Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Pension Fund, et al v. Cherokee Construction, Inc.

Plaintiff: Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Pension Fund, Plasterers and Cement Masons' Local 40 Health and Welfare Fund, Valerie Campana, Plasterers and Cement Masons' Local 40 Apprenticeship Fund and Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Annuity Fund
Defendant: Cherokee Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00612
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Thursday, 1/17/2019 at 09:00 a.m. before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Cherokee Construction, Inc..(Gagliardi, Mark)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Gagliardi on behalf of Cherokee Construction, Inc. (Gagliardi, Mark)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plasterers and Cement Masons' Local 40 Apprenticeship Fund, Plasterers and Cement Masons' Local 40 Health and Welfare Fund, Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Pension Fund, Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Pension Fund, Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Annuity Fund, Valerie Campana. Cherokee Construction, Inc. served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Wiens, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cherokee Construction, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 8, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1285056 ), filed by Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Pension Fund, through its Trustees, Plasterers and Cement Masons' Local 40 Apprenticeship Fund, through its Trustees, Plasterers and Cement Masons' Local 40 Health and Welfare Fund, through its Trustees, Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Annuity Fund, through its Trustees, Valerie Campana, in her official capacity as Administrator of the Funds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wiens, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cherokee Construction, Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 8, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1285056 ), filed by Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Pension Fund, through its Trustees, Plasterers and Cement Masons' Local 40 Apprenticeship Fund, through its Trustees, Plasterers and Cement Masons' Local 40 Health and Welfare Fund, through its Trustees, Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Annuity Fund, through its Trustees, Valerie Campana, in her official capacity as Administrator of the Funds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wiens, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Pension Fund, et al v. Cherokee Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Pension Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plasterers and Cement Masons' Local 40 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Campana
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plasterers and Cement Masons' Local 40 Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Annuity Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Mark P. Gagliardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?