Lantini v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Gilbert Lantini
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00674
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: Lincoln D Almond
Referring Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order STIPULATION ENTERED by Chief Judge William E Smith: Upon consideration of stipulation, it is hereby ordered that Defendant, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, may have up to and including February 15, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs complaint. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC answer now due 2/15/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/22/2019. (Perry, Frank)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Bodurtha, Samuel)
December 29, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert Lantini. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC served on 12/26/2018, answer due 1/16/2019. (Ennis, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Jackson, Kerrie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Potter, Carrie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 13, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Gilbert Lantini. (Ennis, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Gilbert Lantini. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (Ennis, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1299683 ), filed by Gilbert Lantini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ennis, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Jackson, Kerrie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Potter, Carrie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 13, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Gilbert Lantini. (Ennis, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Gilbert Lantini. Regarding New Case: #1 Complaint . (Ennis, John)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1299683 ), filed by Gilbert Lantini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ennis, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lantini v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Lantini
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?