D'Ambruoso v. State of Rhode Island
Petitioner: Peter M. D'Ambruoso
Respondent: State of Rhode Island
Case Number: 1:2018cv00582
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM WITH SUPPORTING MEMO filed by State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 12/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum Memo in support of motion to dismiss, #2 Exhibit Superior Court docket P2-2008-3803A), #3 Exhibit Judgment of Conviction (entered 5/12/2010), #4 Exhibit Defendant's memorandum of law, #5 Exhibit Judgment of conviction (entered 6/14/2017), #6 Exhibit Defendant's Motion to vacate sentence, #7 Exhibit Criminal Case Action Sheets, #8 Exhibit RI S.Ct. Petition 18-12-MP, #9 Exhibit RI S.Ct. Order entered 9/24/2018, #10 Exhibit Defendant's Supplemental Memorandum of Law)(Zurier, Lauren)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Sandler Zurier on behalf of State of Rhode Island (Zurier, Lauren)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER entered directing the State of Rhode Island to respond to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Peter M. D'Ambruoso. State of Rhode Island Response due by 12/20/2018. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 11/20/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Peter M. D'Ambruoso. Regarding New Case: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from Peter D'Ambruoso (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (Potter, Carrie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14670021432 (Potter, Carrie)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the petitioner to pay the habeas corpus filing fee in the amount of $5.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 11/13/2018. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/23/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 23, 2018 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day.. Civil Cover Sheet mailed on 10/23/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Peter M. D'Ambruoso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the petitioner to pay the habeas corpus filing fee in the amount of $5.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 11/13/2018. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 10/23/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 23, 2018 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. This case has been electronically filed and processed, however, after a quality control review the following deficiencies were found: Civil Cover Sheet not attached. The filer is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet within one day.. Civil Cover Sheet mailed on 10/23/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Peter M. D'Ambruoso. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Ambruoso v. State of Rhode Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter M. D'Ambruoso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Aaron L. Weisman
Represented By: Lauren Sandler Zurier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?