Half Moon Ventures, LLC v. Energy Development Partners, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Half Moon Ventures, LLC
Defendant: Energy Development Partners, LLC and Maarten Reidel
Case Number: 1:2018cv00685
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: John J McConnell
1 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Reset Deadlines: Energy Development Partners, LLC answer due 3/8/2019; Maarten Reidel answer due 3/8/2019- So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/8/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 2/21/2019. (Boyajian, Steven)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entering #13 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Energy Development Partners, LLC answer due 2/7/2019; Maarten Reidel answer due 2/7/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/27/2018. (Barletta, Barbara)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Edward J. Heath. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/21/2018. (Potter, Carrie)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 Assented STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Boyajian, Steven)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Edward J. Heath to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1304653 ) filed by All Defendants. (Boyajian, Steven)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Boyajian on behalf of All Defendants (Boyajian, Steven)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Half Moon Ventures, LLC. Maarten Reidel served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. (Gemma, Richard)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Half Moon Ventures, LLC. Energy Development Partners, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Gemma, Richard)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Christopher R. Grote to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #6 Motion for Mark S. Enslin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/18/2018. (Jackson, Kerrie)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Energy Development Partners, LLC and Maarten Reidel. (Attachments: #1 Reidel Summons)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 18, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Mark S. Enslin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1302590 ) filed by Half Moon Ventures, LLC. (Gemma, Richard)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Christopher R. Grote to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1302586 ) filed by Half Moon Ventures, LLC. (Gemma, Richard)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Half Moon Ventures, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CWP USA for Half Moon Ventures, LLC.. (Gemma, Richard)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Half Moon Ventures, LLC. (Gemma, Richard)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Half Moon Ventures, LLC. (Gemma, Richard)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1302561 ), filed by Half Moon Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gemma, Richard)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Christopher R. Grote to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #6 Motion for Mark S. Enslin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/18/2018. (Jackson, Kerrie)
December 18, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Energy Development Partners, LLC and Maarten Reidel. (Attachments: #1 Reidel Summons)(Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 18, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Farrell Pletcher, Paula)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Mark S. Enslin to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1302590 ) filed by Half Moon Ventures, LLC. (Gemma, Richard)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Christopher R. Grote to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number 0103-1302586 ) filed by Half Moon Ventures, LLC. (Gemma, Richard)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Half Moon Ventures, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CWP USA for Half Moon Ventures, LLC.. (Gemma, Richard)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Request filed by Half Moon Ventures, LLC. (Gemma, Richard)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Request filed by Half Moon Ventures, LLC. (Gemma, Richard)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1302561 ), filed by Half Moon Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gemma, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Half Moon Ventures, LLC v. Energy Development Partners, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Development Partners, LLC
Represented By: Steven J. Boyajian
Represented By: Edward J. Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maarten Reidel
Represented By: Steven J. Boyajian
Represented By: Edward J. Heath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Half Moon Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Christopher R. Grote
Represented By: Mark S. Enslin
Represented By: Richard L. Gemma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?