FGX International Inc. v. Icon Eyewear, Inc.

Plaintiff: FGX International Inc.
Defendant: Icon Eyewear, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00483
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: Lincoln D Almond
1 Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Nicole Gage. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/15/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Nicole Gage to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1272921 ) filed by FGX International Inc.. (Raux, Geoffrey)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FGX International Inc.. Icon Eyewear, Inc. waiver sent on 8/31/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. (Raux, Geoffrey)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 AO FORM 120: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Potter, Carrie)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Icon Eyewear, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 31, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FGX International Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FGX International II Ltd. for FGX International Inc... (Raux, Geoffrey)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1258462 ), filed by FGX International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Raux, Geoffrey)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 AO FORM 120: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Potter, Carrie)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Icon Eyewear, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 31, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FGX International Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FGX International II Ltd. for FGX International Inc... (Raux, Geoffrey)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1258462 ), filed by FGX International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Raux, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FGX International Inc. v. Icon Eyewear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icon Eyewear, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FGX International Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Raux
Represented By: Nicole Gage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?