Moison v. Parkside Utility Construction Corp. et al
Plaintiff: William Moison
Defendant: Parkside Utility Construction Corp. and Parkside Utility Construction, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00493
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER entered referring case to Mediation pursuant to this Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution Plan. Information about the Plan can be found by clicking #here - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/2/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 5/2/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 6/3/2019; Defendants' Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/2/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 8/2/2019 and Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 9/3/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/2/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
November 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 11/2/2018; Stephen T. Fanning and Stephen T. Melnick participated (Barletta, Barbara)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 16 STATEMENT filed by Parkside Utility Construction Corp., Parkside Utility Construction, LLC (Melnick, Stephen) Modified on 11/2/2018 to correct event (Barletta, Barbara).
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by William Moison. (Fanning, Stephen)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Friday, 11/2/2018 at 09:15 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Parkside Utility Construction Corp., Parkside Utility Construction, LLC.(Melnick, Stephen)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time ; Reset Deadlines: Parkside Utility Construction, LLC answer due 10/3/2018. - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/11/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to October 3, 2018 filed by Parkside Utility Construction, LLC. Responses due by 9/24/2018. (Melnick, Stephen)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parkside Utility Construction Corp., Parkside Utility Construction, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dycom Industries, Inc., Corporate Parent Dycom Investments, Inc. for Parkside Utility Construction, LLC.. (Melnick, Stephen)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parkside Utility Construction Corp., Parkside Utility Construction, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dycom Industries, Inc., Corporate Parent Dycom Investments, Inc. for Parkside Utility Construction, LLC.. (Melnick, Stephen)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-5606. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1259651, filed by Parkside Utility Construction Corp., Parkside Utility Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melnick, Stephen)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-5606. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1259651, filed by Parkside Utility Construction Corp., Parkside Utility Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melnick, Stephen)
September 5, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
September 5, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moison v. Parkside Utility Construction Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkside Utility Construction Corp.
Represented By: Stephen T Melnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkside Utility Construction, LLC
Represented By: Stephen T Melnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Moison
Represented By: Stephen T. Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?