Santana v. East Side Clinical Laboratory et al

Plaintiff: Gladys Santana
Defendant: East Side Clinical Laboratory and Maria Medberry
Case Number: 1:2018cv00649
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Defendant East Side Clinical Laboratory, Inc's Motion for Extension of Time to file their answer or otherwise respond. Answer now due 02/12/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/17/2018. (Perry, Frank)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 Assented MOTION for an Extension of Time To Answer of Otherwise Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint filed by East Side Clinical Laboratory. Responses due by 12/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by East Side Clinical Laboratory. (Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-6382. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1293718, filed by East Side Clinical Laboratory, Maria Medberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Simoncelli, Michael)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC2018-6382. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1293718, filed by East Side Clinical Laboratory, Maria Medberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Folger-Hartwell, Jillian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santana v. East Side Clinical Laboratory et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Side Clinical Laboratory
Represented By: Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Represented By: Alexsa Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Medberry
Represented By: Jillian S. Folger-Hartwell
Represented By: Alexsa Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Santana
Represented By: Vicki J. Bejma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?