Henry Salazar v. Selene Finance, LP et al
Plaintiff: Henry Salazar
Defendant: Pedro Taveras, Selene Finance, LP and U.S. Bank National Association As Legal Title Trustee for BCAT 2016-18TT
Case Number: 1:2018cv00495
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to November 1, 2018 filed by Henry Salazar. Responses due by 10/31/2018. (Ennis, John)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for an Extension of Time to Serve Summons to October 15, 2018 filed by Henry Salazar. Responses due by 10/9/2018. (Ennis, John)
September 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Selene Finance, LP, U.S. Bank National Association As Legal Title Trustee for BCAT 2016-18TT. Responses due by 9/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum)(Tieger, Ethan)
September 13, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Attachments: #1 2 of 5, #2 3 of 5, #3 4 of 5, #4 5 of 5)(Potter, Carrie)
September 7, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selene Finance, LP identifying Corporate Parent Selene Ventures LLC, Corporate Parent Selene Ventures GP LLC, Corporate Parent Selene Holdings LLC for Selene Finance, LP.. (Tieger, Ethan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank National Association As Legal Title Trustee for BCAT 2016-18TT identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp for U.S. Bank National Association As Legal Title Trustee for BCAT 2016-18TT.. (Tieger, Ethan)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 7, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-4561. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1260354, filed by Selene Finance, LP, U.S. Bank National Association As Legal Title Trustee for BCAT 2016-18TT. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A (part 1), #4 Exhibit A (part 2), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tieger, Ethan)
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-4561. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1260354, filed by Selene Finance, LP, U.S. Bank National Association As Legal Title Trustee for BCAT 2016-18TT. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A (part 1), #4 Exhibit A (part 2), #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tieger, Ethan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry Salazar v. Selene Finance, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Salazar
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Taveras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance, LP
Represented By: Ethan Z. Tieger
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association As Legal Title Trustee for BCAT 2016-18TT
Represented By: Ethan Z. Tieger
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?