Sullivan v. Neighborhood Health Plan of Rhode Island
Plaintiff: James Sullivan
Defendant: Neighborhood Health Plan of Rhode Island
Case Number: 1:2018cv00507
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 5/1/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 5/31/2019; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/1/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 8/1/2019 and Dispositive Motions to be filed by 9/3/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/1/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
November 1, 2018 HEARING CANCELLED: The Telephonic Rule 16 Conference scheduled for Friday, 11/2/18 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. is cancelled (Barletta, Barbara)
October 31, 2018 Filing 12 RULE 16 STATEMENT by James Sullivan. (Enright, Thomas)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Enright, Thomas)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 RULE 16 STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT by Neighborhood Health Plan of Rhode Island. (Pagliarini, Thomas)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Friday, 11/2/2018 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina L. Lewis on behalf of Neighborhood Health Plan of Rhode Island (Lewis, Christina)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Neighborhood Health Plan of Rhode Island. (Pagliarini, Thomas)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint by Neighborhood Health Plan of Rhode Island.(Pagliarini, Thomas)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Counts III, IV and V filed by James Sullivan - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 10/4/2018 (Barletta, Barbara)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by James Sullivan (Enright, Thomas)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Sullivan. Neighborhood Health Plan of Rhode Island served on 9/13/2018, answer due 10/4/2018. (Enright, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Neighborhood Health Plan of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1262516 ), filed by James Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Enright, Thomas)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Neighborhood Health Plan of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1262516 ), filed by James Sullivan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Enright, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Neighborhood Health Plan of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas J Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neighborhood Health Plan of Rhode Island
Represented By: Christina L. Lewis
Represented By: Thomas J. Pagliarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?