDEO Hearing: VIDEO Settlement Conference set for 1/24/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond.(Zoom Meeting ID: 160 635 1498, Passcode: 059274) (Noel, Jeannine)
October 22, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge William E. Smith: Remote Calendar Call held on 10/22/2021. Stephen Fanning for plaintiff; Matthew Parker and Thomas Campbell for the defendant. (Court Reporter Karen Wischnowsky by Zoom at 9:40 a.m.) (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER extending discovery deadlines. Factual Discovery to close by 1/21/2022 and Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2022. Pretrial Memorandum due by 2/22/2022 or 30 days after a decision on any pending dispositive motion. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 10/22/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 22, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond to conduct a Settlement Conference in January 2022. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
October 12, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Hearing: Calendar Call set for 10/22/2021 at 9:30 AM by Zoom before District Judge William E. Smith.(Zoom Meeting ID: 161 556 9084, Passcode: 619811) (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Protective Order. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/21/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 16, 2021 Filing 45 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. Responses due by 9/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Parker, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying without prejudice #44 Motion to Strike or Bar Plaintiff's Late Disclosures. If parties cannot resolve a matter in good faith, they must request an informal conference with the Court before filing discovery motions. See Standard Pretrial Order 3, ECF No. #20 . So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/30/2021. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 26, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION to Strike or Bar Plaintiff's Late Disclosures filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 9/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Supplemental Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript)(Parker, Matthew)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #42 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. No Further Extensions of this Deadline will be Granted; Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines:( Factual Discovery to close by 8/30/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2021; Pretrial Memorandum due by 9/15/2021 or 30 days after a decision on any pending motion). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 7/21/2021. (Noel, Jeannine)
July 20, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #42 THIRD Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Ryan)
July 13, 2021 Filing 43 NOTICE by MiniLuxe, Inc to Withdraw Appearance of Joshua Loveall (Parker, Matthew)
June 28, 2021 Filing 42 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Jaimie Santagata. Responses due by 7/12/2021. (Fanning, Stephen)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ; Reset Deadlines: Factual Discovery to be completed by 6/28/2021; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 7/15/2021; Pretrial Memorandum due 30 days after decision on any pending motions, or if no motions are pending, by 7/15/2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 6/3/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 26, 2021 Filing 41 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. Responses due by 5/10/2021. (Parker, Matthew)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #39 Motion to Seal. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/29/2021. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas P. Campbell. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 1/12/2021. (Hicks, Alyson)
January 11, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Seal Exhibit to Motion Pro Hac Vice Filed. Notice Sent To: MiniLuxe, Inc, Jaimie Santagata. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Motion to Seal)(Parker, Matthew) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
January 11, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION for Thomas P. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1583325 ) filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. (Parker, Matthew)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #37 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. ; Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines:( Factual Discovery to close by 4/28/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 5/15/2021; Pretrial Memorandum due by 5/15/2021). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 12/22/2020. (Noel, Jeannine)
December 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #37 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 25, 2020 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Jaimie Santagata. Responses due by 12/9/2020. (Fanning, Stephen)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to be completed by 1/30/2021; Dispositive Motions to be filed by 2/15/2021; Pretrial Memorandum due 30 days after decision on any pending motions, or if no motions are pending, by 2/15/2021. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 7/31/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
May 26, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by MiniLuxe, Inc.(Parker, Matthew)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #22 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 5/11/2020. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 17, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Joshua M. Loveall to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1484199 ) filed by All Defendants. (Parker, Matthew)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joshua B. Loveall. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 3/17/2020. (Potter, Carrie)
November 12, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION Withdrawing Appearance filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. (Parker, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Gennaro D'Ambrosio to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1443626 ) filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. (Parker, Matthew)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gennaro D'Ambrosio. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/12/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery to a date to be determined 5 months from the entry of this Court's decision on the pending #22 Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/8/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 30, 2019 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. Responses due by 11/13/2019. (Parker, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by MiniLuxe, Inc of Withdrawal of Apperance of Benjamin S. Klein (Parker, Matthew)
June 5, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION re #25 Response to Motion, filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. (Parker, Matthew)
