Craine v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michelle Craine
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2018cv00628
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michelle Craine (Bejma, Vicki)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (Potter, Carrie)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Request filed by Michelle Craine. (Bejma, Vicki)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Request filed by Michelle Craine. (Bejma, Vicki)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by Michelle Craine, Life Insurance Company of North America.(Bejma, Vicki)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Michelle Craine. (Bejma, Vicki)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki J. Bejma on behalf of Michelle Craine (Bejma, Vicki)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1287804 ), filed by Michelle Craine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bejma, Vicki) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/15/2018) (Potter, Carrie).
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by Michelle Craine. (Bejma, Vicki)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki J. Bejma on behalf of Michelle Craine (Bejma, Vicki)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1287804 ), filed by Michelle Craine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bejma, Vicki) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/15/2018) (Potter, Carrie).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craine v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Craine
Represented By: Vicki J. Bejma
Represented By: Noelle K. Clapham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?