United States of America on behalf of and for the use and benefit of Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC v. Cutter Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Cutter Enterprises, LLC and Arch Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00012
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
Presiding Judge: John J McConnell
Referring Judge: Patricia A Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or file responsive pleading; Reset Deadlines: Arch Insurance Company answer due 4/1/2019; Cutter Enterprises, LLC answer due 4/1/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/1/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Arch Insurance Company, Cutter Enterprises, LLC. Responses due by 3/14/2019. (Ramos, Adam)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Reset Deadlines: Arch Insurance Company answer due 3/1/2019; Cutter Enterprises, LLC answer due 3/1/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/31/2019. (Barletta, Barbara)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by Arch Insurance Company, Cutter Enterprises, LLC. Responses due by 2/13/2019. (Ramos, Adam)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Ramos on behalf of Arch Insurance Company, Cutter Enterprises, LLC (Ramos, Adam)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1309248 ), filed by United States of America on behalf of and for the use and benefit of Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Gara, William)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1309248 ), filed by United States of America on behalf of and for the use and benefit of Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Gara, William)
January 9, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)
January 9, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America on behalf of and for the use and benefit of Delta Mechanical Contractors, LLC v. Cutter Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutter Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Adam M. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam M. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William E. O'Gara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?