Bradbury et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, et al
Plaintiff: Heather A Bradbury and Raymond C Bradbury
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00690
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: William E Smith
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Motion Hearing held on 2/8/2019 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. John B. Ennis for the Plaintiff. Samuel C. Bodurtha for the defendant. Court addresses. Counsel address motion. Defense counsel to Notice the Court prior to Court issuing an Opinion. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam in Courtroom 3 at 11:02.) (Jackson, Kerrie)
January 30, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: Motion Hearing scheduled for Friday 2/8/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Jackson, Ryan)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by All Plaintiffs in support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ocwen letter)(Ennis, John)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by All Plaintiffs in support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DD, #2 Exhibit EE, #3 Exhibit FF, #4 Exhibit GG, #5 Exhibit HH)(Ennis, John)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE In Opposition to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Injunction filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Replies due by 1/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan, #2 Exhibit Chapter 13 Plan, #3 Exhibit Notice of Final Cure Payment, #4 Exhibit Response to Final Cure Payment, #5 Exhibit Notice regarding Motion for Determination of Final Cure and Payment)(Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 3, 2019 CORRECTIVE DOCKET ENTRY Regarding: 1/3/2019 Minute Entry, ENTERED IN WRONG CASE. (Jackson, Kerrie)
January 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2019. Stephen T. Fanning for the Plaintiff. Benjamin S. Klein for the Defendant. Court addresses. Counsel address Motions. Court denies motions as moot w/o prejudice and allows 45 days for the filing of an amended complaint. During that time, a settlement conference will be scheduled. (Court Reporter Denise Veitch in Courtroom 3 at 2:10.) (Jackson, Kerrie)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Z. Tieger on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Tieger, Ethan)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Bodurtha, Samuel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Bodurtha, Samuel)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction: The Defendants' shall have up to and including 1/7/2019 to file their brief regarding the mediation issue discussed at today's conference; Plaintiffs' shall file their response by 1/14/2019 - So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 12/28/2018. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Motion Hearing held on 12/28/2018 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Heather A Bradbury, Raymond C Bradbury. John B. Ennis present; Samuel C. Bodurtha participated telephonically. The chambers conference was held in Courtroom 3. Recess. (Courtroom 3 at 10:10 a.m.) (Urizandi, Nisshy)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 REPLY to Response re #5 Response to Motion, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ennis, John)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #6 Memorandum in Support by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Loan History, #2 Exhibit 2 Escrow History)(Ennis, John)
December 28, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for Friday, 12/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William E. Smith. (Urizandi, Nisshy) Modified on 12/28/2018 to note the change in location (Urizandi, Nisshy).
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by All Plaintiffs in support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Ennis, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE In Opposition to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Replies due by 1/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - AOM, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice, #3 Exhibit 3 - Notice of Default)(Bodurtha, Samuel)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C. Bodurtha on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Bodurtha, Samuel)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 21, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Ennis, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1304302 ), filed by Heather A Bradbury, Raymond C Bradbury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ennis, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
December 21, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Ennis, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1304302 ), filed by Heather A Bradbury, Raymond C Bradbury. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ennis, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradbury et al v. Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather A Bradbury
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond C Bradbury
Represented By: John B. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Ethan Z. Tieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Samuel C. Bodurtha
Represented By: Ethan Z. Tieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?