Walco Electric, Inc. v. Martinho

Plaintiff: Walco Electric, Inc.
Defendant: Jill Martinho
Case Number: 1:2018cv00475
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Stay matter for 60 days or up to and including 12/3/18. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/3/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 3, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference scheduled for Wednesday 12/19/2018 at 9:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Stay (Joint Motion for Entry of Stay) filed by Jill Martinho. Responses due by 10/15/2018. (Tamuleviz, Charles)
September 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: In Chambers Conference held on 9/28/2018; counsel present: R. Corrente, C. Dawson; C. Tamuleviz. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 21, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: In Chambers Conference scheduled for Friday 9/28/2018 at 9:30 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Walco Electric, Inc. of Filing Summons Evidencing Proof of Service of Process (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Corrente, Robert)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 28, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-5608. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1257110, filed by Jill Martinho. (Attachments: #1 Complaint in case being removed, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Additional exhibits to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wynne, William)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 28, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Simoncelli, Michael)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-5608. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1257110, filed by Jill Martinho. (Attachments: #1 Complaint in case being removed, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Additional exhibits to Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wynne, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walco Electric, Inc. v. Martinho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Martinho
Represented By: Charles A. Tamuleviz
Represented By: William H. Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walco Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher N. Dawson
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?