Masello Salon Services of New England, LLC v. It's a New 10, LLC

Plaintiff: Masello Salon Services of New England, LLC
Defendant: It's a New 10, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00643
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Stay; granting #5 Motion to Stay; granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: This action is stayed pending a ruling on Plaintiff's pending Motion to Dismiss in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida (C.A. 18-cv-61073-WPD). The parties shall file a joint status report by March 18, 2019 if the Southern District of Florida has not issued a ruling. If the Plaintiff's motion is denied by the Florida court, Defendant will have 30 days from the date of that ruling to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/23/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 First MOTION to Stay re #4 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Complaint, First MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Masello Salon Services of New England, LLC. Responses due by 1/10/2019. (Lombardi, Frank)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay filed by It's a New 10, LLC. Responses due by 12/31/2018. (Nakasian, Stacey)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
November 27, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-6892. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1291076, filed by It's a New 10, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nakasian, Stacey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2018: #5 State Notice of Removal) (Potter, Carrie).
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-6892. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1291076, filed by It's a New 10, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nakasian, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Masello Salon Services of New England, LLC v. It's a New 10, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: It's a New 10, LLC
Represented By: Stacey P. Nakasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Masello Salon Services of New England, LLC
Represented By: Frank S. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?