I. Broomfield & Son, Inc. v. Hallamore Corporation et al

Plaintiff: I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.
Defendant: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange and Hallamore Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv00661
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Hallamore Corporation answer due 2/28/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #7 Stipulation filed by Hallamore Corporation. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/24/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melina J. Trudeau on behalf of Hallamore Corporation (Trudeau, Melina)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extension of Defendants to Answer filed by Hallamore Corporation. (Trudeau, Melina)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc. for Summons Hallamore Corporation served on 12/24/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Renner, Eric)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hallamore Corporation, Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric)
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1296842 ), filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Renner, Eric)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Hallamore Corporation, Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Simoncelli, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Request filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Renner, Eric)
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1296842 ), filed by I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Renner, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: I. Broomfield & Son, Inc. v. Hallamore Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Privilege Underwriters Reciprocal Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallamore Corporation
Represented By: Melina J. Trudeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I. Broomfield & Son, Inc.
Represented By: Eric E. Renner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?