Cole v. Whitaker, et al
Plaintiff: Frances L Cole
Defendant: Denis Riordan, Adam N Bergeron, Matthew Whitaker, Kirstjen Nielsen and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2018cv00653
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear as Law Student Counsel - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/11/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/11/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Adam N Bergeron, L. Francis Cissna, Kirstjen Nielsen, Denis Riordan, Matthew Whitaker, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Potter, Carrie)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Frances L Cole. (Gonzalez, Deborah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 3, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for Jessica Roberge to Appear as Law Student Counsel by Frances L Cole (Gonzalez, Deborah) Modified on 12/3/2018 (Potter, Carrie).
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah S. Gonzalez on behalf of Frances L Cole (Gonzalez, Deborah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frances L Cole. (Gonzalez, Deborah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Frances L Cole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Exhibit A - USCIS Receipt No MSC1691365322, #8 Exhibit B - USCIS Receipt No MSC1490012539, #9 Exhibit C - Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies)(Gonzalez, Deborah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Request filed by Frances L Cole. (Gonzalez, Deborah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 3, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 Motion for Jessica Roberge to Appear as Law Student Counsel by Frances L Cole (Gonzalez, Deborah) Modified on 12/3/2018 (Potter, Carrie).
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah S. Gonzalez on behalf of Frances L Cole (Gonzalez, Deborah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Frances L Cole. (Gonzalez, Deborah)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA, Waived by Statute, or IFP.), filed by Frances L Cole. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Exhibit A - USCIS Receipt No MSC1691365322, #8 Exhibit B - USCIS Receipt No MSC1490012539, #9 Exhibit C - Exhaustion of Administrative Remedies)(Gonzalez, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Whitaker, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denis Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam N Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirstjen Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances L Cole
Represented By: Deborah S. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?