Silva v. Farrell

Plaintiff: Wayne A. Silva
Defendant: Robert M. Farrell
Case Number: 1:2018cv00650
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: John J McConnell
1 Judge: William E Smith
2 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING #8 Report and Recommendations. Except for a Notice of Appeal and a single Motion for Relief from Judgment or Order in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60, Plaintiff is hereby enjoined from filing any further motions or other documents in this matter without first obtaining permission from a judge of this Court - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/30/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 OBJECTION to #8 Report and Recommendations filed by Wayne A. Silva. (McGuire, Vickie)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #7 Motion for Reconsideration. For the reasons stated in the report and recommendation issued today, the motion for reconsideration is denied. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 1/15/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Report and Recommendations filed by Wayne A. Silva. I recommend that, except for a notice of appeal and a single motion for relief from judgment or order in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 60, the Court enter an injunction barring Plaintiff from filing any further motions or other documents in this matterwithout first obtaining permission from a judge of this Court. Objections to R&R due by 1/29/2019. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 1/15/2019. (Saucier, Martha)
January 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Report and Recommendations referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Report and Recommendations filed by Wayne A. Silva. Responses due by 1/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Simoncelli, Michael)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 JUDGMENT dismissing the Plaintiff's #1 Complaint entered by Clerk of Court on 12/31/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER DISMISSING CASE - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/31/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; adopting Report and Recommendations re #3 Report and Recommendations - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/31/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Letter from Wayne Silva (McGuire, Vickie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 Letter from Wayne Silva. Docket Sheet mailed on 12/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Potter, Carrie)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Wayne A. Silva, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wayne A. Silva. I recommend that the complaint be summarily dismissed becauseit fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, this Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to the Rooker-Feldman doctrine, venue in this Court is improper and the only defendant is immune from suit. Consistent with this recommendation, I further recommend that the IFP motion be denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 12/26/2018.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 12/11/2018. (Saucier, Martha)
December 10, 2018 Case reassigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. Chief Judge William E. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 3, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wayne A. Silva. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wayne A. Silva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
December 3, 2018 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 18-cv-95-WES-PAS based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)
December 3, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred for determination to Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Wayne A. Silva. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wayne A. Silva. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Envelope)(Potter, Carrie)
December 3, 2018 CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 18-cv-95-WES-PAS based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne A. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?