Vita v. Caremark Rx, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Kristin Vita
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health LLC, CaremarkPCS LLC, Caremark Rx, LLC and Caremark, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00579
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert A. Izard. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/16/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 16, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Robert A. Izard to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1288625 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Greene, Vincent)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ronen Sarraf. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/14/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mathew P. Jasinski. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/14/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Ronen Sarraf to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1287075 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Greene, Vincent)
November 13, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Mathew P. Jasinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1287072 ) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Greene, Vincent)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Grant Andrew Geyerman. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/13/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Enu A. Mainigi. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/13/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
November 13, 2018 Reset Deadlines: Caremark Rx, LLC answer due 1/14/2019; Caremark, LLC answer due 1/14/2019; CaremarkPCS Health LLC answer due 1/14/2019; CaremarkPCS LLC answer due 1/14/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Caremark Rx, LLC, CaremarkPCS Health LLC, CaremarkPCS LLC, Caremark, LLC. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/13/2018. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Grant Geyerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1286473 ) filed by All Defendants. (Corrente, Robert)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Enu Mainigi to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1286471 ) filed by All Defendants. (Corrente, Robert)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Clark Corrente on behalf of Caremark Rx, LLC, Caremark, LLC, CaremarkPCS Health LLC, CaremarkPCS LLC (Corrente, Robert)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Caremark Rx, LLC, Caremark, LLC, CaremarkPCS Health LLC, CaremarkPCS LLC. (Corrente, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Kristin Vita CaremarkPCS Health LLC served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Greene, Vincent)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Kristin Vita for complaint CaremarkPCS LLC served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Greene, Vincent)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Kristin Vita for complaint Caremark Rx, LLC served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Greene, Vincent)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Kristin Vita for complaint Caremark, LLC served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Greene, Vincent)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Caremark Rx, LLC, Caremark, LLC, CaremarkPCS Health LLC, CaremarkPCS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 23, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1277004 ), filed by Kristin Vita. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons Caremark RX, #3 Supplement Summons Caremark, #4 Supplement Summons CaremarkPCS Health, #5 Supplement CaremarkPCS)(Greene, Vincent)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1277004 ), filed by Kristin Vita. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons Caremark RX, #3 Supplement Summons Caremark, #4 Supplement Summons CaremarkPCS Health, #5 Supplement CaremarkPCS)(Greene, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vita v. Caremark Rx, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health LLC
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Enu A. Mainigi
Represented By: Grant Andrew Geyerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS LLC
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Enu A. Mainigi
Represented By: Grant Andrew Geyerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, LLC
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Enu A. Mainigi
Represented By: Grant Andrew Geyerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, LLC
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Represented By: Enu A. Mainigi
Represented By: Grant Andrew Geyerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Vita
Represented By: Vincent L. Greene, IV
Represented By: Robert A. Izard
Represented By: Mathew P. Jasinski
Represented By: Ronen Sarraf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?