Laccinole v. ADT LLC d/b/a ADT Security Systems

Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Defendant: ADT LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00481
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Stay filed by Christopher Laccinole. Replies due by 11/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Further Support of Defendant's Motion to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Stay)(Blynn, Daniel)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by ADT LLC in support of #11 MOTION to Stay . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Cameron Declaration, #5 Exhibit Godbee Declaration, #6 Exhibit Blynn Declaration)(Shindell, Robert)
October 9, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay filed by ADT LLC. Responses due by 10/23/2018. (Shindell, Robert)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Remand to State Court - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/4/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE In Opposition to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ADT LLC. Replies due by 9/28/2018. (Shindell, Robert)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Christopher Laccinole. Responses due by 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Potter, Carrie)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel S. Blynn. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/6/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth C. Rinehart. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/6/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Daniel S. Blynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1259898 ) filed by ADT LLC. (Shindell, Robert)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Elizabeth C. Rinehart to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1259894 ) filed by ADT LLC. (Shindell, Robert)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by ADT LLC.(Shindell, Robert)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADT LLC. (Shindell, Robert)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 30, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2018-0369. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1258026, filed by ADT LLC d/b/a ADT Security Systems. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shindell, Robert)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 30, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Superior Court, Case Number WC-2018-0369. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1258026, filed by ADT LLC d/b/a ADT Security Systems. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shindell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laccinole v. ADT LLC d/b/a ADT Security Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADT LLC
Represented By: Robert C. Shindell
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Rinehart
Represented By: Daniel S. Blynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Laccinole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?