CVS Pharmacy, Inc. v. Brink's U.S.

Plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Defendant: Brink's U.S.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00660
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: John J McConnell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward A. Cohen. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/4/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
February 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Edward A. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1319345 ) filed by Brink's U.S.. (Prignano, Stephen)
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brink's U.S.. (Prignano, Stephen)
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for CVS Pharmacy, Inc... (Brenner, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #10 Stipulation to extend time to respond to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and III filed by Brink's U.S.; Response due by 2/25/2019.- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/29/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark A. Goodman. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/28/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert J. Palmer. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/28/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Mark A. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1316383 ) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Brenner, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Robert J. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1316380 ) filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Brenner, Jeffrey)
January 28, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Brenner, Jeffrey)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Seal- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/22/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Counts II and III filed by Brink's U.S.. Responses due by 2/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support)(Barletta, Barbara)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Filed. Notice Sent To: Brink's U.S., CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Defendant, Brink's Motion to Dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Supporting Memorandum)(Prignano, Stephen) This entry/document has been filed under seal pursuant to statute, rule or court order and access is restricted. Please login to CM/ECF to view document(s).
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Brink's U.S..(Prignano, Stephen)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #5 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Brink's U.S. answer due 1/22/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/27/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION filed by Brink's U.S.. (Prignano, Stephen)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Parker on behalf of Brink's U.S. (Parker, Robert)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Prignano on behalf of Brink's U.S. (Prignano, Stephen)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brink's U.S. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1296815 ), filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Memorandum Summons)(Brenner, Jeffrey) Docket Text Modified on 12/7/2018 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brink's U.S. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1296815 ), filed by CVS Pharmacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supporting Memorandum Summons)(Brenner, Jeffrey) Docket Text Modified on 12/7/2018 (Farrell Pletcher, Paula).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CVS Pharmacy, Inc. v. Brink's U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brink's U.S.
Represented By: Edward A. Cohen
Represented By: Stephen M. Prignano
Represented By: Robert S. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Brenner
Represented By: Robert J. Palmer
Represented By: Mark A. Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?