Little Kids, Inc. v. 18th Avenue Toys, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Little Kids, Inc.
Defendant: 18th Avenue Toys, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00533
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: The #12 Motion for TRO is GRANTED. The TRO presently in effect shall be extended up to and including November 21, 2018 or until further order of the Court - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/14/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 8, 2018 Filing 12 Assented MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (to Extend Current TRO) filed by Little Kids, Inc.. (Emanuel, Douglas)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Assented Motion for TRO to Extend Current TRO: The TRO presently in effect shall be extended until November 9, 2018 or until further order of the Court. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/26/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 25, 2018 Filing 11 Assented MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (to Extend Current TRO) filed by Little Kids, Inc.. (Emanuel, Douglas)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for TRO. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 E-mail) (Jackson, Kerrie)
October 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Motion Hearing held on 10/18/2018 re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Little Kids, Inc.. Court addresses. Plaintiff addresses Motion. For reasons stated in today's hearing, Court grants motion. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam in Courtroom 3 at 3:04.) (Jackson, Kerrie)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Little Kids, Inc.. (Fine, Robert)
October 5, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Motion Hearing re: Temporary Restraining Order request made within #1 Complaint scheduled for Thursday 10/18/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Little Kids, Inc. for complaint and summons on defendant All Plaintiffs. (Fine, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 AO FORM 120: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to 18th Avenue Toys, Ltd.. (Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Little Kids, Inc.. (Fine, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Little Kids, Inc.. (Fine, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Little Kids, Inc.. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (Fine, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1266350 ), filed by Little Kids, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through G)(Fine, Robert) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/25/2018) (Potter, Carrie). (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/25/2018) (Potter, Carrie).
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 AO FORM 120: REPORT on Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to 18th Avenue Toys, Ltd.. (Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Little Kids, Inc.. (Fine, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Little Kids, Inc.. (Fine, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Little Kids, Inc.. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (Fine, Robert)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1266350 ), filed by Little Kids, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A through G)(Fine, Robert) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/25/2018) (Potter, Carrie). (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/25/2018) (Potter, Carrie).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little Kids, Inc. v. 18th Avenue Toys, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Kids, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Fine
Represented By: Douglas J. Emanuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18th Avenue Toys, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?