Travers v. Cotiviti, LLC

Plaintiff: Brian Travers
Defendant: Cotiviti, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00562
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Cotiviti, LLC.(Mack, Eric)
November 5, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Cotiviti, LLC answer due 12/13/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond filed by Cotiviti, LLC. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/5/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Cotiviti, LLC. (Mack, Eric)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Mack on behalf of Cotiviti, LLC (Mack, Eric)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Doran, Jr. on behalf of Cotiviti, LLC (Doran, John)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Travers. Cotiviti, LLC served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Formisano, V.)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Cotiviti, LLC. (Jackson, Kerrie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Brian Travers. (Formisano, V.)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 11, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1272186 ), filed by Brian Travers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 11, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1272186 ), filed by Brian Travers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Formisano, V.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travers v. Cotiviti, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cotiviti, LLC
Represented By: Eric B. Mack
Represented By: John D. Doran, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Travers
Represented By: Nicole J. Policastro
Represented By: V. Edward Formisano
Represented By: Michael D. Pushee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?