Ramirez v. Bank of America et al
Plaintiff: Judith Ramirez
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Bank of America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00624
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 HEARING CANCELLED - TELEPHONIC Rule 16 Conference CANCELLED for 1/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Noel, Jeannine)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Joint MOTION to Remove Rule 16 Conference re: #6 Notice of Hearing. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond on 1/3/2019. (Noel, Jeannine)
December 31, 2018 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Remove Rule 16 Conference re: #6 Notice of Hearing, filed by Bank of America, Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 1/14/2019. (Pogue, Mark)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Noel, Jeannine)
December 17, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond to conduct a Rule 16 Conference. (Jackson, Ryan)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Bank of America, Bank of America, N.A..(Kohm, Katharine)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 14, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A... (Kohm, Katharine)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-5041. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1287107, filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed in the case being removed, #2 Notice of Filing - State, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kohm, Katharine)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A... (Kohm, Katharine)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-5041. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1287107, filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint filed in the case being removed, #2 Notice of Filing - State, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kohm, Katharine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Bank of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Katharine E. Kohm
Represented By: Mark A. Pogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Katharine E. Kohm
Represented By: Mark A. Pogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Ramirez
Represented By: Stephen T. Fanning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?