Watterson v. Consumer Reports, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert Watterson
Defendant: Consumer Reports, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00513
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting (11) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint up to and including 11/30/18 (and approving briefing schedule for responses and replies to any filed Motion to Dismiss) in case 1:18-cv-00513-WES-PAS; granting (7) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint up to and including 11/30/18 (and approving briefing schedule for responses and replies to any filed Motion to Dismiss) in case 1:18-cv-00520-WES-PAS. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/7/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kristen C. Rodriguez. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/31/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Natalie J. Spears. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/31/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Stipulated Briefing Schedule filed by Consumer Reports, Inc.. Responses due by 11/14/2018. (Gantz, William)
October 31, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Kristen C. Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1282124 ) filed by Consumer Reports, Inc.. (Gantz, William)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Natalie J. Spears to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1282120 ) filed by Consumer Reports, Inc.. (Gantz, William)
October 12, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Consumer Reports, Inc. answer due 11/7/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #6 Stipulation filed by Consumer Reports, Inc.. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/12/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Joseph I Marchese. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/27/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Philip L. Fraietta. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 9/27/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Joseph I. Marchese to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1266674 ) filed by Robert Watterson. (Wasylyk, Peter)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Philip L. Fraietta to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1266673 ) filed by Robert Watterson. (Wasylyk, Peter)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION for extension of time for defendant to answer, move, or otherwise plead to the complaint filed by Consumer Reports, Inc.. (Gantz, William)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Gantz on behalf of Consumer Reports, Inc. (Gantz, William)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Watterson. Consumer Reports, Inc. served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Wasylyk, Peter)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Consumer Reports, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1262749 ), filed by Robert Watterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Wasylyk, Peter)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Consumer Reports, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1262749 ), filed by Robert Watterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Wasylyk, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watterson v. Consumer Reports, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Reports, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie J. Spears
Represented By: Kristen C. Rodriguez
Represented By: William M. Gantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Watterson
Represented By: Peter N. Wasylyk
Represented By: Joseph I Marchese
Represented By: Philip L. Fraietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?