Maricelys S. v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Maricelys Santiago Rodriguez
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2018cv00479
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh Dun Rappaport on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Dun Rappaport, Hugh)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Maricelys Santiago Rodriguez All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 certified mail card)(Bath, Gretchen)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Maricelys Santiago Rodriguez All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit certified mail card)(Bath, Gretchen)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Maricelys Santiago Rodriguez for affidavit of service us All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit certified mail receipt)(Bath, Gretchen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Maricelys Santiago Rodriguez Social Security Administration served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Bath, Gretchen)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Jackson, Kerrie)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Maricelys Santiago Rodriguez. (Bath, Gretchen)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 9/7/2018. (Saucier, Martha)
September 6, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
August 29, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Maricelys Santiago Rodriguez. (Bath, Gretchen)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Maricelys Santiago Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement summons)(Bath, Gretchen)
August 29, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Maricelys Santiago Rodriguez. (Bath, Gretchen)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Maricelys Santiago Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement summons)(Bath, Gretchen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maricelys S. v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maricelys Santiago Rodriguez
Represented By: Gretchen M. Bath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Hugh Dun Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?