Noel4Travel, LLC v. The Travel Connection, LLC
Plaintiff: Noel4Travel, LLC
Defendant: The Travel Connection, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00584
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Noel4Travel, LLC (Weiner, Harris)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by The Travel Connection, LLC.(Brouillard, Stephen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Travel Connection, LLC. (Brouillard, Stephen)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Brouillard on behalf of The Travel Connection, LLC (Brouillard, Stephen)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Noel4Travel, LLC. The Travel Connection, LLC served on 11/6/2018, answer due 11/27/2018. (Weiner, Harris)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Travel Connection, LLC. (Potter, Carrie)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 24, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1278672 ), filed by Noel4Travel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit summons)(Weiner, Harris)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1278672 ), filed by Noel4Travel, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit summons)(Weiner, Harris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noel4Travel, LLC v. The Travel Connection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travel Connection, LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Brouillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel4Travel, LLC
Represented By: Harris K. Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?