Watterson v. Trusted Media Brands, Inc.

Plaintiff: Robert Watterson
Defendant: Trusted Media Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00520
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: Rhode Island District Court
0 Judge: William E Smith
1 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting (11) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint up to and including 11/30/18 (and approving briefing schedule for responses and replies to any filed Motion to Dismiss) in case 1:18-cv-00513-WES-PAS; granting (7) Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint up to and including 11/30/18 (and approving briefing schedule for responses and replies to any filed Motion to Dismiss) in case 1:18-cv-00520-WES-PAS. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/7/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kristen C. Rodriguez. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/31/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Natalie J. Spears. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/31/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 31, 2018 7 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Stipulated Briefing Schedule filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc.. Responses due by 11/14/2018. (Gantz, William)
October 31, 2018 6 MOTION for Kristen C. Rodriguez to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1282109 ) filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc.. (Gantz, William)
October 31, 2018 5 MOTION for Natalie J. Spears to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1282098 ) filed by Trusted Media Brands, Inc.. (Gantz, William)
October 31, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Gantz on behalf of Trusted Media Brands, Inc. (Gantz, William)
October 12, 2018 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED Since Chief Judge William E. Smith has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 18-513 this case is permanently assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith for all further proceedings (Jackson, Ryan)
September 18, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Trusted Media Brands, Inc. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 18, 2018 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 18, 2018 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number CA18-513-WES-PAS based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
September 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1263770 ), filed by Robert Watterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Wasylyk, Peter)
September 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1263770 ), filed by Robert Watterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons)(Wasylyk, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watterson v. Trusted Media Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trusted Media Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie J. Spears
Represented By: William M. Gantz
Represented By: Kristen C. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Watterson
Represented By: Peter N. Wasylyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?