June 3, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Jonathan D. Kravitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1372240 ) filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. (Parker, Matthew)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan D. Kravitz. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 6/3/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
May 24, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Extension of Time filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. (Parker, Matthew)
May 21, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE In Opposition to #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jaimie Santagata. Replies due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Attachment A, #3 Attachment B)(Fanning, Stephen)
May 20, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jaimie Santagata. (Fanning, Stephen)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #24 Stipulation filed by Jaimie Santagata. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 5/20/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #23 Stipulation TO EXTEND TIME TO FOR PLAINTIFF TO RESPOND to #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM up to and including 5/20/19. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 4/24/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
April 15, 2019 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION re #22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jaimie Santagata. (Fanning, Stephen)
April 12, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. Responses due by 4/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Unemployment Hearing Transcript)(Parker, Matthew)
April 2, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION re #18 Amended Complaint filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. (Parker, Matthew)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDARD PRETRIAL ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 11/30/2019; Plaintiff Expert Disclosures shall be made by 9/30/2019; Defendant Expert Disclosures shall be made by 10/31/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 11/30/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2019; Pretrial Memorandum due by 12/31/2019 or 30 days after a decision on any dispositive motion. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 3/26/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
March 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond: TELEPHONIC Rule 16 Conference held on 3/26/2019 (Fanning, Parker, Klein) (Court Reporter FTR in Courtroom A at 10:11 am.) (Noel, Jeannine)
March 25, 2019 Filing 19 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Jaimie Santagata. (Fanning, Stephen)
March 22, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MiniLuxe, Inc, filed by Jaimie Santagata.(Fanning, Stephen)
March 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 3/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Noel, Jeannine)
March 14, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond to conduct a Rule 16 Conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 4, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY: Mediation proceedings held before Court-Appointed Mediator on 3/4/2019. (Mitchell, Berry)
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION re Motion Hearing,, filed by Jaimie Santagata. (Fanning, Stephen)
February 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING: Mediation set for 3/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Room 521 with Court-Appointed Mediator. (Mitchell, Berry)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER entered referring case to Mediation pursuant to this Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan to be scheduled before 2/15/19. Information about the Plan can be found by clicking #here. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/17/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER DENYING as Moot without Prejudice #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; DENYING as Moot without Prejudice #9 Motion to Amend/Correct. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/3/2019. (Jackson, Kerrie)
January 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2019 re #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct and #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Stephen T. Fanning for the Plaintiff. Benjamin S. Klein for the Defendant. Court addresses. Counsel address Motions. Court denies motions as moot w/o prejudice and allows 45 days for the filing of an amended complaint. During that time, a settlement conference will be scheduled. (Court Reporter Denise Veitch in Courtroom 3 at 2:10.) (Jackson, Kerrie)
November 19, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct and #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: Motion Hearing scheduled for Thursday 1/3/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY to Response re #11 Response to Motion filed by Jaimie Santagata. (Fanning, Stephen)
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE In Opposition to #9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Response to Motion filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. Replies due by 10/1/2018. (Parker, Matthew)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to Response re #8 Response to Motion filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. (Parker, Matthew)
September 10, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Jaimie Santagata. Responses due by 9/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Fanning, Stephen) Modified on 9/12/2018: edited document association (Jackson, Ryan).
September 10, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jaimie Santagata. Replies due by 9/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Fanning, Stephen)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MiniLuxe, Inc. (Parker, Matthew)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. Responses due by 9/10/2018. (Parker, Matthew)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #4 Stipulation filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/21/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 21, 2018 Reset Deadlines: MiniLuxe, Inc answer due 8/27/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Benjamin S. Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1249747 ) filed by All Defendants. (Parker, Matthew)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin S. Klein. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 8/14/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. (Parker, Matthew)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-4978. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1247443, filed by MiniLuxe, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal State Court, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parker, Matthew)
August 6, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santagata v. MiniLuxe, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaimie Santagata
Represented By: Stephen T. Fanning
Represented By: Brie G. Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MiniLuxe, Inc
Represented By: Matthew H. Parker
Represented By: Benjamin S. Klein
Represented By: Gennaro D'Ambrosio
Represented By: Jonathan D. Kravitz
Represented By: Joshua B. Loveall
Represented By: Thomas P. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?