Plasters' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Annuity Fund et al v. F.C. Construction Corporation

Plaintiff: Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Pension Fund, Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local Annunity Fund, Plasters' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Health and Welfare Fund, Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Apprenticeship Fund and Valerie Campana
Defendant: F.C. Construction Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00614
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to F.C. Construction Corporation (Potter, Carrie)
December 6, 2018 DOCKET NOTE: Regarding: #5 MOTION for Default Judgment as to . Application for Clerk's Entry of Default incorrectly filed as a motion. The document was refiled as #6 Clerk's Application for Clerk's Entry of Default. (Simoncelli, Michael)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by All Plaintiffs as to F.C. Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Wiens, Elizabeth)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Wiens, Elizabeth)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Pension Fund, Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Apprenticeship Fund, Plasters' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Health and Welfare Fund, Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local Annunity Fund, Valerie Campana. F.C. Construction Corporation served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Wiens, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to F.C. Construction Corporation. (Potter, Carrie)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 9, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1285628 ), filed by PLASTERERS' AND CEMENT MASONS' LOCAL 40 ANNUITY FUND, through its TRUSTEES, VALERIE CAMPANA, in her official capacity as Administrator of the Funds, PLASTERERS' AND CEMENT MASONS' LOCAL 40 APPRENTICESHIP FUND, through its TRUSTEES, PLASTERERS' AND CEMENT MASONS' LOCAL 40 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, through is TRUSTEES, PLASTERERS' AND CEMENT MASONS' LOCAL 40 PENSION FUND, through its TRUSTEES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wiens, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to F.C. Construction Corporation. (Potter, Carrie)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 9, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1285628 ), filed by PLASTERERS' AND CEMENT MASONS' LOCAL 40 ANNUITY FUND, through its TRUSTEES, VALERIE CAMPANA, in her official capacity as Administrator of the Funds, PLASTERERS' AND CEMENT MASONS' LOCAL 40 APPRENTICESHIP FUND, through its TRUSTEES, PLASTERERS' AND CEMENT MASONS' LOCAL 40 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, through is TRUSTEES, PLASTERERS' AND CEMENT MASONS' LOCAL 40 PENSION FUND, through its TRUSTEES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wiens, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plasters' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Annuity Fund et al v. F.C. Construction Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Pension Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local Annunity Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plasters' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plasterers' and Cement Masons' Local 40 Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Campana
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wiens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.C. Construction Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?