Toray Plastics (America), Inc. v. Paknis

Plaintiff: Toray Plastics (America), Inc.
Defendant: Matthew Paknis and Matthew B. Paknis
Case Number: 1:2018cv00672
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: William E Smith
1 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Toray Plastics (America), Inc.. Matthew B. Paknis waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019. (Mack, Eric)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Matthew B. Paknis. (Potter, Carrie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 13, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1299519 ), filed by Toray Plastics (America), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Mack, Eric)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1299519 ), filed by Toray Plastics (America), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Mack, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toray Plastics (America), Inc. v. Paknis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toray Plastics (America), Inc.
Represented By: Eric B. Mack
Represented By: Anthony D. Rizzotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Paknis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew B. Paknis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?