Foster v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: John P. Foster
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00665
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER Entering #4 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/24/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Kincaid, Kelly)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #3 Stipulation Extending Time. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. answer due 1/30/2019 - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/9/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 3, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint extending time to plead to January 30, 2019 filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Kincaid, Kelly)
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Kincaid on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Kincaid, Kelly)
December 10, 2018 Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670021616 ), filed by John P. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00 receipt number 14670021616 ), filed by John P. Foster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Kelly A. Kincaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?