Rodriguez v. Weeden

Defendant: Attorney General for the State of Rhode Island
Petitioner: Wilton Rodriguez
Respondent: WARDEN JAMES WEEDEN and James Weeden
Case Number: 1:2019cv00013
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Rhode Island
0 Judge: Lincoln D Almond
1 Judge: William E Smith
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE In Opposition to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wilton Rodriguez. Replies due by 3/12/2019. (Voccola, Joseph)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by Attorney General for the State of Rhode Island NOTICE: In order to view this document, you must first log in using your CMECF Filer login.. (Bush, Christopher)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Attorney General for the State of Rhode Island. Responses due by 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket: P1-2018-3303A, #2 Exhibit Docket: 62-2018-05258, #3 Exhibit Transcript dated Nov. 14, 2018)(Bush, Christopher)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER entered directing the State of Rhode Island to respond State of Rhode Island Response due by 2/28/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/29/2019. (Urizandi, Nisshy)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 14670021756 (Potter, Carrie)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER entered directing the petitioner to pay the habeas corpus filing fee in the amount of $5.00 or to file a motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Filing Fee or Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis due on or before 2/1/2019. So Ordered by Chief Judge William E. Smith on 1/11/2019. (Potter, Carrie)
January 11, 2019 Case assigned to Chief Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Potter, Carrie)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Wilton Rodriguez.(Potter, Carrie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Rhode Island District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Weeden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wilton Rodriguez
Represented By: Joseph J. Voccola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN JAMES WEEDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Weeden
Represented By: Christopher R. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General for the State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Christopher R. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?