Sophia v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Jaqueline Sophia and Tysha Vaughn
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00009
Filed: January 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: William E Smith
1 Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney without prejudice to refilling in accordance with LR Gen 206(d)(2). So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 3/7/2019. (Jackson, Ryan)
March 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge William E. Smith: Rule 16 Teleconference held on 3/7/2019; counsel present on teleconference: C. Allard; E. Mikolinski, D. Fialkow. (Jackson, Ryan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 16 STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Mikolinski, Edward)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Jaqueline Sophia. Responses due by 3/1/2019. (Allard, Corey)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 10:15 AM before Chief Judge William E. Smith. The Court will initiate the call. Counsel shall provide the Clerk with contact information if it differs from the docket sheet. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to begin their mandatory disclosures immediately, before the Rule 16 conference. The Rule 16 conference will be scheduled as soon as possible, either in person or by telephone. To the extent that the parties wish to begin discovery on a cooperative basis prior to the initial conference, they are encouraged to do so. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 2/7/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Mikolinski, Edward)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 7, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Fialkow on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Fialkow, David)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-6596. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1307911, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mikolinski, Edward)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD received electronically from the State of Rhode Island. (Potter, Carrie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 7, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Fialkow on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Fialkow, David)
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 NEW CASE/NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Providence County Superior Court, Case Number PC-2018-6596. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0103-1307911, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mikolinski, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sophia v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Edward J. Mikolinski
Represented By: David E. Fialkow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaqueline Sophia
Represented By: Corey J. Allard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tysha Vaughn
Represented By: Corey J. Allard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?