Core & Main LP v. Lindon Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Core & Main LP
Defendant: Lindon Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00593
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint [Further Extension of Time to Answer or Respond] filed by Lindon Group, Inc.. (Gainor, Ryan)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #7 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Lindon Group, Inc. answer due 12/27/2018- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/26/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint filed by Lindon Group, Inc.. (Gainor, Ryan)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan M. Gainor on behalf of Lindon Group, Inc. (Gainor, Ryan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Core & Main LP (Orenstein, Scott)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Core & Main LP (Orenstein, Scott)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lindon Group, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 26, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1280154 ), filed by Core & Main LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Orenstein, Scott)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lindon Group, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
October 26, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1280154 ), filed by Core & Main LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Orenstein, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Core & Main LP v. Lindon Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Core & Main LP
Represented By: Scott S. Orenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindon Group, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan M. Gainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?