McCarthy v. Roger Williams Park Botanical Center et al

Plaintiff: Matthew McCarthy
Defendant: Roger Williams Park Botanical Center and City of Providence
Case Number: 1:2018cv00627
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: Rhode Island District Court
0 Judge: John J McConnell
1 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order 10 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Factual Discovery to close by 10/11/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/12/2019; Defendants' Expert Disclosures shall be made by 12/11/2019; Expert Discovery to close by 1/13/2020 and Dispositive Motions due by 2/11/2020 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/11/2019 (Barletta, Barbara)
January 11, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr.: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held on 1/11/2019; Paige Alexandra Munro-Delotto; Jillian Hoxsie Barker and Megan K. Maciasz DiSanto participated (Barletta, Barbara)
January 3, 2019 9 RULE 16 STATEMENT by All Defendants. (DiSanto, Megan)
January 2, 2019 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Matthew McCarthy. (Munro-Delotto, Paige)
December 3, 2018 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for Friday, 1/11/2019 at 09:00 AM before District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Barletta, Barbara)
November 15, 2018 CASE PERMANENTLY ASSIGNED: Since District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. has determined that this case is in fact related to CA 18-548, et als, this case is permanently assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. for all further proceedings (Barletta, Barbara)
November 15, 2018 6 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
November 14, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian Hoxsie Barker on behalf of City of Providence (Barker, Jillian)
November 14, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan K Maciasz DiSanto on behalf of All Defendants (DiSanto, Megan)
November 14, 2018 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 14, 2018 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 18-cv-548, 18-cv-581 and 18-cv-626 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
November 14, 2018 2 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Providence, by and though its Treasurer, James J. Lombardi, Roger Williams Park Botanical Center.(DiSanto, Megan)
November 14, 2018 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-5959. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1287530, filed by City of Providence, by and though its Treasurer, James J. Lombardi, Roger Williams Park Botanical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiSanto, Megan)
November 14, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jillian Hoxsie Barker on behalf of City of Providence (Barker, Jillian)
November 14, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan K Maciasz DiSanto on behalf of All Defendants (DiSanto, Megan)
November 14, 2018 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 14, 2018 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 18-cv-548, 18-cv-581 and 18-cv-626 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
November 14, 2018 2 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Providence, by and though its Treasurer, James J. Lombardi, Roger Williams Park Botanical Center.(DiSanto, Megan)
November 14, 2018 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-5959. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1287530, filed by City of Providence, by and though its Treasurer, James J. Lombardi, Roger Williams Park Botanical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiSanto, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarthy v. Roger Williams Park Botanical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Williams Park Botanical Center
Represented By: Jillian Hoxsie Barker
Represented By: Megan K Maciasz DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Providence
Represented By: Jillian Hoxsie Barker
Represented By: Megan K Maciasz DiSanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew McCarthy
Represented By: Paige Alexandra Munro-Delotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?