Bradley v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Raymond Bradley
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00484
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #8 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 11/16/2018- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/25/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Magratten, Brooks)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Raymond Bradley. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 9/6/2018, answer due 10/31/2018. (Kilpatrick, J.)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #6 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 10/31/2018 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/20/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Magratten, Brooks)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Corporate Parent Cigna Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation for Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Magratten, Brooks)
September 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks R. Magratten on behalf of Life Insurance Company of North America (Magratten, Brooks)
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Potter, Carrie)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
August 31, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie) Modified on 9/5/2018 (Potter, Carrie).
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1258690 ), filed by Raymond Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Kilpatrick, J.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1258690 ), filed by Raymond Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Kilpatrick, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Brooks R. Magratten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Bradley
Represented By: J. Scott Kilpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?