Avco Corporation v. Quality Aluminum Forge, LLC
Plaintiff: Avco Corporation
Defendant: Quality Aluminum Forge, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00576
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Quality Aluminum Forge, LLC answer due 12/19/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #7 Stipulation for Extension of Time filed by Quality Aluminum Forge, LLC. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/27/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Avco Corporation for Summons and Complaint Quality Aluminum Forge, LLC served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parks, Joshua)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine E. Dieter on behalf of Quality Aluminum Forge, LLC (Dieter, Christine)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 Assented STIPULATION for Extension of Time filed by Quality Aluminum Forge, LLC. (Wollin, David)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Wollin on behalf of Quality Aluminum Forge, LLC (Wollin, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Quality Aluminum Forge, LLC. (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Parks on behalf of Avco Corporation (Parks, Joshua)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avco Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Textron Inc. for Avco Corporation.. (Totten, R.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1275657 ), filed by Avco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Totten, R.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua S. Parks on behalf of Avco Corporation (Parks, Joshua)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Avco Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Textron Inc. for Avco Corporation.. (Totten, R.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1275657 ), filed by Avco Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Totten, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avco Corporation v. Quality Aluminum Forge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Aluminum Forge, LLC
Represented By: Christine E. Dieter
Represented By: David A. Wollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avco Corporation
Represented By: Joshua S. Parks
Represented By: R. Bart Totten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?