Sebren v. Harrison

Plaintiff: Sarah Sebren
Defendant: Casby Harrison, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv00667
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sarah Sebren. Casby Harrison, III served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (Parker, Matthew)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Casby Harrison, III, filed by Sarah Sebren.(Corrente, Robert)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant Harrison's ANSWER to Complaint of Sarah Sebren, COUNTERCLAIM against Sarah Sebren by Casby Harrison, III.(DeCelles, Gerard)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Reset Deadlines: Casby Harrison, III answer due 1/31/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/15/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Casby Harrison, III. Responses due by 1/28/2019. (Harrison, Casby)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Casby Harrison, III. (Potter, Carrie)
December 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Parker on behalf of Sarah Sebren (Parker, Matthew)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1297610 ), filed by Sarah Sebren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Corrente, Robert) (Attachment 2 replaced on 12/11/2018) (Potter, Carrie).
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1297610 ), filed by Sarah Sebren. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Corrente, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sebren v. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Sebren
Represented By: Matthew H. Parker
Represented By: Robert Clark Corrente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casby Harrison, III
Represented By: Gerard M. DeCelles
Represented By: Casby Harrison, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?