The Hilb Group, LLC et al v. Rabinowitz
Plaintiff: The Hilb Group, LLC and The Hilb Group of New England, LLC
Defendant: Baruch Rabinowitz
Case Number: 1:2018cv00555
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE In Opposition to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by The Hilb Group of New England, LLC, The Hilb Group, LLC. Replies due by 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gamboli, Michael)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to Extend Time filed by The Hilb Group of New England, LLC, The Hilb Group, LLC. (Gamboli, Michael)
November 6, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Gardner H. Palmer, Jr. on behalf of Baruch Rabinowitz (Palmer, Gardner)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth P. Redpath. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/5/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Elizabeth P. Redpath to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1283532 ) filed by The Hilb Group of New England, LLC, The Hilb Group, LLC. (Gamboli, Michael)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Rodney A. Satterwhite. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/5/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Rodney A. Satterwhite to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1283511 ) filed by The Hilb Group of New England, LLC, The Hilb Group, LLC. (Gamboli, Michael)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Baruch Rabinowitz. Amended Certificate of Service. (DiOrio, Joseph)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jacob Zelmanovitz. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/5/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Menachem O. Zelmanovitz. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/5/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 2, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Jacob Zelmanovitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1283013 ) filed by Baruch Rabinowitz. (DiOrio, Joseph)
November 2, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Menachem O. Zelmanovitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1283010 ) filed by Baruch Rabinowitz. (DiOrio, Joseph)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Baruch Rabinowitz. (DiOrio, Joseph)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Baruch Rabinowitz. Responses due by 11/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit)(DiOrio, Joseph)
October 17, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by The Hilb Group, LLC, The Hilb Group of New England, LLC against Baruch Rabinowitz served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Gamboli, Michael)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Baruch Rabinowitz. (Potter, Carrie)
October 9, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Hilb Group of New England, LLC, The Hilb Group, LLC. (Gamboli, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1270821 ), filed by The Hilb Group, LLC, The Hilb Group of New England, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gamboli, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Hilb Group of New England, LLC, The Hilb Group, LLC. (Gamboli, Michael)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1270821 ), filed by The Hilb Group, LLC, The Hilb Group of New England, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gamboli, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Hilb Group, LLC et al v. Rabinowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hilb Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Gamboli
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Redpath
Represented By: Rodney A. Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hilb Group of New England, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Gamboli
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Redpath
Represented By: Rodney A. Satterwhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baruch Rabinowitz
Represented By: Gardner H. Palmer, Jr.
Represented By: Menachem O. Zelmanovitz
Represented By: Jacob Zelmanovitz
Represented By: Joseph M. DiOrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?