Weick v. Priderock Management, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Debra Weick
Defendant: Priderock Management, LLC and Priderock Capital Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00569
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to be completed by 5/28/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be completed by 6/27/2019; Defendants' Expert Disclosures shall be completed by 7/29/2019; Expert Discovery to be completed by 8/28/2019 and Dispostive Motions shall be filed by 9/27/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/28/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 11/28/2018: Sonja L. Deyoe and Anthony J. DiOrio participated. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Defendants. (DiOrio, Anthony)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Debra Weick. (Deyoe, Sonja)
October 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Wednesday, 11/28/2018 at 09:30 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Priderock Capital Management, LLC, Priderock Management, LLC. (DiOrio, Anthony)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Priderock Capital Management, LLC, Priderock Management, LLC.(DiOrio, Anthony)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 15, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-6676. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1273264, filed by Priderock Capital Management, LLC, Priderock Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(DiOrio, Anthony)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 15, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-6676. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1273264, filed by Priderock Capital Management, LLC, Priderock Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(DiOrio, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weick v. Priderock Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Weick
Represented By: Sonja L. Deyoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priderock Management, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. DiOrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priderock Capital Management, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. DiOrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?